Power Integrations, Inc. v. Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Power Integrations, Inc.
Defendant: Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation and System General Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv05235
Filed: November 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 1079 MANDATE of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #992 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #1039 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #992 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #1039 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. The decision of the district court is affirmed in part, vacated in part and remanded. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #992 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #1039 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #992 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #1039 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 ORDER of USCA as to #992 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #1039 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Patrick J. Stafford is removed as counsel of record for defendants. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/01/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 26, 2018 Filing 1073 NOTICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF JOSHUA ENGEL PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/10/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 9, 2018 Filing 1071 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joshua Engel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12258375.) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Engel, Joshua) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1070 NOTICE of Appearance by Colette Reiner Mayer (Mayer, Colette) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 ORDER APPROVING SUPERSEDEAS BOND AND STAYING ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/22/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 1068 MOTION for Bond Fairchild's Unopposed Motion for Entry of Supersedeas Bond and Stay of Enforcement of Judgment, MOTION to Stay re #1038 Order filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Responses due by 7/5/2017. Replies due by 7/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 ORDER DENYING FAIRCHILD'S MOTION FOR WAIVER OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND; SETTING BOND AMOUNT; EXTENDING TEMPORARY STAY. (Redacted public version.) The temporary stay is extended to June 26, 2017. Should Fairchild wish to maintain the stay pending appeal, it is directed to post, no later than June 26, 2017, a supersedeas bond in the amount of $146,480,598. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/26/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 ORDER DENYING FAIRCHILD'S MOTION FOR WAIVER OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND; SETTING BOND AMOUNT; EXTENDING TEMPORARY STAY; FILED UNDER SEAL. The temporary stay is extended to June 26, 2017. Should Fairchild wish to maintain the stay pending appeal, it is directed to post, no later than June 26, 2017, a supersedeas bond in the amount of $146,480,598. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF WARREN K. MABEY, JR. Attorney Warren Keith Mabey, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 23, 2017 Filing 1064 NOTICE by Power Integrations, Inc. of Withdrawal of Warren K. Mabey, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 ORDER GRANTING FAIRCHILD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Fairchild's administrative motion to seal the following documents is granted: (1) Fairchild's Reply in Support of its Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond; and (2) the Declaration of Bernard Colpitts in Support of Fairchild's Reply. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/19/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 ORDER GRANTING POWER INTEGRATIONS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Power Integrations' administrative motion to seal the following documents is granted: (1) Power Integrations' Opposition to Fairchild's Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond; and (2) the Declaration of John D. Putnam in Support of Power Integrations' Opposition. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/19/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 ORDER GRANTING FAIRCHILD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Fairchild's administrative motion to seal the following documents is granted: (1) Fairchild's Administrative Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Fairchild's Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond; (2) Fairchild's Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond; (3) Exhibit A to the Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick in Support of Fairchild's Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond; (4) the Declaration of Bernard A. Colpitts in Support of Fairchild's Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond; and (5) Exhibits B-D to the Declaration of Bernard Colpitts. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/19/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 16, 2017 Filing 1060 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/05/17, before Judge Chesney. Court Reporter Pamela A Batalo, telephone number pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Tape Number: pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1056 Transcript Order, #1055 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 6/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2017. (Related documents(s) #1056 , #1055 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1059 STATUS REPORT re Bond (JOINT) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 10, 2017 Filing 1058 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Blair M Jacobs (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
May 9, 2017 Filing 1057 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Gary R. Gleason (withdrawing Gary R. Gleason as counsel of record) (Gleason, Gary) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 8, 2017 Filing 1056 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/05/2017 before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney by Power Integrations, Inc., for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
May 8, 2017 Filing 1055 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 5, 2017 before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
May 5, 2017 Filing 1054 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Motion Hearing held on 5/5/2017. re #1041 MOTION to Stay re #1038 Order Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation Total Time in Court 1:33. Court Reporter Name Pamela Batalo. Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach, Howard Pollack, Michael Headley. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs, Christina Ondrick. Attachment Civil Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2017)
April 17, 2017 Filing 1053 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Reply in Support of its Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond [Dkt. 1041] and Supporting Declaration of Bernard Colpitts filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Fairchild's Reply in Support of its Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond REDACTED, #4 Fairchild's Reply in Support of its Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond SEALED, #5 Declaration of Bernard Colpitts in Support of Reply REDACTED, #6 Declaration of Bernard Colpitts in Support of Reply SEALED, #7 Exhibit A to Colpitts Declaration, #8 Exhibit B to Colpitts Declaration, #9 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick in Support of Reply, #10 Exhibit A to Ondrick Declaration)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 13, 2017 Filing 1052 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick in Support of #1049 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1049 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 10, 2017 Filing 1050 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1041 MOTION to Stay re #1038 Order Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond (REDACTED) ) (REDACTED) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Putnam (REDACTED), #2 Declaration of Michael Headley, #3 Proposed Order Denying FCS's Motion)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
April 10, 2017 Filing 1049 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of PI's Opp to FCS's Mot Requesting Stay of Execution, #4 Unredacted Version of PI's Opp to FCS's Mot Requesting Stay of Execution, #5 Redacted Version of Putnam Dec ISO PI's Opposition, #6 Unredacted Version of Putnam Dec ISO PI's Opposition, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service of unredacted documents)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
April 4, 2017 Filing 1051 USCA Case Number/Notice of Docketing 17-1875 USCA for the Federal Circuit for #1039 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT; DENYING AS MOOT FAIRCHILD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/29/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 29, 2017 Filing 1047 MOTION for Leave to File Fairchild's Reply in Support of Its Administrative Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Fairchild's Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond and Supporting Declaration with Exhibits filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fairchild's Reply and Supporting Declaration with Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 28, 2017 Filing 1045 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1040 MOTION to Expedite Fairchild's Administrative Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Fairchild's Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond (REDACTED) ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
March 28, 2017 Filing 1044 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE Clarifying Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule as to #1041 MOTION to Stay re #1038 Order Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond (REDACTED). Response due by 4/10/2017. Reply due by 4/17/2017. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Counsel are advised that the Court will consider Defendant's Administrative Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Defendant's Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
March 28, 2017 Filing 1043 CLERK'S NOTICE Clarifying Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule as to #1041 MOTION to Stay re #1038 Order Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond (REDACTED). Responses due by 4/10/2017. Reply due by 4/17/2017. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Counsel are advised that the Court will consider Defendant's Administrative Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017) Modified on 3/28/2017 (tlS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2017 Notice of Appeal re #1039 e-mailed to USCA for the Federal Circuit. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit (2016-2691) as to #992 Notice of Appeal: If any party wishes to appeal the newly entered judgment, it shall file a notice of appeal within five business days and immediately notify this court of that filing. See Fed. R. App. P. 2. Upon receipt of that notice, this court will consolidate any new appeal with the above noted appeals and lift the stay of proceedings.(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 27, 2017 Filing 1042 Fairchild's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to Expedite the Briefing and Hearing Date, Fairchild's Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond, Certain Exhibit in Support of the Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick, the Declaration of Bernard Colpitts and Exhibits B-D in Support of Same filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Fairchilds Administrative Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Fairchilds Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond (REDACTED), #4 Fairchilds Administrative Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Fairchilds Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond (UNDER SEAL), #5 Fairchilds Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond (REDACTED), #6 Fairchilds Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond (UNDER SEAL), #7 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick (REDACTED), #8 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick (UNDER SEAL), #9 Declaration of Bernard Colpitts (REDACTED), #10 Declaration of Bernard Colpitts (UNDER SEAL), #11 Exhibit B to the Colpitts Declaration (REDACTED), #12 Exhibit B to the Colpitts Declaration (UNDER SEAL), #13 Exhibit C to the Colpitts Declaration (REDACTED), #14 Exhibit C to the Colpitts Declaration (UNDER SEAL), #15 Exhibit D to the Colpitts Declaration (REDACTED), #16 Exhibit D to the Colpitts Declaration (UNDER SEAL))(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 3/27/2017) Modified on 3/28/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2017 Filing 1041 MOTION to Stay re #1038 Final Judgment - Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 4/10/2017. Replies due by 4/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick, #2 Exhibit A to the Ondrick Declaration (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit B to the Ondrick Declaration, #4 Declaration of Bernard Colpitts (REDACTED), #5 Exhibit A to the Colpitts Declaration, #6 Exhibit B to the Colpitts Declaration (REDACTED), #7 Exhibit C to the Colpitts Declaration (REDACTED), #8 Exhibit D to the Colpitts Declaration (REDACTED), #9 Exhibit E to the Colpitts Declaration, #10 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 3/27/2017) Modified on 3/28/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2017 Filing 1040 MOTION to Expedite Fairchild's Administrative Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Fairchild's Motion for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Waiver of Requirement to Post Supersedeas Bond (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 27, 2017 Filing 1039 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit 17-1875 by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 0971-11263507. Appeal Record due by 4/26/2017. (Smith, Kevin) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 1038 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/10/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 9, 2017 Filing 1037 PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2017) Modified on 3/10/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2017 Filing 1036 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Alexander Smith (Smith, Kevin) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 ORDER RE. POWER INTEGRATIONS' STATUS REPORT REGARDING FINAL JUDGMENT. The parties shall file, no later than March 9, 2017, a Joint Status Report reflecting the parties' consensus or separate positions on the question of whether an amended judgment is necessary and, if so, the form thereof. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 1034 MANDATE of USCA for the Federal Circuit (17-1023) as to #1001 Notice of Cross Appeal. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 22, 2017 Filing 1032 Response re #1030 Status Report byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RELIEF AND TO VACATE JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/22/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 21, 2017 Filing 1030 STATUS REPORT REGARDING FINAL JUDGMENT by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 1029 RESPONSE to re #1027 Order,, Granting in part and Denying in part Fairchild's Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits in Support of Its Motion to Stay by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F REDACTED, #2 Exhibit G)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/17/2017) Modified on 2/21/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #992 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit: Mandate/ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #1001 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Federal Circuit,(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
February 14, 2017 Amended Notice of Appeal re #1026 e-mailed to USCA for the Federal Circuit. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART FAIRCHILD'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STAY; DIRECTIONS TO FAIRCHILD. To the extent the motion seeks to file under seal the redacted lines on pages 58 and 61 of Exhibit F, the motion is granted. In all other respects, the motion is denied and Fairchild is directed to file in the public record, no later than February 20, 2017, a redacted version of Exhibit F, in which only the above-referenced lines are redacted, and an unredacted version of Exhibit G. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 10, 2017 Filing 1028 Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Amendment of No. #992 ) (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
February 10, 2017 Filing 1026 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - ERRONEOSU EVENT WAS USED***AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. to the Federal Circuit. Appeal Record due by 3/13/2017. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/10/2017) Modified on 2/14/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RELIEF AND TO VACATE JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Roger Fulghum is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/03/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
February 2, 2017 Filing 1023 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Roger Fulghum ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11123901.) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 2/2/2017) Modified on 2/3/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2017 Filing 1022 REPLY (re #1019 MOTION to Vacate Fairchilds Motion for Relief and to Vacate Judgment ) Fairchild's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Relief and To Vacate Judgment filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 20, 2017 Filing 1021 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1019 MOTION to Vacate Fairchilds Motion for Relief and to Vacate Judgment ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENHANCED DAMAGES AND ATTORNEYS' FEES; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 1019 Fairchilds MOTION for Relief and to Vacate Judgment filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 1/20/2017. Replies due by 1/27/2017. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/6/2017) Modified on 1/9/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2016 Filing 1018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Telephone Conference held on 12/16/2016. Defendant's Rule 60 Motion due by 1/6/2017. Plaintiff's Opposition due by 1/20/2017. Defendant's Reply due by 1/27/2017. Defendant's Rule 60 Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney.Total Time in Court 23 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney Howard Pollack, Michael Headley. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs, Christina Ondrick. Attachment Civil Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2016)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/15/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 14, 2016 Filing 1016 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/16/2016 09:30 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Defense counsel shall set-up the conference call and provide the Court and opposing counsel dial-in instructions.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 13, 2016 Filing 1015 RESPONSE to re #1014 Statement, of Recent Decision and Request for Status Conference by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 12, 2016 Filing 1014 Statement of Recent Decision and Request for Status Conference by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY. The hearing scheduled for December 16, 2016, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/12/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 2, 2016 Filing 1012 REPLY (re #1006 MOTION to Stay ) filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
November 25, 2016 Filing 1010 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1006 MOTION to Stay ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/25/2016)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 ORDER of USCA as to #1001 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Federal Circuit: The motion to stay is granted. The briefing schedule is stayed. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 ORDER RE PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AWARD. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the Court awards $6,680,598 in prejudgment interest to plaintiff. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/16/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 1008 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #1007 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits F & G in Support of Fairchild's Motion to Stay (Dkt.No. 1006) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1007 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 1007 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits F & G in Support of Fairchild's Motion to Stay (Dkt.No. 1006) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit F (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit G (Under Seal), #6 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 1006 MOTION to Stay filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/25/2016. Replies due by 12/2/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
