Douglas et al v. Town of Portola Valley et al
Plaintiff: Michael Douglas and Lisa Douglas
Defendant: Town of Portola Valley, West Bay Sanitary District, Christopher Buja, George Mader, Luis Mejia and Sausal Creek Associates
Case Number: 3:2009cv04788
Filed: October 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Alter Judgment (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/5/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on August 26, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on July 29, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 23 Motion to Dismiss; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss; granting 26 Motion to Dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER to continue CMC re 29 Stipulation filed by West Bay Sanitary District Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/24/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 5 Motion to Dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to continue CMC and time to respond to complaint re 12 Stipulation filed by West Bay Sanitary District Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2010 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/5/10. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010) Modified on 1/15/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas et al v. Town of Portola Valley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Douglas
Represented By: Bradley Mark Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Douglas
Represented By: Bradley Mark Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Portola Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Bay Sanitary District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Buja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Mader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sausal Creek Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?