United States of America v. Gonzales & Gonzales Bonds and Insurance Agency, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gonzales & Gonzales Bonds and Insurance Agency, Inc. and American Surety Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv04029
Filed: August 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Re 271 Penalties & Fees. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 273 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney E. Kathleen Shahan filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 265 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 264 MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET FORTH IN THE CIVIL MINUTES OF OCTOBER 1, 2015 filed by Gonzales & Gonzales Bonds and Insurance Agency, Inc., American Surety Company. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/26/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER Re Motions for Summary Judgment by Judge Edward M. Chen - 157 162 178 180 184 186 . (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER Re Motions for Summary Judgment by Judge Edward M. Chen - 156 159 163 165 167 169 171 174 176 182 242 . (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 232 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record with DHSS Bonds Management Handbook. Motion Hearing reset for 3/5/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/26/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER REOPENING CASE AND SETTING FURTHER CMC FOR 4/24/14 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 143 TO ENLARGE TIME SET FORTH IN THE REMAND ORDER filed by Gonzales & Gonzales Bonds and Insurance Agency, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/8/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Remanding Action to the Department of Homeland Security. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/25/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Re Parties' Dispute Over Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/30/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TWO DATES IN SCHEDULING ORDER FILED ON 5/1/12 re 121 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 120 Case Management Conference - Further, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Stipulation to Change Two Dates in Scheduling Order filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/3/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 100 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaim. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO RESPOND re 95 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/22/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Partial Remand. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on 55 plaintiffs' MOTION to Remand; Supplemental briefing to be filed within 14 days; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/24/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to fifteen days after ruling on remand motion; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/9/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 09/03/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re (49 in 3:09-cv-04029-MHP) Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/11/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall PateL: the court finds that: 1) immigration bond-breach determinations are reviewed under APA standards; 2) defendants' counterclaim stands; and 3) defendants may discover A-files. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 5/10/2010 for defendants to file responsive pleadings; Page limits increased to 8 pages; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/28/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 13 MOTION for leave to file motion to dismiss prior to initial case management conference filed by United States of America; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/5/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gonzales & Gonzales Bonds and Insurance Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Frances McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzales & Gonzales Bonds and Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?