October 31, 2016 Filing 1005 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #999 Order, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Prejudgment Interest Award filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Power Integrations, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 24, 2016 Filing 1004 Brief re #999 Order, Brief Submitted Pursuant to Dkt. 999 re Calculation of Prejudgment Interest Award filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James E. Malackowski (2nd Supplemental)(Related document(s) #999 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 24, 2016 Filing 1003 Supplemental Brief re Prejudgment Interest Per Court's Orders of #986 Aug. 24 and #999 Oct. 3 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Putnam Dec of 10/24)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 1002 USCA Case Number/Notice of Docketing 17-1023 USCA for the Federal Circuit for #1001 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 5, 2016 Notice of Appeal re #1001 e-mailed to USCA for the Federal Circuit. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 1001 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to the Federal Circuit 17-1023 as to #992 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, by Power Integrations, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-10824519. Appeal Record due by 10/24/2016. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 1000 RESPONSE (re #998 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Fairchild's Supplemental Brief Regarding Halo, Willful Infringement, and Exceptional Case Per DKT. No. 981 ) Fairchilds Opposition To Power Integrations Motion For Leave To File A Reply Brief filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 999 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: CALCULATION OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AWARD. Opposition briefs due October 24, 2016. Reply briefs due October 31, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/03/2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 998 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Fairchild's Supplemental Brief Regarding Halo, Willful Infringement, and Exceptional Case Per DKT. No. 981 filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment - PI Supplemental Reply Brief re Halo, #2 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 28, 2016 Filing 997 Brief re #990 Brief, Power Integrations' Response Brief Regarding Halo, Willful Infringement, and Exceptional Case Per Dkt. No. 981 - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #994 AND #995 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Exhibit A to Michael R. Headley Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Michael R. Headley Declaration)(Related document(s) #990 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2016) Modified on 9/29/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2016 Filing 996 Supplemental Brief re #990 Brief, Responsive Supplemental Brief on the Impact of Halo filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #990 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 27, 2016 Filing 995 EXHIBITS re #994 Brief, : Exhibit B to the Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of Power Integrations' Response Brief Regarding Halo, Willful Infringement, and Exceptional Case Per Dkt. No. 981 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #994 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 27, 2016 Filing 994 Brief re #990 Brief, : Power Intergrations' Response Brief Regarding Halo, Willful Infringment, and Exceptional Case Per Dkt. No. 981 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael R. Headley)(Related document(s) #990 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 23, 2016 Filing 993 USCA Case Number/Notice of Docketing 16-2691 USCA for the Federal Circuit for #992 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 22, 2016 Notice of Appeal re #992 e-mailed to USCA for the Federal Circuit.(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
September 22, 2016 Filing 992 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit 16-2691, by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 25U202UE. Appeal Record due by 10/24/2016. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
September 22, 2016 Filing 991 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #992 *** NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10791463 paid.) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/22/2016) Modified on 9/22/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2016 Filing 990 Brief re #981 Order,, Fairchilds Opening Statement re Willfulness and Enhancement filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #981 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
September 13, 2016 Filing 989 Supplemental Brief Regarding Halo, Willful Infringement, & Exceptional Case Per #981 Order of 6/28/16 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Headley, #2 Exhibit A)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
September 9, 2016 Filing 988 NOTICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. of Supplemental Statement re Prejudgment Interest Pursuant to Court's Order DKT 986 (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of James E. Malackowski)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 9, 2016 Filing 987 NOTICE by Power Integrations, Inc. of Supplemental Declaration re Prejudgment Interest Per Court's 8/24/16 Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Putnam)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 986 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, NEW TRIAL, AND/OR REMITTITUR; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 985 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION. The Request is granted as to Exhibit B attached thereto, which the Court will consider, and in all other respects the Request is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 3, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 28, 2016 Filing 984 RESPONSE (re #983 MOTION for Leave to File ) Power Integrations' Objections to Fairchild's Request for Leave to File a Statement of Recent Decisions filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 28, 2016 Electronic filing error Re: #983 Notice (Other), filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation. Incorrect event used [err101]. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 27, 2016 Filing 983 MOTION for Leave to File a Statement of Recent Decisions by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C- Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 7/27/2016) Modified on 7/28/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2016 Filing 982 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/17/2016, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly L. Polvi, telephone number 503.779.7406; kpolvi@comcast.net. Tape Number: kpolvi@comcast.net. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #979 Transcript Order, #978 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2016. (Related documents(s) #979 , #978 ) (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 981 ORDER SETTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (1) Each party shall file, no later than twenty days after the Court rules on defendants' "Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur," filed February 12, 2016, an opening brief not to exceed ten pages in length. (2) Each party shall file, no later than fourteen days after the deadline for opening briefs, a responsive brief not to exceed ten pages in length. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 24, 2016 Filing 980 STATUS REPORT AND PARTIES' PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE (JOINT) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 24, 2016 Filing 979 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/17/2016 before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., for Court Reporter Kelly Polvi. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 24, 2016 Filing 978 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/17/2016 before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney by Power Integrations, Inc., for Court Reporter Kelly Polvi. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 20, 2016 Filing 977 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Motion Hearing held on 6/17/2016. re #954 MOTION (Renewed) for Prejudgment Interest filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #955 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Fairchild's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation Total Time in Court 3:11. Court Reporter Name Kelly Polvi. Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach; Michael Headley; Howard Pollack. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs; Christina Ondrick; Patrick Stafford. Attachment Civil Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2016)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 976 ORDER RE ENTRY OF EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURT FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 58. The parties shall contact the Deputy Clerk to arrange for access to the courtroom. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 10, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
June 9, 2016 Filing 975 MOTION Fairchild's Unopposed Motion re Entry of Equipment into the Court for Hearing Pursuant to General Order No. 58 filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Responses due by 6/23/2016. Replies due by 6/30/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 974 RESPONSE to re #972 Order,, Terminate Motions, Exhibit D to Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild Opposition to Motion for Prejudgment Interest (Originally Submitted Under Seal as Dkt. No. 963-3) by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 973 Response re #971 Order,, Terminate Motions, Power Integrations Reply in Support of Motion for Prejudgment Interest (Originally Submitted Under Seal as Dkt. No. 968-4, Re-filed Per Dkt. No. 971) byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C to Headley Decl ISO Power Integrations Reply (Originally Submitted Under Seal as Dkt. No. 968-5))(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 972 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT D IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 16, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 971 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTION OF ITS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBIT; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 16, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 970 Declaration of Jonathan D. Putnam in Support of #969 Reply to Opposition/Response, Regarding Mot for Prejudgment Interest filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #969 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 969 REPLY (re #954 MOTION (Renewed) for Prejudgment Interest ) (REDACTED) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C - Sought to be filed under seal)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 968 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re PI's Reply ISO Mtn for Prejudgment Interest filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Reply, #4 Unredacted Vers. of Reply, #5 Unredacted Vers. of Ex. C, #6 Proof of Svc of Unredacted Docs)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 967 REPLY (re #955 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Fairchild's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 ) filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 966 Brief re #938 Brief, Replying in Support of PI's Motion for Enhanced Damages & Fees filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #938 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
March 29, 2016 Filing 965 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #963 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit D in Support of Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Renewed Motion for Prejudgment Interest filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #963 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 28, 2016 Filing 964 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. re #962 Opposition/Response to Motion,, (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 963 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit D in Support of Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Renewed Motion for Prejudgment Interest filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick Decl ISO, #2 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit D, #4 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 962 RESPONSE (re #954 MOTION (Renewed) for Prejudgment Interest ) Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Renewed Motion for Prejudgment Interest filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick Decl ISO, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D (filed under seal), #6 Declaration James E. Malackowski Decl ISO)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 961 Fairchild's RESPONSE/Opposition to #938 Power Integrations' Renewed Motion Requesting a Declaration That This Case is Exceptional and for Award of Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 3/25/2016) Modified on 3/28/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2016 Filing 960 RESPONSE (re #955 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Fairchild's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
February 29, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #955 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Fairchild's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59, #954 MOTION (Renewed) for Prejudgment Interest . Motion(s) Hearing reset to 6/17/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 959 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF POWER INTEGRATIONS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING A CHANGE IN HEARING SCHEDULE AND LEAVE TO FILE ITS RENEWED MOTION FOR INJUNCTION. The hearing on the parties' post-trial motions (excluding Power Integrations' renewed request for an injunction) is rescheduled to June 17, 2016. Given the number and complexity of issues raised in the two pending post-trial motions, Power Integrations's renewed request for an injunction shall not be filed prior to the date on which said two motions are resolved. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 29, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 958 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF EXHIBITS B - E TO ONDRICK DECLARATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 19, 2016 Filing 957 RESPONSE/Opposition (re #956 MOTION Requesting a Change in Hearing Schedule & Leave to File Renewed Motion for Injunction ) filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration B. Jacobs ISO, #2 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/19/2016) Modified on 2/22/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2016 Filing 956 MOTION Requesting a Change in Hearing Schedule & Leave to File Renewed Motion for Injunction filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 3/2/2016. Replies due by 3/9/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 12, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #955 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Fairchild's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59. Responses due by 3/25/2016. Replies due by 4/15/2016. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 12, 2016 Filing 955 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Fairchild's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 2/26/2016. Replies due by 3/4/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 12, 2016 Filing 954 MOTION (Renewed) for Prejudgment Interest filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 3/25/2016. Replies due by 4/15/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jonathan D. Putnam)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 2, 2016 Filing 953 Brief re #943 Order,,, [REDACTED] Power Integrations' Opposition to Fairchild's Motion to Exclude Jonthan D. Putnam, and Supporting REDACTED Exhibits 1 and 3 to the Declaration of Michael R. Headley filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Headley Declaration in support of Power Integrations' Opp to Fairchild's Mot to Exclude Putnam Testimony [REDACTED], #2 Exhibit 3 to Headley Declaration in support of Power Integrations' Opp to Fairchild's Mot to Exclude Putnam Testimony [REDACTED])(Related document(s) #943 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
February 2, 2016 Filing 952 Brief re #944 Order,,, Power Integrations' Opposition to Fairchild's Motion to Exclude Arthur Kelley and Charles Colby, and Supporting Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration of Michael R. Headley filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Headley Declaration in support of Power Integrations' Opp to Fairchild's Mot to Exclude Kelley and Colby Testimony, #2 Exhibit 2 part 1 to Headley Declaration in support of Power Integrations' Opp to Fairchild's Mot to Exclude Kelley and Colby Testimony, #3 Exhibit 2 part 2 to Headley Declaration in support of Power Integrations' Opp to Fairchild's Mot to Exclude Kelley and Colby Testimony)(Related document(s) #944 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
February 2, 2016 Filing 951 MOTION Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Arthur W. Kelley and Charles L. Colby (REDACTED) re #942 Order,,, filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Responses due by 2/16/2016. Replies due by 2/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1 (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit A Part 2 (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit B (REDACTED))(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
February 2, 2016 Filing 950 MOTION Reply Brief in Further Support of Fairchild's Motioin to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam re #946 Order,, filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Responses due by 2/16/2016. Replies due by 2/23/2016. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
February 2, 2016 Filing 949 MOTION Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei re #945 Order,, filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Responses due by 2/16/2016. Replies due by 2/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit F (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit G (REDACTED))(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
