Benjamin v. Google Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Anthony M. Benjamin, Sr.
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv04735
Filed: October 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING CASE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 14, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 13, 2010 Filing 27 STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 7, 2010 Filing 26 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
December 21, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Charles Gratz (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 19 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 9, 2009 Filing 19 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Intial CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2010. Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2010 11:00 AM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/7/09. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 4, 2009 Filing 17 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. THIS NOTICE SHOULD BE FILED IN C09-5643*** CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009) Modified on 12/4/2009 (klh, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2009 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: # 1 Cert Serve) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
December 3, 2009 Filing 15 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT - up to and including 1/15/10. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/03/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2009: # 1 Cert Serve) (klh, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2009 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE To Defendant Google re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 12/17/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
December 2, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daralyn J. Durie (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
December 2, 2009 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 16, 2009 Filing 10 Amended Order Granting Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Denying Without Prejudice Leave to File Late (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2009: # 1 cert serve) (klh, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and denying without prejudice 6 request for leave to file late (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2009: # 1 cert serv) (klh, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2009 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Anthony M. Benjamin, Sr. Service waived by Google Inc. waiver sent on 11/2/2009, answer due 1/4/2010. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
October 23, 2009 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiff Re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 11/6/9. (Attachments: # 1 Cert Serve) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 7 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony M. Benjamin, Sr.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 6 REQUEST for leave to efile one day late by Anthony M. Benjamin, Sr. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 13, 2009 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 5, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
October 5, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2010. Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
October 5, 2009 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anthony M. Benjamin, Sr. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
October 5, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement and Statutory Damages against Google Inc. (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Anthony M. Benjamin, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony M. Benjamin, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?