Burch v. GMAC Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lesli Burch
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage LLC and Paul Financial, LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv04214
Filed: September 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: 1. Defendants motions for summary judgment on the remaining claim in the First Cause of Action are hereby GRANTED.2. The Second Cause of Action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to plaintiffs refiling the Second Cause of Action in state court. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING CLAIM IN FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION; DISMISSING SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE; VACATING MAY 7, 2010 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 16, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; VACATING MARCH 19, 2010 HEARING; SETTING FURTHER BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The motions are grant ed to the extent the First Cause of Action is based on a failure to deliver material disclosures, and are denied to the extent the First Cause of Action is based on a failure to deliver two copies of a notice of the right to rescind. With respect to the latter of the above two claims contained in the First Cause of Action, to the extent the motions seek dismissal on the basis of Burch's signed acknowledgment, the Court will treat the motions as motions for summary judgment, and sets the fol lowing briefing schedule and hearing date: a. No later than April 9, 2010, Burch shall submit any opposition; b. No later than April 23, 2010, defendants shall submit any reply; and c. A hearing on the matter is scheduled for May 7, 2010. To the e xtent the motions seek dismissal of the Second Cause of Action, ruling is deferred. The Case Management Conference is continued from May 7, 2010 to June 18, 2010; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than June 11, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GMAC Mortgage LLC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/28/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER VACATING CMC & RELATED CASE MANAGEMENT/ADR DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/11/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/2/2009. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burch v. GMAC Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesli Burch
Represented By: Tiffany Lauren Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?