February 2, 2016 Filing 948 MOTION Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam (REDACTED) re #941 Order,, filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Responses due by 2/16/2016. Replies due by 2/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit B (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit C (REDACTED))(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 27, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #932 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion Requesting Declaration that this Case is Exceptional and for Award of Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees, Opposition due by 3/25/2016. Replies due by 4/15/2016. Motion Hearing reset to 5/13/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 947 ORDER DENYING FAIRCHILD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION RE: PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 946 ORDER RE: FAIRCHILD'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF JONATHAN D. PUTNAM; DIRECTIONS TO FAIRCHILD. The Court grants the "Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Brief in Further Support of Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam," and Fairchild is directed to file in the public record, no later than February 2, 2016, a version of the reply brief in which the parties' confidential material, as identified in their respective supplemental responses, is redacted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 945 ORDER RE: FAIRCHILD'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITION TO POWER INTEGRATIONS'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE GU-YEON WEI, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS; DIRECTIONS TO FAIRCHILD. The Court denies the administrative motion to the extent it seeks to seal Exhibits B, F, and G and related portions of the Opposition, and Fairchild is directed to file in the public record, no later than February 2, 2016, the unredacted version of each said exhibit, and a version of the Opposition with only those portions redacted that reference Exhibits D, E, H, and I. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 944 ORDER RE: POWER INTEGRATIONS'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE ARTHUR W. KELLEY AND CHARLES L. COLBY, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS; DIRECTIONS TO POWER INTEGRATIONS. The administrative motion is denied to the extent it seeks permission to seal Exhibit 1 to the Headley Declaration and related portions of the Opposition, and Power Integrations is directed to file in the public record, no later than February 2, 2016, Exhibit 1 and the unredacted Opposition. To the extent the administrative motion seeks permission to seal portions of Exhibit 2 to the Headley Declaration, the motion is granted, and Power Integrations is directed to file in the public record, no later than February 2, 2016, a version of said exhibit in which the parties' confidential material, as identified in their respective supplemental responses, is redacted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 943 ORDER RE: POWER INTEGRATIONS'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITION TO FAIRCHILD'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE JONATHAN D. PUTNAM, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS; DIRECTIONS TO POWER INTEGRATIONS. The Court grants the administrative motion to the extent it seeks to seal portions of Exhibit 1, Exhibit 3, and the Opposition, and Power Integrations is directed to file in the public record, no later than February 2, 2016, a version of each said exhibit in which the parties' confidential material, as identified in their respective supplemental responses, is redacted, and a version of the Opposition in which references to Exhibit 2 and the parties' confidential material, as identified in their respective supplemental responses, are redacted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 942 ORDER RE: FAIRCHILD'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE ARTHUR W. KELLEY AND CHARLES L. COLBY, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS; DIRECTIONS TO FAIRCHILD. To the extent the administrative motion seeks permission to seal Exhibit B and portions of the Motion to Exclude that refer to Exhibit A or B, the motion is denied, and Fairchild is directed to file in the public record, no later than February 2, 2016, Exhibit B and a version of the Motion to Exclude in which only those portions that reference Exhibit C are redacted. The Court grants the administrative motion to the extent it seeks to seal portions of Exhibit A, and Fairchild is directed to file in the public record, no later than February 2, 2016, a version of said exhibit in which Power Integrations's confidential material, as identified in its supplemental response, is redacted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 941 ORDER RE: FAIRCHILD'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE JONATHAN D. PUTNAM, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS; DIRECTIONS TO FAIRCHILD. The Court grants the administrative motion to the extent it seeks to seal the material in Exhibits A - C and the Motion to Exclude identified as sealable in the parties' supplemental responses, and Fairchild is directed to file in the public record, no later than February 2, 2016, a version of each said exhibit and the Motion to Exclude in which the parties' confidential material, as identified in their respective supplemental responses, is redacted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 25, 2016 Filing 940 RESPONSE (re #939 MOTION for Leave to File Fairchild's Administrative Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Fairchild's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Fairchild's Mot)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 939 MOTION for Leave to File Fairchild's Administrative Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Fairchild's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Administrative Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, #2 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 16, 2016 Filing 938 Brief re #935 Order,,, Terminate Motions,, Power Integrations' Redacted Renewed Motion Requesting a Declaration that This Case is Exceptional and For Award of Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LL to the Decl of Michael R. Headley In Support of Power Integrations' Motion for Exceptional Case)(Related document(s) #935 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/16/2016)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 937 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING POST-TRIAL BRIEFING. The stipulation is approved, with the following directive and addition of a hearing date: (1) Absent a court order approving the filing of any additional post-trial motions, Fairchild is directed to file no more than a single motion for judgment as a matter of law, or, in the alternative, for a new trial, and Power Integrations is directed to file no more than a single motion for prejudgment interest. (2) A hearing on the parties' post-trial motions is scheduled for May 13, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 14, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 13, 2016 Filing 936 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Post-Trial Briefing filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 11, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 1/18/2016. Replies due by 1/25/2016. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 935 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FEES AND EXHIBITS J, LL, AND MM IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Power Integrations's administrative motion to seal is granted as to Exhibits J and MM. To the extent the administrative motion seeks to seal Exhibit LL, the motion is denied. Power Integrations is directed to file in the public record, no later than January 18, 2016, Exhibit LL and a version of the Motion for Fees in which only those portions referencing Exhibits J and MM are redacted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 11, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 8, 2016 Filing 934 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick in Support of #931 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations' Renewed Motion Requesting a Declaration That This Case Is Exceptional And For Award of Enhanced Damages And Attorneys' Fees, and supporting Exhibits J, LL, and MM to the Declara filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #931 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
January 4, 2016 Filing 933 Proposed Order re #932 Declaration in Support,,,, in support of Power Integrations' Renewed Motion Requesting a Declaration that this case is Exceptional and for Award of Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
January 4, 2016 Filing 932 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of Power Integrations' Renewed Motion Requesting A Declaration That This Case Is Exceptional And For Award Of Enhanced Damages And Attorneys' Fees filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
January 4, 2016 Filing 931 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations' Renewed Motion Requesting a Declaration That This Case Is Exceptional And For Award of Enhanced Damages And Attorneys' Fees, and supporting Exhibits J, LL, and MM to the Declaration of Michael R. Headley filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED PI Renewed Mot for Exceptional Case, #4 UNREDACTED PI Renewed Mot for Exceptional Case, #5 REDACTED Exhibit J, #6 UNREDACTED Exhibit J, #7 REDACTED Exhibit LL, #8 UNREDACTED Exhibit LL, #9 REDACTED Exhibit MM, #10 UNREDACTED Exhibit MM, #11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 930 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF AMY LIANG. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 4, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 929 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ENRIQUE D. DUARTE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 4, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 30, 2015 Filing 928 Request/NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael Richard Headley Power Integrations Notice of Withdrawal of Amy Liang (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2015) Modified on 1/4/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2015 Filing 927 Request/NOITCE of Change In Counsel by Michael Richard Headley Power Integrations Notice of Withdrawal of Enrique D. Duarte (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2015) Modified on 1/4/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2015 Filing 926 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 9, held on 12-17-2015, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #769 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (Related documents(s) #769 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 925 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 8, held on 12-16-2015, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 924 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 7, held on 12-15-2015, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 923 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Vol. 6, held on 12-14-2015, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 922 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Power Integrations has proved it is entitled to as a reasonable royalty for infringement through March 4, 2014 in the amount of $139,800,000.00.The jury further finds that in arriving at the above figure, the 079 patented feature created the basis for customer demand for the infringing Fairchild products (Entire Market Value Rule). (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 17, 2015 Filing 921 Defendants' Admitted Exhibits List. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 17, 2015 Filing 920 Plaintiff's Admitted Exhibits List. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 17, 2015 Filing 919 Final Jury Instructions. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 17, 2015 Filing 918 JURY VERDICT - Jury found that Power Integrations is entitled to a reasonable royalty for infringement through March 4, 2014 in the amount of $139,800,000.00. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 17, 2015 Filing 917 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Jury Trial completed on 12/17/2015.Court Reporter Name Debra Pas (20 minutes). Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach, Howard Pollack, Michael Headley. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs, Christina Ondrick, Yar Chaikovsky. Attachment Civil Trial Minutes - 12/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Peremptory Challenge Sheet)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2015)
December 16, 2015 Filing 916 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Jury Trial held on 12/16/2015. Plaintiff's closing argument. Defendant's closing argument. Plaintiff's rebuttal argument. Court gave jury final instructions. Jury began deliberations.Court Reporter Name Belle Ball and Debra Pas (4 hours 37 minutes). Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach; Michael Headley; Howard Pollack. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs; Christina Ondrick; Yar Chaikovsky. Attachment Civil Trial Minutes - 12/16/15. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Trial Log)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2015)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 915 ORDER FOR JURY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/16/15. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 16, 2015 Filing 913 TRIAL BRIEF - Power Integrations' Response to DKT. No. 905 (Defendants' Trial Brief re Apportionment) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 16, 2015 Filing 912 Fairchild's Objection to #908 Proposed Jury Instruction 2.5 by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/16/2015) Modified on 12/16/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2015 Filing 911 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding the '908 Patent Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(a) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/30/2015. Replies due by 1/6/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 16, 2015 Filing 910 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Damages Pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 50(a) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/30/2015. Replies due by 1/6/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 16, 2015 Filing 909 Proposed Form of Verdict by Power Integrations, Inc. conformed per charge conference. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 16, 2015 Filing 908 Proposed Final Jury Instructions by Power Integrations, Inc. conformed per charge conference. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2015) Modified on 12/16/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2015 Filing 914 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Jury Trial held on 12/15/2015.; denying #848 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11. Defense witness(es): Chris Allexandre; Richard Fassler; Douglas Bailey; Bruce Renouard; Peter Vaughan; Dr. Gu-Yeon Wei; James Malackowski. Plaintiff's rebuttal witness Balu Balakrishnan. Court Reporter Name Belle Ball and Debra Pas (5 hours 46 minutes). Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach; Michael Headley; Howard Pollack. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs; Christina Ondrick; Yar Chaikovsky. Attachment Civil Trial Minutes - 12/15/15. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Trial Log)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2015)
December 15, 2015 Filing 907 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Damages filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/29/2015. Replies due by 1/5/2016. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 15, 2015 Filing 906 Proposed Form of Verdict by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. Verdict Form. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 15, 2015 Filing 905 TRIAL BRIEF Fairchild's Trial Brief Regarding Apportionment by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 15, 2015 Filing 904 RESPONSE (re #897 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding the '908 Patent, #898 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Damages Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(a) ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 15, 2015 Filing 902 TRIAL BRIEF re Apportionment Methodology by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 15, 2015 Filing 901 Joint Proposed Final Jury Instructions by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/15/2015) Modified on 12/16/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2015 Filing 900 Revised Proposed Form of Verdict by Power Integrations, Inc. . (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/15/2015) Modified on 12/16/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2015 Filing 899 Fairchild's Addendum to #853 Trial Exhibit List by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/15/2015) Modified on 12/16/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2015 Filing 898 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Damages Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(a) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/29/2015. Replies due by 1/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 15, 2015 Filing 897 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Fairchild's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding the '908 Patent filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/29/2015. Replies due by 1/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 903 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Jury Trial held on 12/14/2015.; denying without prejudice #892 Motion for cautionary jury instruction on entire market value. Plaintiff witness(es): Richard Chang; Kenny Chan; Chandler Lin; Dr. Jonathan Putnam. Defense witness(es): Tom Yang; Gaurang Shah. Court Reporter Name Debra Pas/Belle Ball (6 hours 18 minutes). Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach; Michael Headley; Howard Pollack. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs; Christina Ondrick; Yar Chaikovsky. Attachment Civil Trial Minutes - 12/14/15. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Trial Log)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 896 RESPONSE (re #892 MOTION Fairchild's Motion for Cautionary Jury Instruction on Entire Market Value Rule ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 895 Declaration of Michael R. Headley In Support of #894 Power Integrations' Trial Brief re Fairchild's Alleged "Self-Injunction" After the Liability Verdict filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/14/2015) Modified on 12/14/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2015 Filing 894 TRIAL BRIEF re Fairchild's Alleged "Self-Injunction" after the Liability Verdict by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 893 Proposed Final Jury Instructions by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/14/2015) Modified on 12/14/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2015 Filing 892 MOTION Fairchild's Motion for Cautionary Jury Instruction on Entire Market Value Rule filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/28/2015. Replies due by 1/4/2016. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/13/2015)
December 11, 2015 Filing 891 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2015. re #882 Fairchild's Motion for Continued Protective Order Regarding Dr. Putnam filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation ; ***Motions terminated: #882 .Court Reporter Name Debra Pas (27 minutes). Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach; Michael Headley; Howard Pollack. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs; Christina Ondrick; Yar Chaikovsky. Attachment Civil Trial Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/11/2015)
December 11, 2015 Filing 889 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 5, held on 12-11-2015, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2016. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 11, 2015 Filing 888 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 4, held on 12-10-2015, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431/1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2016. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 11, 2015 Filing 887 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 3, held on 12-9-2015, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2016. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 11, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing Jury Trial set for 12/16/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 11, 2015 Set Hearing Jury Trial set for 12/16/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Jury Trial set for 12/17/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 11, 2015 Filing 886 TRIAL BRIEF re (1) Evidence of SG Customer Demand for the Infringing Products and (2) Standard of Review by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 890 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Jury Trial held on 12/10/2015. Plaintiff's witnesses: Dr. Arthur Kelley; Benjamin Sutherland; Yulin Chen; Gary Lin; K.E. Hong; Ruihong Lu, Mark Norman. Court Reporter Name Debra Pas/ Belle Ball (6 hours 24 minutes). Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach; Michael Headley; Howard Pollack. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs; Christina Ondrick; Yar Chaikovsky. Attachment Civil Trial Minutes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Trial Log)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 885 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 2, held on 12-8-2015, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas,CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2016. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 884 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 1, held on 12-7-2015, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2016. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 883 RESPONSE (re #882 Fairchild's Motion for Continued Protective Order Regarding Dr. Putnam ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/10/2015) Modified on 12/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2015 Filing 882 Fairchild's Motion for Continued Protective Order Regarding Dr. Putnam filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/24/2015. Replies due by 12/31/2015. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/10/2015) Modified on 12/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2015 Filing 881 Fairchild's Objections to Power Integrations' Deposition Designations by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 C. Ondrick Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/10/2015) Modified on 12/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2015 Filing 880 TRIAL BRIEF Fairchild's Trial Brief on Single Functioning Unit by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 C. Ondrick Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 9, 2015 Filing 879 TRIAL BRIEF re Whether Non-Patented Features Can Have Any Value in EMVR Cases by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 9, 2015 Filing 878 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #877 Trial Brief re EMVR "Single Functioning Unit" Test filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A-2 of 2)(Related document(s) #877 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 9, 2015 Filing 877 TRIAL BRIEF RE EMVR "SINGLE FUNCTIONING UNIT" TEST by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 9, 2015 Filing 876 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Jury Trial held on 12/9/2015. Plaintiff witnesses: David Mike Matthews; Richard Chung; Allan Lam; Justin Chiang; Dr. Arthur Kelley. Court Reporter Name Debra Pas / Belle Ball (4 hours 52 minutes). Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach, Howard Pollack, Michael Headley. