BMMsoft Inc v. White Oaks Technology Inc
Plaintiff: BMMsoft Inc
Defendant: White Oaks Technology Inc
Case Number: 3:2009cv04562
Filed: September 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ordered that plaintiff's claims alleged herein against defendant be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety days that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 21, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. To the extent defendant seeks summary judgment on the First Cause of Action, the motion is granted. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 25, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER VACATING AUGUST 20, 2010 HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 13, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO SEPTEMBER 20, 2010. Settlement Conference re-set for 9/20/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/19/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge June 14, 2010 on Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO DISMISS; DISMISSING SECOND AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. To the extent the motion seeks summary judgment on the First Cause of Action, the motion is granted. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of the Second and Third Causes of Action, the motion is granted, and the Second and Third Causes of Action are dismissed without prejudice, and with leave to amend. Any First Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than May 28, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 7, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER VACATING MAY 7, 2010 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 5, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEND TIME RE: FILING OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The deadline for plaintiff to file opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment is extended to April 19, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 19, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING AIR FORCE'S MOTION TO INTERVENE. The United States Air Force is permitted to intervene in this action for the purpose of presenting its position that authorization and consent exists. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 29, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER VACATING APRIL 9, 2010 HEARING ON UNITED STATES AIR FORCE'S MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 24, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/8/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY PARTIES AT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT. The parties shall participate in the Initial Case Management Conference, scheduled for March 5, 2010, by telephone. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 21, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING JANUARY 15, 2010 HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 13, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. No later than December 11, 2009, BMM shall file its surreply, if any. The hearing on WOTI's motio n to dismiss is continued from December 4, 2009 to January 15, 2010. The Case Management Conference is continued from January 8, 2010 to March 5, 2010; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than February 26, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 24, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SHLOMO D. KATZ PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/26/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMMsoft Inc v. White Oaks Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMMsoft Inc
Represented By: Perry J. Narancic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Oaks Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?