Wellliving Corporation v. Cardiel et al
Plaintiff: Wellliving Corporation
Defendant: Buddy Cardiel, Lisa Wiley and Poweredge Baseball
Case Number: 3:2009cv05101
Filed: October 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING DEF CARDIEL; ORDER CLOSING FILE re 16 Proposed Order filed by Wellliving Corporation. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/12/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING CMC; ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/26/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER CONTINUING CMC; ORDER RE CASE STATUS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/25/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wellliving Corporation v. Cardiel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wellliving Corporation
Represented By: Ray Khem Shahani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buddy Cardiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poweredge Baseball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?