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs, Christine Ondrick, Yar Chaikovsky. Attachment Civil Trial Minutes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Trial Log)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/9/2015)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 875 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Warren K. Mabey, Jr. is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 9, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 9, 2015 Filing 874 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Warren K. Mabey ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10050730.) filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mabey, Warren) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 873 Declaration of MIchael R. Headley in Support of #848 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Notice and Motion for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 and U.S.C. 285 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #848 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 872 AMENDED DOCUMENT Amendment to #871 Jury Trial Minutes - clerical error - correcting Defense time used to date should be 3 hours 16 minutes,. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 871 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Jury Trial held on 12/8/2015. Plaintiff witness(es): Balu Balakrishnan; David Mike Matthews. Court Reporter Name Debra Pas/Belle Ball (5 hours 53 minutes). Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach; Michael Headley; Howard Pollack. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs; Christina Ondrick; Yar Chaikovsky. Attachment Civil Trial Minutes 12/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Trial Log)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/8/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 870 [Proposed] Curative Instructions Regarding Fairchild's Opening Statement Reference to Its Beliefs/State of Mind on Infringement and Invalidity by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/8/2015) Modified on 12/9/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2015 Filing 869 Fairchild's Objections to Power Integrations' Deposition Designations by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 C. Ondrick Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/8/2015) Modified on 12/9/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2015 Filing 868 TRIAL BRIEF Fairchild's Trial Brief No. 3 Regarding Improper Lay Testimony by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 867 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Jury Selection held, Jury Trial began on 12/7/2015.Court Reporter Name Belle Ball / Debra Pas (4 hours 35 minutes). Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach; Howard Pollack; Michael Headley. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs; Christina Ondrick; Yar Chaikovsky. Attachment Civil Trial Minutes - 12/7/2015. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Trial Log)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 866 Reply to Dkt. No. 856 in Support of Power Integrations' Trial Brief Re EMVR [Dkt. No. 844] by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/7/2015) Modified on 12/7/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2015 Filing 865 RESPONSE to re #859 Trial Brief Fairchild's Response to Power Integrations' Trial Brief to Preclude Fairchild from Contradicting the Jury's Verdict of Inducement by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 864 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A in Support of Fairchild's Trial Brief No. 2 Regarding the Opinions and Related Testimony of Dr. Jonathan D. Putnam filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Declaration C. Ondrick Declaration ISO Fairchild's Trial Brief No. 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A REDACTED, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A SEALED, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 863 TRIAL BRIEF Fairchild's Trial Brief No. 2 Regarding Opinions and Related Testimony of Dr. Jonathan D. Putnam by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 862 Fairchild's Objections to Power Integrations' Opening Demonstratives by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick Declaration In Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/7/2015) Modified on 12/7/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2015 Filing 861 TRIAL BRIEF Fairchild's Trial Brief No. 1 Regarding Copying Evidence by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/6/2015)
December 6, 2015 Filing 860 Declaration of Michael Headley in Support of #859 Trial Brief to Preclude Fairchild from Contradicting the Jury's Verdict of Inducement filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #859 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/6/2015)
December 6, 2015 Filing 859 TRIAL BRIEF to Preclude Fairchild From Contradicting the Jury's Verdict of Inducement by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/6/2015)
December 6, 2015 Filing 858 RESPONSE Brief (re #837 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations Oppositioon to Fairchilds Emergency Motion to Exclude Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam ) Fairchild's Response Brief to Power Integrations' Motion In Limine Relating to Fairchild's Self-Injunction filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick Declaration In Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/6/2015) Modified on 12/7/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2015 Filing 857 Proposed Final Jury Instructions by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/6/2015) Modified on 12/7/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2015 Filing 856 RESPONSE to re #844 Trial Brief Re EMVR by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick Declaration ISO Response, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/6/2015) Modified on 12/7/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2015 Filing 855 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #835 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Fairchild's Emergency Motion to Exclude New Opinions and Related Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #835 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 854 RESPONSE and OBJECTIONS to #839 Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions, #849 Response to Objection, #838 Proposed Statement of the Case by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/4/2015) Modified on 12/7/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2015 Filing 853 Exhibit List Fairchild's Trial Exhibit List by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc... (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 852 Exhibit List - Power Integrations' Supplemental Trial Exhibit List by Power Integrations, Inc... (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 851 ORDER RE: REMOTE REAL TIME TRANSCRIPT FEED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 4, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 850 Proposed Order Regarding Remote Real Time Transcript Feed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 849 RESPONSE and OBJECTIONS to re #840 Defendants' Proposed Statement of the Case, and #841 Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2015) Modified on 12/7/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2015 Filing 848 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Notice and Motion for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 and U.S.C. 285 filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Supplement REDACTED Version of Fairchild's Notice and Motion for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 and U.S.C. 285, #4 Supplement UNREDACTED Version of Fairchild's Notice and Motion for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 and U.S.C. 285, #5 Declaration Declaration of C. Ondrick ISO Motion for Sanctions, #6 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit E, #16 Exhibit Exhibit F, #17 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #18 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 847 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ENTRY OF EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURT FOR TRIAL PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 58. The parties are directed to contact the Deputy Clerk to arrange for access to the courtroom. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 846 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Entry of Equipment into the Court for Trial Pursuant to General Order No. 58 filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ORDER GRANTING IN PART FAIRCHILD'S EMERGENCY MOTION. Power Integrations is compelled to make Jonathan D. Putnam available for deposition at the Paul Hastings LLP office in San Francisco or via telephone, see Fed. R. Civ. P 30(b)(4), at a time mutually agreed upon by the parties, but by no later than Friday, December 4, 2015, unless the parties agree that a later date is acceptable. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 844 TRIAL BRIEF re EMVR by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 2, 2015 Filing 843 Power Integrations Proposed Jury Instructions by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2015) Modified on 12/3/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2015 Filing 842 Proposed Final Jury Instructions by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/2/2015) Modified on 12/3/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2015 Filing 841 Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. Fairchild's Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/2/2015) Modified on 12/3/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2015 Filing 840 Proposed Statement of the Case for Voir Dire by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A in Support)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 12/2/2015) Modified on 12/3/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2015 Filing 839 Power Integrations' Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2015) Modified on 12/3/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2015 Filing 838 Power Integrations' Proposed Statement of the Case for Voir Dire by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2015) Modified on 12/3/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2015 Filing 837 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations Oppositioon to Fairchilds Emergency Motion to Exclude Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Headley Decl ISO Admin Mot to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED PI Opp to FCS Emg Mot re Putnam, #4 UNREDACTED PI Opp to FCS Emg Mot re Putnam, #5 Decl ISO Opp to FCS Emergency MTE Putnam, #6 Ex A to Decl ISO Opp to FCS Emergency MTE Putnam, #7 REDACTED Ex B to Decl ISO Opp to FCS Emergency MTE Putnam, #8 UNREDACTED Ex B to Decl ISO Opp to FCS Emergency MTE Putnam, #9 Ex C to Decl ISO Opp to FCS Emergency MTE Putnam, #10 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
December 1, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing Jury Trial set for 12/7/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney through 12/15/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
December 1, 2015 Filing 836 DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Before the Court is defendants' "Emergency Motion to Exclude New Opinions and Related Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam," filed November 30, 2015. In light of the upcoming trial, plaintiff is directed to file a response by December 2, 2015, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 1, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 835 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Fairchild's Emergency Motion to Exclude New Opinions and Related Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Fairchild's Emergency Motion to Exclude New Opinions and Related Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam, #4 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Emergency Motion, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit G, #14 Exhibit H, #15 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit I, #16 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit I, #17 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit J, #18 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit J, #19 Proposed Order, #20 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 23, 2015 Filing 834 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/17/15, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #830 Transcript Order, #829 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2016. (Related documents(s) #830 , #829 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 833 ORDER GRANTING POWER INTEGRATIONS' MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. Case No. 15-4854 is related to Case No. 09-5235. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 20, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 19, 2015 Filing 832 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/17/2015. Motion in Limine Hearing held on 11/17/2015. re #782 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Reference to Fairchild's Financial Size, Number of Employee, Market Capitalization, and Overall Revenue filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re PI's MILs 2-3, 5-6 & 8 & Supporting Exhibits filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #784 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Reference to Certain Litigation History Between the Parties (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #780 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument on Entire Market Value Rule (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #789 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 10 to Preclude Testimony or Evidence that the '079 Patent was Disruptive or Necessary for Energy Star (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #786 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 7 to Preclude Certain Testimony on Predecessor Products (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #781 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Opinion Testimony on Customer Preferences (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #788 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 9 to Preclude Reliance on Unsupported Factual Assumptions (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #787 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 8 to Preclude Expert Testimony on Apportionment filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #783 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Reference to Fairchild's Worldwide Revenue from Accused Products filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #785 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 6 to Preclude Certain Testimony Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation ; Interim Pretrial Conference held on 11/19/2015.; ***Motions terminated: #780 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument on Entire Market Value Rule (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #783 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Reference to Fairchild's Worldwide Revenue from Accused Products filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #784 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Reference to Certain Litigation History Between the Parties (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #785 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 6 to Preclude Certain Testimony Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #782 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Reference to Fairchild's Financial Size, Number of Employee, Market Capitalization, and Overall Revenue filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #781 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Opinion Testimony on Customer Preferences (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #789 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 10 to Preclude Testimony or Evidence that the '079 Patent was Disruptive or Necessary for Energy Star (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #786 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 7 to Preclude Certain Testimony on Predecessor Products (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #788 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 9 to Preclude Reliance on Unsupported Factual Assumptions (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re PI's MILs 2-3, 5-6 & 8 & Supporting Exhibits filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #787 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 8 to Preclude Expert Testimony on Apportionment filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation.; granting in part and denying in part #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #780 Motion in Limine; denying #781 Motion in Limine; granting #782 Motion in Limine; granting #783 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #784 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #785 Motion in Limine; denying #786 Motion in Limine; denying #787 Motion in Limine; granting #788 Motion in Limine; denying #789 Motion in Limine Court Reporter Name Katherine Sullivan (4 hours 50 minutes). Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach; Michael Headley; Howard Pollack; Neil Warren. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs; Christina Ondrick; Phillip Ou; Yar Chaikovsky; Patrick Stafford. Attachment Civil Pretrial Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 831 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 830 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Power Integrations, Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 829 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 828 Trial Exhibit List by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc... (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/16/2015) Modified on 11/17/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2015 Filing 827 Trial Exhibit List by Power Integrations, Inc... (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/16/2015) Modified on 11/17/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ORDER RE: ENTRY OF EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURT FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 58. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 13, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 825 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick in Support of #819 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Opps to Fairchild MILs 1, 2, 4, & 7 & Certain Exhibits to Same filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #819 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 824 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Fairchild's Unopposed Motion re Entry of Equipment into the Court for Hearing Pursuant to General Order No. 58 filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 823 Proposed Order Denying Fairchild's Mot in Limine No. 7 ( # 819-30 REDACTED Opp to Fairchild MIL 7) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 822 Proposed Order Denying Fairchild's Mot in Limine No. 4 ( # 819-28 REDACTED Opp to Fairchild MIL 4) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 821 Proposed Order Denying Fairchild's Mot in Limine No. 2 (re # 819-26 REDACTED Opp to Fairchild MIL 2) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 820 Proposed Order Denying Fairchild's Mot in Limine No. 1 (re # 819-3 REDACTED Opp to Fairchild MIL 1) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 819 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Opps to Fairchild MILs 1, 2, 4, & 7 & Certain Exhibits to Same filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Headley ISO Mot to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Mot to Seal, #3 REDACTED Opp to Fairchild MIL 1, #4 CONF Opp to Fairchild MIL 1, #5 Declaration of M. Headley ISO PI's Opps to Fairchild's MILs 1-10, #6 REDACTED Ex. 1 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #7 CONF Ex. 1 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #8 REDACTED Ex. 2 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #9 CONF Ex 2 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #10 REDACTED Ex. 3 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #11 CONF Ex. 3 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #12 REDACTED Ex. 4 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #13 CONF Ex. 4 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #14 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #15 REDACTED Ex. 6 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #16 CONF Ex. 6 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #17 Exhibit 7 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #18 Exhibit 8 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #19 Exhibit 9 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #20 REDACTED Ex. 10 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #21 CONF Ex. 10 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #22 Exhibit 11 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #23 Exhibit 12 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #24 Exhibit 13 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #25 Exhibit 14 to Dec ISO Opps to Fairchild MILs 1-10, #26 REDACTED Opp to Fairchild MIL 2, #27 CONF Opp to Fairchild MIL 2, #28 REDACTED Opp to Fairchild MIL 4, #29 CONF Opp to Fairchild MIL 4, #30 REDACTED Opp to Fairchild MIL 7, #31 CONF Opp to Fairchild MIL 7, #32 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 818 