James et al v. The United States of America

Plaintiff: James W. James
Defendant: The United States of America and Duke Terrell
Case Number: 3:2009cv05149
Filed: October 30, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 16 Motion to Change Venue (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 7, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 16 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; or, in the Alternative MOTION to Change Venue - FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b) MOTION to Change Venue - FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b) filed by The United States of America. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/7/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 3, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE EXHIBIT A TO BITZ DECLARATION re 17 Declaration in Support, filed by The United States of America. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/3/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 2, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING re 21 Order to Show Cause; ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/2/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 27, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/26/2010 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/12/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/27/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 12, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/12/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
April 30, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR U.S. MARSHAL TO COMPLETE SERVICE FORTHWITH; ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/30/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
January 27, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC & RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/27/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
November 3, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/3/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?