Wagner v. Clark
Petitioner: David John Wagner
Respondent: Ken Clark
Case Number: 3:2009cv04662
Filed: September 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING UNEXHAUSTED CLAIMS AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON REMAINING CLAIM (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David John Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?