Goodwin v. Potter
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Goodwin
Defendant: John E. Potter
Case Number: 3:2009cv05080
Filed: October 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 19, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ACCEPTING PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE BRIEF, RESETTING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT'S REPLY, AND RESETTING HEARING DATE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR MORE TIME TO OPPOSE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER, Motions terminated: 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Lisa M. Goodwin. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2011 08:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 21, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?