Doherty v. City of Alameda et al
Plaintiff: John M. Doherty
Defendant: City of Alameda and City of Alameda Housing and Building Code Hearing and Appeals Board
Case Number: 3:2009cv04961
Filed: October 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 8/9/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 116 Stipulation to Continue Discovery Cut-off and Related Deadlines, filed by John M. Doherty. Discovery due by 3/20/2012. Motions due by 3/30/2012.Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 1/17/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 10/12/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER REMOVING DKT. NO. 98 FROM PUBLIC DOCKET; STRIKING PORTION OF BRIEF; GRANTING REQUEST TO SEAL REMAINDER OF BRIEF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabrth D. Laporte on 6/8/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER EXCUSING APPOINTED COUNSEL FROM APPEARING AT HEARING ON JUNE 9, 2011 re doc 99 Notice (Other) filed by John M. Doherty. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/8/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S LIEN. It is hereby Ordered that Plaintiff, Defendants, and Mr. Grant are each permitted, but not required, to file one brief of no more than four pages each setting forth their cur rent position regarding Mr. Grants attorneys lien motion. Such briefs shall be filed within ten days of the date of this Order. A hearing on the motion shall be held on May 31, 2011 at 9:00 AM. If the Court determines that no hearing is required, it will so notify the parties and Mr. Grant. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/4/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ALLOWING APPEARANCE BY TELEPHONE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/21/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REGARDING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court will continue the case management conference for two months, until 6/21/2011 at 3:00 PM. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within two weeks of the date of this Order why the stay imposed in light of Plaintiff's bankruptcy filing should not be lifted. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/14/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER CONTINUING Further Case Management Conference to 4/5/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco re 85 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/23/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 83 Stipulation filed by City of Alameda, Case stayed.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 12/16/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re 80 Proposed Order filed by City of Alameda. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/7/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER AAPOINTING COUNSEL FOR LIMITED PURPOSE. Signed by Judge Laporte on 7/21/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFF TO PRO BONO PROJECT FOR LIMITED PURPOSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/23/2010. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEY LEE GRANT'S MOTION TO FILE ATTORNEYS' LIEN. Signed by Judge Laporte on 6/15/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Laporte re 38 First MOTION for Reconsideration of 2nd COA in 2nd Amended Complaint filed by John M. Doherty (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Laporte granting 27 Motion to Dismiss Claim Two of Second Amended Complaint With Prejudice (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting in part and denying in part re 6 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re 18 Request for Judicial Notice filed by John M. Doherty. Signed by Judge Laporte on 12/17/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doherty v. City of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Doherty
Represented By: Edward Alan Holtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alameda
Represented By: Teresa Lynn Highsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alameda Housing and Building Code Hearing and Appeals Board
Represented By: Teresa Lynn Highsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?