Ottovich v. City of Fremont et al
Plaintiff: Mark Ottovich
Defendant: City of Fremont and City of Fremont Police Officers Doe on Through Ten
Case Number: 3:2009cv04181
Filed: September 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 AMENDED JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 8, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 18, 2013 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 16, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: Re 139 Letter filed by Heininge, Dang, Settle, Farmer, Ricardo Cortes, City of Fremont, City of Fremont Police Officers Doe on Through Ten. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/19/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 125 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO MAKE SPECIAL APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 29, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER re 110 Letter filed by Heininge, Dang, Settle, Farmer, Ricardo Cortes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/4/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER directing parties to provide update about settlement conference. Signed by Judge Beeler on 1/9/2013. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION. Plaintiff shall appear and submit to deposition at the law offices of Bertrand, Fox & Elliot, located at 2749 Hyde Street, San Francisco, California, commencing at 10:00am on January 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2012: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION. Plaintiff shall appear and submit to deposition at the law offices of Bertrand, Fox & Elliot, located at 2749 Hyde Street, San Francisco, California, commencing at 10:00am on January 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER VACATING DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATE, TRIAL DATE; CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The dispositive motion filing deadline currently set for November 30, 2012, the pretrial conference date currently set for February 19, 20 13, and the trial date currently set for March 4, 2013 are hereby VACATED. The Status Conference currently set for December 14, 2012, is hereby CONTINUED to February 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 16, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff Mark Ottovich is ordered to appear in person at the January 27, 2012 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 12, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL TO SERVE PLAINTIFFS. Mar is directed to serve Mark Ottovich and Harvey Ottovich with a copy of his Notice of Withdrawal, his Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record, and a copy of this order, and file proof of such service no later than December 9, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 1, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL TO SERVE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL. Craig H. Mar is ordered to serve, upon each plaintiff, the notice of withdrawal, such service to be made by mail with proof of service filed no later than November 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 17, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference to Allow Time for New Counsel re 71 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/18/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 69 Letter filed by Heininge, Dang, Settle, Farmer, Ricardo Cortes. Signed by Judge Laporte on 2/15/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER STRIKING NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. As no petition for reinstatement of Norman Newhouse has been made to the Clerk, as required by Civil Local Rule 11-7(b)(4), Ottovichs notice is stricken. Craig Mar shall remain as Ottovichs counsel of record until such time as the Court permits his withdrawal pursuant to Civil Local Rule 11-5. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/20/11. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/5/2011. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO REMOVE NORMAN CHARLES NEWHOUSE AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/22/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/8/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS VETERANS ADMINISTRATION PALO ALTO HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, JOANNE DROBICK, AND UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; STRIKING FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 1, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS. The parties' stipulation to continue the hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss from August 20, 2010 to September 3, 2010 is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 6, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Defendant VAPAHCS shall have an extension of time to and including July 16, 2010 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 25, 2010 to October 8, 2010; all related dates are continued accordingly. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 10, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CITY OF FREMONT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 28, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 29, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CITY OF FREMONT'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 16, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from April 30, 2010 to May 7, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 9, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATE OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. The date for defendant City of Fremont to response to plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is extended to February 1, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 14, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 4 DEFENDANT CITY OF FREMONT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND SIXTH CAUSE OF ACTION TO NAME DEFENDANT(S); CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 18, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DECEMBER 4, 2009 HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT TO DECEMBER 18, 2009. Deadlines for opposition and reply briefs are adjusted accordingly. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 16, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION, WITH ONE EXCEPTION, TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss is continued from October 30, 2009 to December 4, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. The initial Case Management Conference is continued from December 18, 2009 to February 12, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 16, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ottovich v. City of Fremont et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Ottovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fremont
Represented By: Harvey Ezekiel Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fremont Police Officers Doe on Through Ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?