Marathon Racing, Inc. v. Oceans West Marine & Industrial Supply Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Marathon Racing, Inc.
Defendant: Oceans West Marine & Industrial Supply Inc. and Zodiac of North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv04253
Filed: September 14, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/13/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 27, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DEFENDANT ZODIAC OF NORTH AMERICA TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
December 21, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CMC, CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/21/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 30, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/30/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
January 8, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/8/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
March 11, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DEADLINES; ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/11/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
May 24, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL re 38 Status Report filed by Oceans West Marine & Industrial Supply Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/24/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
June 3, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, CLOSING FILE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/3/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marathon Racing, Inc. v. Oceans West Marine & Industrial Supply Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marathon Racing, Inc.
Represented By: James Mark Neudecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oceans West Marine & Industrial Supply Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zodiac of North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.