Northwest Administrators, Inc. v. El Camino Paving, Inc.
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Defendant: El Camino Paving, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv04406
Filed: September 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 WRIT of Execution issued as to El Camino Paving, Inc. in the amount of $10,929.76 (mclS, COURT STAFF)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY STEPHANIE ALVA SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT, SANCTIONED, AND ARRESTED. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/14/2015 02:00 PM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/28/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REQUIRING APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF STEPHANIE ALVA, BUSINESS REPRESENTATIVE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR, EL CAMINO PAVING. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 7/24/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/24/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 WRIT of Execution issued as to El Camino Paving, Inc. in the amount of $10,265.10 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators, Inc. v. El Camino Paving, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Camino Paving, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?