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. re #810 Response ( Non Motion ),, #799 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Fairchild's Oppositions to Power Integrations' Motions in Limine, #815 Opposition/Response to Motion,, (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 817 RESPONSE (re #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re PI's MILs 2-3, 5-6 & 8 & Supporting Exhibits ) Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion in Limine No. 8 [778-21r], [778-22ur] filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 816 RESPONSE (re #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re PI's MILs 2-3, 5-6 & 8 & Supporting Exhibits ) Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion in Limine No. 7 [778-19] filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 815 RESPONSE (re #799 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Fairchild's Oppositions to Power Integrations' Motions in Limine ) Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion in Limine No. 6. CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [799-3] and [799-4] filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 DOCUMENT SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL of Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion in Limine No. 6)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 814 RESPONSE (re #789 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 10 to Preclude Testimony or Evidence that the '079 Patent was Disruptive or Necessary for Energy Star (REDACTED) ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 813 RESPONSE (re #784 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Reference to Certain Litigation History Between the Parties (REDACTED) ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 812 RESPONSE (re #787 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 8 to Preclude Expert Testimony on Apportionment ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 811 RESPONSE (re #785 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 6 to Preclude Certain Testimony Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives (REDACTED) ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 810 RESPONSE to #763 the Court's Order Deferring Ruling in Part on Moton to File Under Seal Portions of Fairchild's Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Reply Brief in Further Support of Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam, #2 DOCUMENT SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 809 RESPONSE (re #782 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Reference to Fairchild's Financial Size, Number of Employee, Market Capitalization, and Overall Revenue ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 808 RESPONSE to #762 the Court's Order Deferring Ruling in Part on Fairchild's Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, and Supporting Exhibits by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 807 Statement in Response (re #796 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 806 Statement /Supplemental Submission in Response to Orders #762 & #763 re Fairchild's Motions re Sealing #721 & #731 by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 805 RESPONSE (re #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re PI's MILs 2-3, 5-6 & 8 & Supporting Exhibits ) Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion in Limine No. 5 [788-13r], [788-ur] filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 804 RESPONSE (re #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re PI's MILs 2-3, 5-6 & 8 & Supporting Exhibits ) Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion in Limine No. 4 [788-11] filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 803 RESPONSE (re #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re PI's MILs 2-3, 5-6 & 8 & Supporting Exhibits ) Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion in Limine No. 3 [778-3r], [778-4ur] filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 802 RESPONSE (re #788 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 9 to Preclude Reliance on Unsupported Factual Assumptions (REDACTED) ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 801 RESPONSE (re #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re PI's MILs 2-3, 5-6 & 8 & Supporting Exhibits ) Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion in Limine No. 2 [778-5r], [778-5ur] filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 800 RESPONSE re ( #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re PI's MILs 2-3, 5-6 & 8 & Supporting Exhibits ) Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion in Limine No. 1 [778-3] filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 799 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Fairchild's Oppositions to Power Integrations' Motions in Limine filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3Erroneous Entry See #815 REDACTED version of Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion in Limine No. 6, #4Erroneous Entry - See #815 UNREDACTED version of Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion in Limine No. 6, #5 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Fairchild's Oppositions to Power Integrations' Motions in Limine Nos. 1-8, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit REDACTED Exh B, #8 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit REDACTED Exh E, #12 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh E, #13 Exhibit REDACTED Exh F, #14 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh F, #15 Exhibit REDACTED Exh G, #16 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh G, #17 Exhibit H, #18 Exhibit I, #19 Exhibit J, #20 Exhibit REDACTED Exh K, #21 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh K)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2015 Filing 798 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #779 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Fairchild's Motions in Limine and Supporting Exhibits filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #779 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 797 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick in Support of #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re PI's MILs 2-3, 5-6 & 8 & Supporting Exhibits filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #778 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 796 MOTION to Relate Case to 15-4854-SI filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/5/2015) Modified on 11/6/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2015 Filing 795 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. re #791 Response ( Non Motion ),,, #793 Response ( Non Motion ),,, #792 Response ( Non Motion ),, (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
November 3, 2015 Filing 794 Supplemental Submission in Response to Orders #748, #749, #751, & #752 re Sealing Motions #707, #709, #723, & #719 by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/3/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2015 Filing 793 RESPONSE to #748 the Court Order Deferring Ruling on Fairchild's Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam, and Supporting Exhibits by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Proposed REDACTIONS re Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam, #2 Defendants' Proposed SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL re Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam, #3 Exhibit A REDACTED, #4 Exhibit A SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit B REDACTED, #6 Exhibit B SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit C REDACTED, #8 Exhibit C SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/3/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2015 Filing 792 RESPONSE to #751 the Court Order the Court's Order Deferring Ruling in Part on Power Integrations Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Johnathan D. Putnam and Supporting Exhibits by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Defendants' Proposed REDACTIONS in Response to Order Dkt 751, #2 Exhibit 1 SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 3 Defendants' Proposed REDACTIONS in Response to Order Dkt 751, #4 Exhibit 3 SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/3/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2015 Filing 791 RESPONSE to #752 Court Order Deferring Ruling on Power Integrations' Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Opposition to Fairchild's Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Arthur W. Kelley and Charles L. Colby, and Supporting Exhibits by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Part 1 of 2 Defendants' Proposed REDACTIONS in Response to Order Dkt 752, #2 Exhibit 2- Part 1 of 2 SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 2- Part 2 of 2 Defendants' Proposed REDACTIONS in Response to Order Dkt 752, #4 Exhibit 2 - Part 2 of 2 SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/3/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2015 Filing 790 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. re #784 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Reference to Certain Litigation History Between the Parties (REDACTED), #780 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument on Entire Market Value Rule (REDACTED), #789 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 10 to Preclude Testimony or Evidence that the '079 Patent was Disruptive or Necessary for Energy Star (REDACTED), #779 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Fairchild's Motions in Limine, #786 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 7 to Preclude Certain Testimony on Predecessor Products (REDACTED), #781 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Opinion Testimony on Customer Preferences (REDACTED), #788 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 9 to Preclude Reliance on Unsupported Factual Assumptions (REDACTED), #787 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 8 to Preclude Expert Testimony on Apportionment, #785 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 6 to Preclude Certain Testimony Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives (REDACTED) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 789 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 10 to Preclude Testimony or Evidence that the '079 Patent was Disruptive or Necessary for Energy Star (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/16/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 788 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 9 to Preclude Reliance on Unsupported Factual Assumptions (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/16/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 787 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 8 to Preclude Expert Testimony on Apportionment filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/16/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 786 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 7 to Preclude Certain Testimony on Predecessor Products (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/16/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 785 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 6 to Preclude Certain Testimony Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/16/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 784 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Reference to Certain Litigation History Between the Parties (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/16/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 783 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Reference to Fairchild's Worldwide Revenue from Accused Products filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/16/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 782 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Reference to Fairchild's Financial Size, Number of Employee, Market Capitalization, and Overall Revenue filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/16/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 781 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Opinion Testimony on Customer Preferences (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/16/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 780 MOTION in Limine Fairchild's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument on Entire Market Value Rule (REDACTED) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/16/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 779 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Fairchild's Motions in Limine filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED version of MIL 1 to Preclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument on Entire Market Value Rule, #4 UNREDACTED MIL 1, #5 Proposed Order MIL1, #6 REDACTED version of MIL 2 to Preclude Opinion Testimony on Customer Preferences, #7 UNREDACTED MIL 2, #8 Proposed Order MIL 2, #9 REDACTED version of MIL 5 to Preclude Reference to Certain Litigation HIstory Between the Parties, #10 UNREDACTED MIL 5, #11 Proposed Order MIL 5, #12 REDACTED version of MIL 6 to Preclude Certain Testimony Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives, #13 UNREDACTED MIL 6, #14 Proposed Order MIL 6, #15 REDACTED version of MIL 7 to Preclude Certain Testimony on Predecessor Products, #16 UNREDACTED MIL 7, #17 Proposed Order MIL 7, #18 REDACTED version of MIL 9 to Preclude Reliance on Unsupported Factual Assumptions, #19 UNREDACTED MIL 9, #20 Proposed Order MIL 9, #21 REDACTED version of MIL 10 to Preclude Testimony or Evidence that the '079 Patent was Disruptive or Necessary for Energy Star, #22 UNREDACTED MIL 10, #23 Proposed Order MIL 10, #24 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motions in Limine 1-10, #25 Exhibit REDACTED Exh A, #26 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh A, #27 Exhibit REDACTED Exh B, #28 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh B, #29 Exhibit REDACTED Exh C, #30 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh C, #31 Exhibit REDACTED Exh D, #32 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh D, #33 Exhibit REDACTED Exh E, #34 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh E, #35 Exhibit REDACTED Exh F, #36 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh F, #37 Exhibit REDACTED Exh G, #38 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh G, #39 Exhibit H, #40 Exhibit I, #41 Exhibit REDACTED Exh J, #42 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh J, #43 Exhibit K, #44 Exhibit L, #45 Exhibit REDACTED Exh M, #46 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh M, #47 Exhibit N, #48 Exhibit O, #49 Exhibit REDACTED Exh P, #50 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh P, #51 Exhibit Q, #52 Exhibit REDACTED Exh R, #53 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh R, #54 Exhibit REDACTED Exh S, #55 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exh S)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re PI's MILs 2-3, 5-6 & 8 & Supporting Exhibits filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M.R. Headley ISO Mtn to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Mtn to Seal, #3 MIL No. 1, #4 Proposed Order re MIL No. 1, #5 REDACTED MIL No. 2, #6 CONF MIL No. 2, #7 Proposed Order re MIL No. 2, #8 REDACTED MIL No. 3, #9 CONF MIL No. 3, #10 Proposed Order re MIL No. 3, #11 MIL No. 4, #12 Proposed Order re MIL No. 4, #13 REDACTED MIL No. 5, #14 CONF MIL No. 5, #15 Proposed Order re MIL No. 5, #16 REDACTED MIL No. 6, #17 CONF MIL No. 6, #18 Proposed Order re MIL No. 6, #19 MIL No. 7, #20 Proposed Order re MIL No. 7, #21 REDACTED MIL No. 8, #22 CONF MIL No. 8, #23 Proposed Order re MIL No. 8, #24 Declaration of M.R. Headley ISO MILs Nos. 1-8, #25 Exhibit A to Headley Dec, #26 Exhibit B (REDACTED) to Headley Dec, #27 Exhibit B (CONF) to Headley Dec, #28 Exhibit C to Headley Dec, #29 Exhibit D to Headley Dec, #30 Exhibit E (REDACTED) to Headley Dec, #31 Exhibit E (CONF) to Headley Dec, #32 Exhibit F to Headley Dec, #33 Exhibit G (REDACTED) to Headley Dec, #34 Exhibit G (CONF) to Headley Dec, #35 Exhibit H (REDACTED) to Headley Dec, #36 Exhibit H (CONF) to Headley Dec, #37 Exhibit I (REDACTED) to Headley Dec, #38 Exhibit I (CONF) to Headley Dec, #39 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 777 Pretrial Conference Statement by Power Integrations, Inc. & Fairchild Semiconductor (Joint Filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Undisputed Issues, #2 Exhibit 2-PI Issues of Fact, #3 Exhibit 3-Fairchild Issues of Fact, #4 Exhibit 4-Fairchild Issues of Law, #5 Exhibit 5-PI Witness List, #6 Exhibit 6-Fairchild Witness List)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 776 Proposed Form of Verdict by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. . (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 775 Proposed Voir Dire by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. . (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 774 RESPONSE to re #763 Terminate Motions,,,,, Order,,,, Fairchild's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Arthur W. Kelley and Charles L. Colby (originally submitted under seal as #729-3, re-filed as per Docket 763 by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 773 RESPONSE to re #753 Order,,, Terminate Motions,, Fairchild's Brief in Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Robert Palmatier (originally submitted under seal as #720-3, 720-10, re-filed as per Docket 753 by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 772 EXHIBITS -PI's Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei (originally submitted under seal as #730-4, re-filed per #763, Order Denying in Part & Deferring Ruling in Part on Mots to Seal) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 771 Proposed Voir Dire by Power Integrations, Inc. . (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 770 Proposed Form of Verdict by Power Integrations, Inc. . (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 769 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 768 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. re #767 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to Seal Fairchild's Reply Statement re Impact of the Court's Daubert Ruling on Dr. Putnam's Opinions (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 767 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to Seal Fairchild's Reply Statement re Impact of the Court's Daubert Ruling on Dr. Putnam's Opinions filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 FSC's Reply Statement re Impact of the Court's Daubert Ruling on Dr. Putnam's Opinions, #4 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO FSC's Reply Statement re Impact of the Court's Daubert Ruling on Dr. Putnam's Opinions, #5 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exh. A, #6 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exh. A, #7 Exhibit B)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 29, 2015 Filing 766 RESPONSE (re [759 - 3] Fairchild's Motion to Seal Fairchild's Statement re Impact of the Court's Daubert Ruling on Dr. Putnam's Opnions ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2015) Modified on 10/30/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2015 Filing 765 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #759 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to Seal Fairchild's Statement re Impact of the Court's Daubert Ruling on Dr. Putnam's Opnions filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #759 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 27, 2015 Filing 764 EXHIBITS - PI's Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei and Exs. D-E ISO Headley Dec (originally submitted under seal as #711-4, #711-5, & #711-6, re-filed per #750, Order Denying PI's Mot to File Under Seal) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D to Headley Dec ISO PI's Mot to Exclude Wei Testimony, #2 Errata E to Headley Dec ISO PI's Mot to Exclude Wei Testimony)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON PARTIES' MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF REPLY BRIEFS FILED IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY. Fairchild's motion to seal its "Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Arthur W. Kelley and Charles L. Colby" is denied, and defendants are directed to file the unredacted reply brief in the public record. "Plaintiff Power Integrations' Administrative Motion to Seal" portions of its "Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei" is denied, and plaintiff is directed to file the unredacted reply brief in the public record. The Court defers ruling on defendants' motion to seal its "Brief in Further Support of Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam," pending each party's filing, by November 9, 2015, a supplemental response that identifies, with specificity, the portions of the reply brief that contain such party's confidential information. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 26, 2015. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON FAIRCHILD'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE GU-YEON WEI, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS. To the extent the motion seeks permission to seal the entirety of Exhibits D, E, H, and I to the Ondrick Declaration and the related portions of the opposition, the motion is granted. The Court defers ruling on the administrative motion to the extent it seeks to seal Exhibits B, F, and G and related portions of the opposition, pending each party's filing, by November 9, 2015, a supplemental response that identifies, with specificity, the portions of the exhibits and opposition that contain such party's confidential information. