Ninua v. Regis Corporation
Plaintiff: Eka Ninua
Defendant: Regis Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv04045
Filed: August 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING 58 Stipulation TO CONTINUE FINAL APPROVAL HEARING DATE AND ISSUE CORRECTIVE NOTICE RE: 52 MOTION for Settlement, 53 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Enhancement. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/22/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 43 Stipulation TO CHANGE DATE OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/10/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 41 MOTION to Vacate Upcoming Dates and Set Motion for Preliminary Approval. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/3/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 32 Stipulation TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/23/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/10/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 24 Stipulation to Continue Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 4, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulation to Continue Mediation Deadline. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 9, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 8, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 12 Stipulation selecting Private Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/1/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ninua v. Regis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eka Ninua
Represented By: Eric B. Kingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regis Corporation
Represented By: Amy K Skryja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?