Doherty v. City of Alameda
Plaintiff: Deanna Doherty
Defendant: City of Alameda
Case Number: 3:2009cv04962
Filed: October 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/4/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUA SPONTE ORDER JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES AND ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE DEADLINE FOR REPLY BRIEF. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/14/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doherty v. City of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alameda
Represented By: Teresa Lynn Highsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?