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 26, 2015. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 761 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #755 Fairchild's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Entire Market Value Rule filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/26/2015) Modified on 10/27/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2015 Filing 760 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. re #759 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to Seal Fairchild's Statement re Impact of the Court's Daubert Ruling on Dr. Putnam's Opnions (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 759 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to Seal Fairchild's Statement re Impact of the Court's Daubert Ruling on Dr. Putnam's Opnions filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Fairchild's Statement re Impact of the Court's Daubert Ruling on Dr. Putnam's Opinions, #4 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Fairchild's Statement re Impact of the Court's Daubert Ruling on Dr. Putnam's Opnions, #5 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exh. 1, #6 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exh. 1)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Defendants' motion for summary judgment and motion to expedite the briefing schedule thereon are denied, without prejudice to defendants' raising the issues therein by motion in limine. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 26, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 757 RESPONSE (re #754 MOTION to Expedite Fairchild's Administrative Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 756 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. re #755 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Entire Market Value Rule (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 755 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Entire Market Value Rule filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED version of Fairchild's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Entire Market Value Rule, #4 UNREDACTED version of Fairchild's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Entire Market Value Rule, #5 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Fairchild's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Entire Market Value Rule, #6 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit A to Ondrick Decl ISO MSJ of no EMVR, #7 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit F, #16 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit G, #17 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit G, #18 Exhibit H, #19 Exhibit I, #20 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit J, #21 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit J, #22 Exhibit K, #23 Exhibit L, #24 Exhibit M, #25 Exhibit N, #26 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 754 MOTION to Expedite Fairchild's Administrative Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Fairchild's Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Fairchild's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Entire Market Value Rule, #2 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 753 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART FAIRCHILD'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE ROBERT PALMATIER, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS. To the extent the administrative motion seeks permission to seal the entirety of Exhibit G to the Ondrick Declaration, the motion is granted. The motion to seal is denied with respect to Exhibit E and the redacted portions of the opposition, and Fairchild is directed to file in the public record Exhibit E and the unredacted opposition. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 21, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER DEFERRING RULING ON POWER INTEGRATIONS'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE ARTHUR W. KELLEY AND CHARLES L. COLBY, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS. The Court defers ruling on the motion, pending each party's filing, by November 3, 2015, a supplemental response that identifies, with specificity, the portions of the exhibits and opposition that contain such party's confidential information. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 20, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON POWER INTEGRATIONS'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE JONATHAN D. PUTNAM, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS. To the extent the administrative motion seeks to seal the entirety of Exhibit 2 and the related portions of the opposition, the motion is granted. The Court defers ruling on the administrative motion to the extent it seeks to seal Exhibit 1, Exhibit 3, and the related portions of the opposition, pending each party's filing, by November 3, 2015, a supplemental response that identifies, with specificity, the portions of said exhibits and opposition that contain such party's confidential information. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 20, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER DENYING POWER INTEGRATIONS'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE GU-YEON WEI, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS. The motion to seal is denied, and Power Integrations is directed to file the entirety of Exhibits D and E, as well as the unredacted motion to exclude, in the public record. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 20, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON FAIRCHILD'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE ARTHUR W. KELLEY AND CHARLES L. COLBY, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS. To the extent the administrative motion seeks to seal the entirety of Exhibit C and the related portions of the motion to exclude, the motion is granted. Fairchild's request to file Exhibit F under seal is denied. The Court defers ruling on the administrative motion to the extent it seeks to seal Exhibits A and B, pending Power Integrations's filing, by November 3, 2015, a supplemental response that identifies, with specificity, the portions of said exhibits that contain confidential information. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 20, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON FAIRCHILD'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE JONATHAN D. PUTNAM, AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS. To the extent the motion seeks to seal the entirety of Exhibit D, the Court finds good cause has been shown, and the exhibit shall remain filed under seal. To the extent the motion seeks to seal Exhibits A - C and relation portions of the motion to exclude, the Court defers ruling on the motion, pending each parties' filing, by November 3, 2015, a supplemental response that identifies, with specificity, the portions of said exhibits and motion that contain such party's confidential information. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 20, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 8, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
October 8, 2015 Filing 746 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/2/2015, before Judge Chesney. Court Reporters Pamela A. Batalo; Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 626-688-5709, pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov; 415-794-6659, katherine_sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #742 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2016. (Related documents(s) #742 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
October 7, 2015 Filing 745 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Ou (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 7, 2015 Filing 744 NOTICE of Appearance by Yar R. Chaikovsky Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation and Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 743 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Power Integrations, Inc. for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 742 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 741 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Motion Hearing held on 10/2/2015. re #711 Power Integration's Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #707 Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, #706 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Robert Palmatier filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #709 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Arthur Kelley and Charles Colby filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation Court Reporter Name Pam Batalo / Katherine Sullivan (5 hours 2 minutes). Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach; Michael Headley; Howard Pollack; Neil Warren. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs; Christina Ondrick; Robert Walters; Yar Chaikovsky; Peter Kirk. Attachment Civil Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/2/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER RE: ENTRY OF EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURT FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 58. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 29, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 739 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ALEXANDER PAUL OTT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 29, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 25, 2015 Filing 738 MOTION Fairchild's Unopposed Motion re Entry of Equipment into the Court for Hearing Pursuant to General Order No. 58 filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 10/9/2015. Replies due by 10/16/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ARTEM NIKOLAEVICH SOKOLOV. Artem Nikolaevich Sokolov is removed as counsel of record for Defendants. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 22, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 22, 2015 Filing 736 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #729 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Arthur W. Kelley and Charles L.Colby filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #729 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 22, 2015 Filing 735 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #731 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Brief in Further Support of Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #731 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 22, 2015 Filing 734 Declaration in Support of #730 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PI's Reply ISO Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #730 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 21, 2015 Filing 733 REQUEST/NOTICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. of Withdrawal of Artem Nikolaevich Sokolov (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/21/2015) Modified on 9/22/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2015 Filing 732 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. re #731 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Brief in Further Support of Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam, #729 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Arthur W. Kelley and Charles L.Colby (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 731 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Brief in Further Support of Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED version of Fairchild's Reply Brief in Further Support of Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam, #4 UNREDACTED version of Fairchild's Reply Brief in Further Support of Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 730 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PI's Reply ISO Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley ISO Mot to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Reply ISO Mot to Exclude Wei Testimony, #4 UNREDACTED Reply ISO Mot to Exclude Wei Testimony, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 729 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Arthur W. Kelley and Charles L.Colby filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED version of Fairchild's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Arthur W. Kelley and Charles L. Colby, #4 UNREDACTED version of Fairchild's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Arthur W. Kelley and Charles L. Colby)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 728 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Brief in Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Wei filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #721 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 727 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #720 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Brief in Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Robert Palmatier filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #720 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 726 REPLY (re #706 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Robert Palmatier ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 725 Declaration in Support of #723 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PI's Opp to Fairchild's Mot to Exclude Testimony of J. Putnam filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #723 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 724 Declaration in Support of #719 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integration's Opp to Fairchild's Mot to Exclude Opinions, Testimony of Kelley & Colby filed byFairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #719 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 14, 2015 Filing 723 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PI's Opp to Fairchild's Mot to Exclude Testimony of J. Putnam filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Headley ISO Mot to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED PI Opp to Mot To Exclude Testimony of Putnam, #4 UNREDACTED PI Opp to Mot To Exclude Testimony of Putnam, #5 Declaration of Michael Headley ISO PI Opp to Mot To Exclude Testimony of Putnam, #6 REDACTED Ex 1 to Headley Dec., #7 UNREDACTED Ex 1 to Headley Dec., #8 REDACTED Ex 2 to Headley Dec., #9 UNREDACTED Ex 2 to Headley Dec., #10 REDACTED Ex 3 to Headley Dec., #11 UNREDACTED Ex 3 to Headley Dec.)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 14, 2015 Filing 722 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. re #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Brief in Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Wei, #720 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Brief in Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Robert Palmatier (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 14, 2015 Filing 721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Brief in Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Wei filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Brief in Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Wei, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED version of Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, #4 UNREDACTED version of Fairchild's Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, #5 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Fairchild's Brief in Oppositon to Power Integration's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Wei, #6 Exhibit A to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairhchild's Brief in Opposition, #7 Exhibit B REDACTED verion to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #8 Exhibit B UNREDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #9 Exhibit C to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #10 Exhibit D REDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #11 Exhibit D UNREDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #12 Exhibit E REDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #13 Exhibit E UNREDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #14 Exhibit F REDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #15 Exhibit F UNREDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #16 Exhibit G REDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #17 Exhibit G UNREDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #18 Exhibit H REDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #19 Exhibit H UNREDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Farichild's Brief in Opposition, #20 Exhibit I REDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #21 Exhibit I UNREDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 14, 2015 Filing 720 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Brief in Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Robert Palmatier filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motion to Seal Farichild's Brief in Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Robert Palmatier, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED version of Fairchild's Brief in Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Robert Palmatier, #4 UNREDACTED version of Fairchild's Brief in Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Robert Palmatier, #5 Declaration C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Robert Palmatier, #6 Exhibit A to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #7 Exhibit B to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #8 Exhibit C to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #9 Exhibit D to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #10 Exhibit E REDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #11 Exhibit E UNREDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #12 Exhibit F to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #13 Exhibit G REDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition, #14 Exhibit G UNREDACTED version to C. Ondrick Decl ISO Fairchild's Brief in Opposition)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 14, 2015 Filing 719 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integration's Opp to Fairchild's Mot to Exclude Opinions, Testimony of Kelley & Colby filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Headley ISO Mot to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED PI's Opp to Fairchild's Mot to Exclude Opinions, Testimony of Kelley & Colby, #4 UNREDACTED PI's Opp to Fairchild's Mot to Exclude Opinions, Testimony of Kelley & Colby, #5 Declaration of Michael Headley ISO Opp to Fairchild's Mot to Exclude Opinions, Testimony of Kelley & Colby, #6 REDACTED Ex. 1 to Headley Dec., #7 UNREDACTED Ex. 1 to Headley Dec., #8 REDACTED Ex. 2 to Headley Dec., #9 UNREDACTED Ex. 2 (Part 1) to Headley Dec., #10 UNREDACTED Ex. 2 (Part 2) to Headley Dec., #11 Exhibit 3 to Headley Dec., #12 Exhibit 4 to Headley Dec.)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 718 NOTICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. of Withdrawal of Alexander Paul Ott (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 717 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/20/15, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #712 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2015. (Related documents(s) #712 ) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 8, 2015 Filing 716 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick in Support of #711 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integration's Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei and Supporting Exhibits D and E to the Declaration of Michal R. Headley filed byFairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Power Integrations' Motion to Seal [Dkt. No. 711])(Related document(s) #711 ) (Bartow, Daryl) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 8, 2015 Filing 715 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #709 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Arthur Kelly and Charles Colby filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #709 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 8, 2015 Filing 714 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #707 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #707 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 8, 2015 Filing 713 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Power Integrations, Inc. for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 8, 2015 Filing 712 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 4, 2015 Filing 711 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integration's Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei and Supporting Exhibits D and E to the Declaration of Michal R. Headley filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Headley in Support of PI's Admin Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order to PI's Admin Motion to Seal, #3 REDACTED version of PI's Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, #4 UNREDACTED version of PI's Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, #5 UNREDACTED Exhibit D, #6 UNREDACTED Exhibit E, #7 Declaration of Michael Headley in Support of PI's Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, #8 Ex A to Declaration of Michael Headley in Support of PI's Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, #9 Ex B to Declaration of Michael Headley in Support of PI's Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, #10 Ex C to Declaration of Michael Headley in Support of PI's Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, #11 Ex F to Declaration of Michael Headley in Support of PI's Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, #12 Ex G to Declaration of Michael Headley in Support of PI's Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, #13 Ex H to Declaration of Michael Headley in Support of PI's Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, #14 Ex I to Declaration of Michael Headley in Support of PI's Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, #15 Proposed Order to PI's Mot to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Wei, #16 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
