Bucheit v. Dennis et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan B. Bucheit
Defendant: Tony Dennis, Dean Devlugt, Town of Atherton and County of San Mateo
Case Number: 3:2009cv05000
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER WITHDRAWING BILL OF COSTS re 337 Costs Taxed.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 02/20/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER re Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 4, 2013. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 304 Motion for Attorney Fees (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 321 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the hearing on 304 MOTION for Attorney Fees to 11/16/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 07/03/2012. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER GRANTING re 316 Notice of Substitution of Counsel of Moira Duvernay filed by Jonathan B. Buckheit. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/1/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER GRANTING re 284 STIPULATION FURTHER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE MOTIONS, PLEADINGS, AND ACTIONS filed by Town of Atherton. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/25/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 283 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE MOTIONS, PLEADINGS AND ACTIONS - until COB on 4/26/12. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/23/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero Granting 157 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 173 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 187 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 188 Motion for Summary Judgment (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER For Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 10, 2012. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 224 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ALLOW COUNSEL TO SERVE AND VIEW DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF THE PARTIES' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/22/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER DENYING re 155 Stipulation to Exceed 25 Page Limit filed by Town of Atherton. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/14/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS FILING AND THE HEARING DATE RE SAME. Motions filed by 12/16/2011 Responses due by 1/13/2012. Replies due by 1/27/2012. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed, AS MODIFIED, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/9/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER TO FILE JOINT LETTER. Joint letter on outstanding discovery disputes, not to exceed ten pages, to be filed within one week. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/29/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER DENYING re 119 Letter filed by Anthony Kockler, Tony Dennis, Dean Devlugt AND ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/2/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero Granting 87 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER for Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 9, 2011. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 1/7/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING re 86 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Anthony Kockler. Joseph C. Howard, Jr., substitutes as counsel of record in place of Jeffrey M. Vucinich. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/3/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DISCOVERY ORDER re 82 Letter filed by Jonathan B. Buckheit. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/22/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero Granting in Part and Denying in Part 55 Motion to Dismiss (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE OPPOSITION TO SAN MATEO COUNTY'S MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by County of San Mateo. Opposition due by 7/30/2010. Replies due by 8/6/2010. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 07/22/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEF TOWN OF ATHERTON'S MOTON TO DISMISS Responses due by 4/2/2010. Replies due by 4/9/2010. Motion Hearing re-set for 5/7/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/23/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/10/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE OPPOSITION TO THE COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/26/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bucheit v. Dennis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan B. Bucheit
Represented By: Jerry Y. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Devlugt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Atherton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?