Wang v. Asset Acceptance LLC

Plaintiff: Johnny Wang
Defendant: Asset Acceptance LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv04797
Filed: October 8, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2011 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting motion hearing (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
September 2, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacting all dates and motions (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
July 6, 2011 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing hearing dates (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
May 13, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To Disclose Credit Information Of Plaintiff And Other Consumers Who May Fall Within A Potential Settlement Class Proposed By Plaintiff (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
March 30, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 22, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Insurance Carrier Appearance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/22/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
January 24, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2011 03:00 PM. Settlement Conference set for 3/24/2011 09:30 AM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
November 2, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2010 03:00 PM. Settlement Conference set for 1/25/2011 09:30 AM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 1, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM FEBRUARY 2, 2010 ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
August 31, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting request to withdraw as counsel. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 24, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing motion to 11/4/10 @ 9 a.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
July 27, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 21, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: JOINDER TO PROTECTIVE ORDER BY TRANS UNION(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 6, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO FILE A SUR-REPLY AND RESETTING HEARING (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 17, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 9/3/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 2, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending deadline for mediation (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 1, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL AFTER PLEADINGS ARE FINALIZED re 52 , 53 .(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
April 23, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting 7/9/10 for motion and cmc (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 9, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
February 2, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss; granting leave to file Sur-Reply and treating Section III of 26 Motion to Strike as Sur-Reply (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
January 27, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 11 Motion to Remand (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Asset Acceptance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Wang
Represented By: Harry Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Acceptance LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Topor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?