September 4, 2015 Filing 710 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. re #707 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam, #709 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted versions of the Motions and exhibits (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
September 4, 2015 Filing 709 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchilds Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Arthur W. Kelley and Charles L. Colby filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 REDACTED version of Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Arthur W. Kelley and Charles L. Colby, #4 UNREDACTED version of Fairlchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Arthur W. Kelley and Charles L. Colby, #5 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO of Fairchild's Motion to Exclude, #6 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit A Part 1, #8 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit A Part 2, #9 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibit F, #16 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit F, #17 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exclude)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/4/2015) Modified on 9/8/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2015 Filing 708 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #706 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Robert Palmatier filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #706 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
September 4, 2015 Filing 707 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order to Seal, #3 REDACTED version of Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam, #4 UNREDACTED version of Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam, #5 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Fairchild's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam, #6 Exhibit REDACTED version of Exhibits A-D, #7 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Exhibit D, #11 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exclude)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
September 4, 2015 Filing 706 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Robert Palmatier filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 9/14/2015. Replies due by 9/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 705 ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING DAUBERT BRIEFING SCHEDULINGDaubert Opening briefs are due September 4, 2015 and opposition briefs are due September 14, 2015. All other dates remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 11, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 704 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Daubert Briefing Schedule filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 703 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Discovery Hearing held on 5/20/2015. Plaintiff's opening expert reports due (technical and damages by 6/11/2015. Defendant's responsive expert reports due (technical, damages and opening survey report) by 7/7/2015. Plaintiff's responsive survey report due by 8/4/2015. Court Reporter Name Jo Ann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach, Michael Headley. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs, Christina Ondrick. Attachment Civil Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/20/2015)
May 18, 2015 Filing 702 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CONFERENCE CALL RE: EXPERT DISCOVERY FOR MAY 20, 2015 AT 10:00 A.M.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Telephonic Expert Discovery Hearing set for 5/20/2015 before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 701 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF LEIGH MARTINSON AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD Leigh Martinson shall be removed as counsel of record for defendants and the clerk of this Court shall remove Leigh Martinson from the ECF Service List. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 15, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015) Modified on 5/15/2015 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 700 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF A. MARISA CHUN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD A. Marisa Chun shall be removed as counsel of record for defendants and the clerk of this Court shall remove A. Marisa Chun from the ECF Service List. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 15, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015) Modified on 5/15/2015 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 699 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF BRETT BACHTELL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD Brett Bachtell shall be removed as counsel of record for defendants and the clerk of this Court shall remove Brett Bachtell from the ECF Service List. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 15, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 14, 2015 Filing 698 Letter from Blair M. Jacobs to Honorable Judge Chesney in response to Mr. Scherkenbach's letter of today's date. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 14, 2015 Filing 697 Letter from FRANK E. SCHERKENBACH to JUDGE CHESNEY re Pretrial Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scherkenbach, Frank) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
April 1, 2015 Filing 696 NOTICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. Withdrawal of Leigh Martinson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
April 1, 2015 Filing 695 NOTICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. Withdrawal of A. Marisa Chun (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
April 1, 2015 Filing 694 NOTICE by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. of Withdrawal of Brett E. Bachtell (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
April 1, 2015 Filing 693 NOTICE of Change of Address by Blair M Jacobs and Change of Law Firm (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 692 NOTICE of Appearance by Daryl Stuart Bartow (Bartow, Daryl) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 2, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to, Set/Reset Deadlines: Daubert motions due by 8/28/2015; Responses due by 9/11/2015. Replies due by 9/18/2015. Daubert Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 691 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING DAMAGES RETRIAL Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 25, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 24, 2015 Filing 690 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) and PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER RE DAMAGES RETRIAL PROCEEDINGS by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 689 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Telephone Conference held on 2/18/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2015 10:00 AM. Jury Selection/Jury Trial (5 days) set for 12/7/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney.Court Reporter Name or FTR Time Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney Frank Scherkenbach and Michael Headley. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs and Christina Ondrick. Attachment Civil Minutes - 2/18/2015.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/18/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 688 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to counsel's request the Telephonic Status Conference previously set for 2/17/2015 at 11:00 AM has been rescheduled to 2/18/2015 10:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION The motion is denied, without prejudice to Power Integrations' filing a renewed motion after the retrial on the issue of damages. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 12, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 686 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 10, 2015 Filing 685 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/26/15, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #682 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2015. (Related documents(s) #682 ) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 6, 2015 Filing 684 STATUS REPORT REGARDING DAMAGES RETRIAL PROCEEDINGS by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
February 4, 2015 Filing 683 CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to a scheduling conflict - the Telephonic Status Conference previously set for 2/11/2015 at 10:00 AM has been rescheduled to 2/17/2015 11:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
January 28, 2015 Filing 682 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Power Integrations, Inc. for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 681 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JANUARY 22, 2015 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL Exhibit A to Fairchild's proffer of the deposition testimony of James Go shall be maintained under seal. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 27, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 680 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Evidentiary Hearing re: Defendant's Motion for a Finding that US Patent '908 is Unenforceable due to Inequitable Conduct held on 1/26/2015.Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/11/2015 10:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney, joint status conference statement due by 2/4/2015.Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney Howard Pollack and Michael Headley. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs, Christina Ondrick, Leigh Martinson. Attachment Civil minutes - 1/26/2015. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Evidentiary Hearing Log)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2015)
January 26, 2015 Filing 679 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #677 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Fairchilds Proffer of the Deposition Testimony of James Go) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #677 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR FINDING OF UNENFORCEABILITY DUE TO INEQUITABLE CONDUCT For the reasons stated on the record, the Court finds Fairchild has failed to show the patent is unenforceable due to inequitable conduct, and accordingly, Fairchild's motion is hereby denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 22, 2015 Filing 677 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to (Fairchilds Proffer of the Deposition Testimony of James Go) filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Ondrick in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Fairchilds Proffer of the Deposition Testimony of James Go, #4 (REDACTED) Exhibit A to Fairchilds Proffer of the Deposition Testimony of James Go, #5 (UNDER SEAL) Exhibit A to Fairchilds Proffer of the Deposition Testimony of James Go)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/22/2015) Modified on 1/23/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORDER RE ENTRY OF EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURT FOR HEARING Projectors and related equipment may be brought into the courtroom on January 23, 2015 for the express purpose of presenting the parties' January 26, 2015 hearing presentations. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 7, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
January 7, 2015 Filing 675 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Entry of Equipment Into the Court for Hearing filed by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Power Integrations, Inc.. (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
December 11, 2014 Filing 674 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/21/2014, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Pence, Telephone number (619) 587-0173, e-mail: james_pence@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #670 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Related documents(s) #670 ) (Pence, James) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 10, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #637 MOTION for Permanent Injunction -PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #636 . Motion Hearing reset to 1/26/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re #673 Order,, Status Conference reset to 1/26/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 673 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CHANGE TIME OF JANUARY 26, 2015 HEARING The Court reschedules the January 26, 2015 hearing to begin at 9:00 a.m., and to begin the proceedings with the testimony of Mr. Balakrishnan that morning. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 9, 2014 Filing 672 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Change Time of Hrg on PI's Mot. for Permanent Injunction, Testimony re Fairchild's Inequitable Conduct Claim filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 2, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re #666 Order, Terminate Motions,,,, Status Conference set for 1/26/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 671 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. for Court Reporter James Pence. (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 670 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Power Integrations, Inc. for Court Reporter James Pence. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 669 AMENDED CIVIL MINUTES FOR HEARING ON 11/21/2014 Amendment to #664 - Correcting Motion - incorrect docket #573 should be docket # 576. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ORDER GRANTING FAIRCHILD'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CHANGE CASE CAPTION Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 25, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER DENYING RENEWED MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST In light of the Court's order, filed today's date, granting a new trial on the issue of damages, Power Integrations' renewed motion for prejudgment interest is hereby denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 25, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART FAIRCHILD'S RENEWED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE To the extent Fairchild seeks a new trial on the issue of damages, Fairchild's motion for reconsideration is hereby granted; in all other respects the motion is hereby denied. In addition to the hearing on pending post-trial motions, scheduled for January 26, 2015, the Court will conduct a conference at which the parties shall be prepared to provide a joint proposed schedule for the new trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 25, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 665 NOTICE by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation of Name Change and Unopposed Motion to Amend Case Caption (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 664 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney: Motion Hearing held on 11/21/2014. (Date Filed: 11/21/2014) ; denying without prejudice #634 Motion for Prejudgment Interest ; taking under submission #643 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration Evidentiary/ Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney.Court Reporter Name or FTR Time James Pence. Plaintiff Attorney Howard Pollack, Michael Headley, Frank Scherkenbach. Defendant Attorney Blair Jacobs, Christina Ondrick, Robert Walters. Attachment Civil Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 663 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST RE ENTRY OF EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURT FOR HEARING Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 19, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 18, 2014 Filing 662 MOTION Entry of Equipment Into the Court for Hearing Pursuant to General Order No. 58 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/2/2014. Replies due by 12/9/2014. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF TERRENCE P. MCMAHON AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 12, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF JEREMY ELMAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 12, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 659 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF JEREMIAH ARMSTRONG AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 12, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ANTHONY R. DE ALCUAZ AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 12, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 11, 2014 Filing 657 NOTICE by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation of Withdrawal of Terrence McMahon (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 11, 2014 Filing 656 NOTICE by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation of Withdrawal of Jeremy Elman (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 11, 2014 Filing 655 NOTICE by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation of Withdrawal of Jeremiah Armstrong (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 11, 2014 Filing 654 NOTICE by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation of Withdrawal of Anthony R. de Alcuaz (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 3, 2014 Filing 653 REPLY (re #637 MOTION for Permanent Injunction -PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #636 ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION The entirety of Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Joel Pond and the requested Portions of the Declaration of Joel Pond shall remain sealed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 28, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 651 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal FAIRCHILDS OPPOSITION TO POWER INTEGRATIONS RENEWED MOTION FOR A PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick re Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Opposition To Power Integrations Renewed Motion For A Permanent Injunction, #4 Declaration of Christina Ondrick re Opposition To Power Integrations Renewed Motion For A Permanent Injunction, #5 Ex. A to Declaration of Christina Ondrick re Opposition To Power Integrations Renewed Motion For A Permanent Injunction, #6 UNDER SEAL Declaration of Joel Pond re Opposition To Power Integrations Renewed Motion For A Permanent Injunction, #7 UNDER SEAL Ex. 1 to Declaration of Joel Pond re Opposition To Power Integrations Renewed Motion For A Permanent Injunction, #8 REDACTED Declaration of Joel Pond re Opposition To Power Integrations Renewed Motion For A Permanent Injunction, #9 REDACTED Ex. 1 to Declaration of Joel Pond re Opposition To Power Integrations Renewed Motion For A Permanent Injunction)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 650 REPLY (re #643 MOTION for Reconsideration re #632 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,, New Trial, And/Or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick, #2 Ex. A to Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick, #3 Ex. B to Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick, #4 Ex. C to Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 649 RESPONSE (re #643 MOTION for Reconsideration re #632 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,, New Trial, And/Or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #637 MOTION for Permanent Injunction -PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #636 . Responses due by 10/24/2014. Replies due by 11/3/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 15, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #637 MOTION for Permanent Injunction -PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #636 . Responses due by 10/24/2014. Replies due by 11/3/2014. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER GRANTING FAIRCHILD'S UNOPPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE The Court sets the following briefing schedule: Deadline for Fairchild to submit its opposition to Power Integrations Renewed Motion for a Permanent Injunction: October 24, 2014; Deadline for Power Integrations to submit its reply in support of its Renewed Motion for a Permanent Injunction: November 3, 2014; Deadline for Fairchild to submit its opposition to Power Integrations RenewedMotion for Prejudgment Interest: Ten days following the Courts ruling on Fairchilds Motion for Reconsideration; and Deadline for Power Integrations to submit its reply in support of its Renewed Motion for Prejudgment Interest: Seven days following Fairchilds submission of its opposition to Power Integrations Renewed Motion for Prejudgment Interest. