Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. IZT Mortgage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Defendant: IZT Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv04060
Filed: September 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen GRANTING 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 63 Notice of appearance by phone (Other) filed by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/9/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY PHONE re 55 Notice (Other) filed by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/23/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/23/2011 02:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/21/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER resetting status to 10/27/10 39 Status Report filed by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/22/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE TO 10/29/10 re 37 Stipulation filed by IZT Mortgage, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/25/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC to 9/1/10 at 2:30 p.m. re 32 Stipulation filed by IZT Mortgage, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2010.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/9/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO MAKE INITIAL DISCLOSURES re 29 Stipulation filed by IZT Mortgage, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting CMC from 12/9/09 to 1/6/10 re 13 Stipulation filed by IZT Mortgage, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/18/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to answer re 8 Stipulation filed by IZT Mortgage, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/21/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. IZT Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Michael Andrew Rollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IZT Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?