Taylor v. Barnes and Noble Booksellers Inc et al
Plaintiff: Rolanda Taylor
Defendant: Barnes and Noble Booksellers Inc, Starbucks Corporation and City of Oakland
Case Number: 3:2009cv04490
Filed: September 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and ORDER as to PLAINTIFF'S INJUNCTIVE RELIEF CLAIMS ONLY. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/22/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DISMISSING Claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE re 77 Stipulation filed by Rolanda Taylor, CEP-JLS I LLC, City of Oakland, City of Oakland, City of Oakland, City of Oakland, City of Oakland, City of Oakland, City of Oakland, Jack London Square Investors I LLC, CEP-JLS I LLC and CEP-JLS I LLC terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/27/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER to continue CMC re 63 Stipulation, filed by Jack London Square Investors I LLC, CEP-JLS I LLC, City of Oakland Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/30/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 30 Stipulation filed by Rolanda Taylor. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/13/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME re 13 Stipulation filed by City of Oakland (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re 7 Stipulation filed by City of Oakland. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/23/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Barnes and Noble Booksellers Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolanda Taylor
Represented By: Paul Leslie Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes and Noble Booksellers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?