Joltid Limited v. Skype Technologies S.A. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Joltid Limited
Defendant: Skype Technologies S.A., Skype Inc., eBay Inc., Silver Lake Partners, Index Ventures Management, S.A., Michael Angelo Volpi, Andreesen Horowitz LLC and Canada Pension Plan Investment Board
Case Number: 3:2009cv04299
Filed: September 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/19/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 19, 2009 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice and [Proposed] Order by Silver Lake Management Company III, LLC, Silver Lake Partners, Silver Lake Partners II, LP, Silver Lake Partners III, LP, Silver Lake Partners Management Company, LLC. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 3, 2009 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joltid Limited. Canada Pension Plan Investment Board served on 10/20/2009, answer due 11/9/2009; Michael Angelo Volpi served on 10/23/2009, answer due 11/12/2009. (Malmberg, Mieke) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 27, 2009 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Silver Lake Management Company III, LLC, Silver Lake Partners, Silver Lake Partners II, LP, Silver Lake Partners III, LP, Silver Lake Partners Management Company, LLC (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 26, 2009 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Andreesen Horowitz LLC Defendant Andreessen Horowitz LLC's Certification of Interested Entities or Person Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Torres, Diana) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 26, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Marie Torres Defendant Andreessen Horowitz LLC's Notice of Appearance (Torres, Diana) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 26, 2009 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants Silver Lake Partners, L.P., Silver Lake Partners II, L.P., Silver Lake Partners III, L.P., Silver Lake Partners Mangagement Company, L.L.C., Silver Lake Management Company III, L.L.C., Michelangelo ("Mike") Volpi, Andreessen Horowitz LLC, and Canada Pension Plan Investment Board to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Silver Lake Management Company III, LLC, Silver Lake Partners, Silver Lake Partners II, LP, Silver Lake Partners III, LP, Silver Lake Partners Management Company, LLC. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 23, 2009 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Canada Pension Plan Investment Board (Snyder, Darin) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 21, 2009 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joltid Limited. Andreesen Horowitz LLC served on 10/7/2009, answer due 10/27/2009; Silver Lake Management Company III, LLC served on 10/7/2009, answer due 10/27/2009; Silver Lake Partners served on 10/7/2009, answer due 10/27/2009; Silver Lake Partners II, LP served on 10/7/2009, answer due 10/27/2009; Silver Lake Partners III, LP served on 10/7/2009, answer due 10/27/2009; Silver Lake Partners Management Company, LLC served on 10/7/2009, answer due 10/27/2009; Skype Inc. served on 10/7/2009, answer due 10/27/2009; eBay Inc. served on 10/7/2009, answer due 10/27/2009. (Malmberg, Mieke) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 21, 2009 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Joltid Limited as to Andreesen Horowitz LLC, Canada Pension Plan Investment Board, Index Ventures Management, S.A., Silver Lake Management Company III, LLC, Silver Lake Partners II, LP, Silver Lake Partners III, LP, Silver Lake Partners Management Company, LLC, Skype Technologies S.A., Michael Angelo Volpi, eBay Inc.. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 20, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian David Ledahl of Counsel for Skype, Inc. (Ledahl, Brian) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 12 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS EBAY INC. AND SKYPE INC. TO INITIALLY ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Joltid Limited. (Malmberg, Mieke) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by eBay Inc. Certification of Interested Entities Or Persons (Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 and L.R. 3-16) (Maletic, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Maletic (Maletic, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 7, 2009 Filing 9 First Amended Summons Issued as to Andreesen Horowitz LLC, Canada Pension Plan Investment Board, Index Ventures Management, S.A., Silver Lake Management Company III, LLC, Silver Lake Partners II, LP, Silver Lake Partners III, LP, Silver Lake Partners Management Company, LLC, Skype Inc., Skype Technologies S.A., Michael Angelo Volpi, eBay Inc. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 6, 2009 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Andreesen Horowitz LLC, Canada Pension Plan Investment Board, Index Ventures Management, S.A., Silver Lake Management Company III, LLC, Silver Lake Partners, Silver Lake Partners II, LP, Silver Lake Partners III, LP, Silver Lake Partners Management Company, LLC, Skype Inc., Skype Technologies S.A., Michael Angelo Volpi, eBay Inc.. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 6, 2009 Filing 8 REQUEST TO ISSUE by Joltid Limited. Amendment to 7 Amended Complaint, FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION. (Malmberg, Mieke) (Filed on 10/6/2009) Modified on 10/7/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2009 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Andreesen Horowitz LLC, Canada Pension Plan Investment Board, Index Ventures Management, S.A., Silver Lake Partners, Skype Inc., Skype Technologies S.A., Michael Angelo Volpi, eBay Inc.. Filed byJoltid Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Malmberg, Mieke) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 28, 2009 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE to Plaintiff(s) Attorney(s) by e-mail or U.S. mail re: Failure to E-File/E-Mail re 1 Complaint & 3 Certificate of Interested Entities and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer. The Court instructs Counsel to include in a separate pdf attachment the Civil Cover Sheet. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 16, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 16, 2009 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding:COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 16, 2009 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andreesen Horowitz LLC, Canada Pension Plan Investment Board, Index Ventures Management, S.A., Silver Lake Partners, Skype Inc., Skype Technologies S.A., Michael Angelo Volpi, eBay Inc. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 16, 2009 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil.L.R.3-16 and FED.R.CIV.P.7.1; by Joltid Limited (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2010. Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2010 10:00 AM. Signed by Senior Judge Samuel Conti on 9/16/09. (Attachments: # 1 SC Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 16, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Andreesen Horowitz LLC, Canada Pension Plan Investment Board, Index Ventures Management, S.A., Silver Lake Partners, Skype Inc., Skype Technologies S.A., Michael Angelo Volpi, eBay Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611036784.). Filed byJoltid Limited. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2009: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaa, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joltid Limited v. Skype Technologies S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joltid Limited
Represented By: Mieke Katherine Malmberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skype Technologies S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skype Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Lake Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Index Ventures Management, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Angelo Volpi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreesen Horowitz LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canada Pension Plan Investment Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?