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 15, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 13, 2014 Filing 647 REPLY to #646 Response (re #645 MOTION for Extension of Time to File - Unopposed Briefing Schedule regarding Dkt. 634 and Dkt. 637 ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/13/2014) Modified on 10/14/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2014 Filing 646 RESPONSE (re #645 MOTION for Extension of Time to File - Unopposed Briefing Schedule regarding Dkt. 634 and Dkt. 637 ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 645 MOTION for Extension of Time to File - Unopposed Briefing Schedule regarding Dkt. 634 and Dkt. 637 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 644 NOTICE by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation re #643 MOTION for Reconsideration re #632 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,, New Trial, And/Or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 of Hearing Date (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 3, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #643 MOTION for Reconsideration re #632 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,, New Trial, And/Or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/24/2014. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 3, 2014 Filing 643 Renewed MOTION for Reconsideration re #632 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,, New Trial, And/Or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/3/2014) Modified on 10/6/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #634 MOTION (Renewed) for Prejudgment Interest , #637 MOTION for Permanent Injunction -PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #636 . Responses due by 10/10/2014. Replies due by 10/20/2014. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND VACATING HEARING DATE The deadline to submit opposition briefs to Power Integrations' Renewed Motion for Prejudgment Interest and Renewed Motion for a Permanent Injunction is extended to October 10, 2014; the deadline to submit reply briefs for said motions is extended to October 20, 2014, and the hearing on said motions is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 1, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 641 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #637 MOTION for Permanent Injunction -PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #636 , #634 MOTION (Renewed) for Prejudgment Interest Extending Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Power Integrations, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RENEWED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION Defendants are granted leave to file with the Court their motion for reconsideration; the motion shall be filed no later than October 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 30, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 639 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Regarding Fairchild's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, And/Or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit B - VirnetX Decision, #3 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER GRANTING POWER INTEGRATIONS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL The Court grants Power Integrations' motion to have the designated portions of Power Integrations' Renewed Motion for a Permanent Injunction remain sealed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 23, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 637 MOTION for Permanent Injunction -PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #636 filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 10/2/2014. Replies due by 10/9/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Headley, #2 Exhibit FF to Headley Dec., #3 Exhibit GG to Headley Dec., #4 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 636 ***ERRONEOUS ATACHMENT - PLEASE REFER DOCUMENT NO.636*** MOTION for Permanent Injunction -PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 10/2/2014. Replies due by 10/9/2014. (Attachments: #1 Erroneous Attachment - Declaration of Michael Headley, #2 Exhibit FF to Headley Dec, #3 Exhibit GG to Headley Dec, #4 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2014) Modified on 9/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2014 Filing 635 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Headley, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Confidential Unredacted Version of Motion)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 634 MOTION (Renewed) for Prejudgment Interest filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 10/2/2014. Replies due by 10/9/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 16, 2014 Filing 633 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/22/2014, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Pence, Telephone number (619) 587-0173, e-mail: james_pence@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #622 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2014. (Related documents(s) #622 ) (Pence, James) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER RE POST-TRIAL MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 9, 2014. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 631 RESPONSE to re #630 Response ( Non Motion ) to Power Integrations' Response to Fairchild's Statement of Supplemental Authority Regarding Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Willfulness by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 28, 2014 Filing 630 RESPONSE to re #628 Statement, of Supplemental Authority Regarding D574 Fairchild's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Willfulness by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 26, 2014 Filing 629 REPLY (re #596 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law FAIRCHILD'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, NEW TRIAL, AND/OR REMITTITUR PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 50 AND 59 ) Unredacted Version of Reply Brief Pursuant to Order at Dkt. Entry 621 filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 26, 2014 Filing 628 Statement re #574 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Re Willfulness Supplemental Authorities by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 26, 2014 Filing 627 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Power Integrations, Inc. for Court Reporter James Pence. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 626 AMENDED CIVIL MINUTES Amendment to #625 Motion Hearing,,,,. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 625 Minute Entry: #596 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law FAIRCHILD'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, NEW TRIAL, AND/OR REMITTITUR PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 50 AND 59 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation., Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 8/22/2014). (Court Reporter James Pence.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/22/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 624 Statement re #596 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law FAIRCHILD'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, NEW TRIAL, AND/OR REMITTITUR PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 50 AND 59 by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (CIVIL LOCAL RULE 11-3). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 20, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 19, 2014 Filing 622 ** Correction: Court Reporter James Pence has been assigned to cover this upcoming hearing on 8/22/2014 before Judge Chesney. **TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 8/19/2014) Modified on 8/19/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' AUGUST 6, 2014 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 18, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 620 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Charles Hawkins ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8852449.) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hawkins, Charles) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 619 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #612 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of its Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 [Exhibits B-C] filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #612 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 7, 2014 Filing 618 EXHIBITS re #601 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to D601-1 the Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of Power Integrations' Opposition to Fairchild's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur Pursuant to FRCP 50 and 59 (Public version; originally submitted under seal as D600-2 and replaces D601-3 place-holder))(Related document(s) #601 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 7, 2014 Filing 617 EXHIBITS re #587 Declaration in Support,,, filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M to D587 the Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of Power Integrations' Opening Brief Requesting a Declaration that this Case is Exceptional and for Award of Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees (Public version; originally submitted under seal as D586-6), #2 Exhibit N to D587 the Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of Power Integrations' Opening Brief Requesting a Declaration that this Case is Exceptional and for Award of Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees (Public version; originally submitted under seal as D586-7), #3 Exhibit O to D587 the Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of Power Integrations' Opening Brief Requesting a Declaration that this Case is Exceptional and for Award of Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees (Public version; originally submitted under seal as D586-8), #4 Exhibit P to D587 the Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of Power Integrations' Opening Brief Requesting a Declaration that this Case is Exceptional and for Award of Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees (Public version; originally submitted under seal as D586-9), #5 Exhibit Q to D587 the Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of Power Integrations' Opening Brief Requesting a Declaration that this Case is Exceptional and for Award of Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees (Public version; originally submitted under seal as D586-10), #6 Exhibit R to D587 the Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of Power Integrations' Opening Brief Requesting a Declaration that this Case is Exceptional and for Award of Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees (Public version; originally submitted under seal as D586-11))(Related document(s) #587 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 7, 2014 Filing 616 EXHIBITS re #584 Declaration in Support,, filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C to D584 the Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of Power Integrations' Motion for a Permanent Injunction (Public version; originally submitted under seal as D582-5), #2 Exhibit L to D584 the Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of Power Integrations' Motion for a Permanent Injunction (Public version; originally submitted under seal as D582-14), #3 Exhibit P to D584 the Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of Power Integrations' Motion for a Permanent Injunction (Public version; originally submitted under seal as D582-16), #4 Exhibit Q to D584 the Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of Power Integrations' Motion for a Permanent Injunction (Public version; originally submitted under seal as D582-17))(Related document(s) #584 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 7, 2014 Filing 615 EXHIBITS re #579 Declaration in Support, filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to D579 the Declaration of Michael R. Headley In Support of Power Integrations' Renewed Motion for Judgement as a Matter of Law (Public version; originally submitted under seal as D580-4, #2 Exhibit B to D579 the Declaration of Michael R. Headley In Support of Power Integrations' Renewed Motion for Judgement as a Matter of Law (Public version; originally submitted under seal as D580-5)(Related document(s) #579 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 6, 2014 Filing 614 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation re #613 Reply to Opposition/Response,, (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 6, 2014 Filing 613 REPLY (re #596 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law FAIRCHILD'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, NEW TRIAL, AND/OR REMITTITUR PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 50 AND 59 ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick Decl ISO, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B (FILED UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit C (FILED UNDER SEAL), #5 Exhibit D)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 6, 2014 Filing 612 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of its Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of law, New Trial, and/or Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED VERSION of Reply ISO Renewed Motion for JMOL, #4 UNREDACTED VERSION of Reply ISO Renewed Motion for JMOL, #5 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION of Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION of Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION of Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION of Exhibit C)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 6, 2014 Filing 611 REPLY (re #574 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Re Willfulness ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C. Ondrick ISO, #2 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 6, 2014 Filing 610 REPLY (re #578 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Renewed] That the SG6841 and FAN6747 Representative Products Literally Infringe the '908 Patent ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDERS (DKT NOS. 603, 604) DENYING AND DENYING-IN-PART PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 582, 586). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 31, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 31, 2014 Filing 608 MOTION for Reconsideration re #606 Order,, Terminate Motions, Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration of Orders (Dkt Nos. 603, 604) Denying and Denying-in-Part Plaintiff's Administrative Motions to Seal (Dkt. Nos. 582, 586) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #607 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christina A. Ondrick, #2 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 31, 2014 Filing 607 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO.607*** MOTION for Reconsideration re #606 Order,, Terminate Motions, Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration of Orders (Dkt Nos. 603, 604) Denying and Denying-in-Part Plaintiffs' Administrative Motions to Seal (Dkt. Nos. 582, 586) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christinia A. Ondrick, #2 Proposed Order)(Chun, A.) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDERS (ECF NOS. 603, 604) DENYING AND DENYING-IN-PART PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL (ECF NOS. 582, 586). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 31, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 605 MOTION for Leave to File to File Motion for Reconsideration of ECF Nos. 603 and 604 re Plaintiff's Motions to Seal (ECF Nos. 582 and 586) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Ondrick, #2 Exhibit 1 - Motion for Reconsideration and Proposed Order Granting Reconsideration, #3 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 582); DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL (DKT. NOS. 580, 586, 600); DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 602 RESPONSE (re #574 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Re Willfulness ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Headley, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 601 RESPONSE (re #596 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law FAIRCHILD'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, NEW TRIAL, AND/OR REMITTITUR PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 50 AND 59 ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Headley, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 (Placeholder-Submitted Under Seal), #4 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 600 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 599 RESPONSE (re #578 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Renewed] That the SG6841 and FAN6747 Representative Products Literally Infringe the '908 Patent ) Fairchild's Brief in Opposition to Power Integrations' Renewed Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law Regarding Literal Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,538,908 filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick ISO, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 598 Power Integration's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Responding to D576-4 Fairchild's Allegation of Inequitable Conduct Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,538,908 by Power Integration. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2014) Modified on 7/21/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2014 Filing 597 Power Integrations' Opposition/Response to D576-6 Fairchild's Inequitable Conduct Motion Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,538,908 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2014) Modified on 7/18/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2014 Filing 596 FAIRCHILD'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, NEW TRIAL, AND/OR REMITTITUR PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 50 AND 59 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/18/2014. Replies due by 8/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL [DKT. NO. #576 ]. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 17, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 13, 2014 Filing 594 Minute Entry: Status Conference (Date Filed: 6/13/2014). Schedule re: Revised Consolidated Motion: Opening brief (no more than 45 pages) due by 6/27/2014. Responses due by 7/18/2014. Replies (no more than 20 pages) due by 8/6/2014. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (Not Reported.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/13/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER STRIKING SEVEN SEPARATE MOTIONS WITH LEAVE TO FILE AS CONSOLIDATED MOTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 13, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 592 CLERKS NOTICE: Pursuant to counsel's request, the Status Conference previously set for 5/30/2014 has been continued to 6/13/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 14, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re #590 Order Status Conference set for 5/30/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER RE: POST-TRIAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 13, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER RE: POST-TRIAL BRIEFING; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 13, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 13, 2014 Filing 589 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #576 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion for a Finding that U.S. Patent No. 6,538,908 is Unenforceable Due to Power Integrations' Inequitable Conduct and Fairchild's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #576 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 12, 2014 Filing 588 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Power Integrations, Inc. re #586 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 587 Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of Power Integrations' Opening Brief Requesting a Declaration that this Case is Exceptional and for Award of Enhanced Damages and Attorneys' Fees filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit S, #13 Exhibit T, #14 Exhibit U, #15 Exhibit V, #16 Exhibit W, #17 Exhibit X, #18 Exhibit Y, #19 Exhibit Z, #20 Exhibit AA, #21 Exhibit BB, #22 Exhibit CC, #23 Exhibit DD, #24 Exhibit EE, #25 Exhibit FF, #26 Exhibit GG, #27 Exhibit HH, #28 Exhibit II, #29 Exhibit JJ, #30 Exhibit KK, #31 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Exceptional Case)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 586 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of EDD ISO Admin Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Brief re Exceptional Case, #4 UNREDACTED Brief re Exceptional Case, #5 UNREDACTED EX J, #6 UNREDACTED EX M, #7 UNREDACTED EX N, #8 UNREDACTED EX O, #9 UNREDACTED EX P, #10 UNREDACTED EX Q, #11 UNREDACTED XH R, #12 UNREDACTED EX LL, #13 UNREDACTED EX MM)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 585 Proposed Order Granting Power Integrations Motion for Permanent Injunction by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 584 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of Power Integrations' Motion for Permanent Injunction filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit N, #4 Exhibit O, #5 Exhibit R, #6 Exhibit S, #7 Exhibit T, #8 Exhibit U, #9 Exhibit V, #10 Exhibit W, #11 Exhibit X, #12 Exhibit Y, #13 Exhibit Z, #14 Exhibit AA, #15 Exhibit BB, #16 Exhibit CC, #17 Exhibit DD, #18 Exhibit EE)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 583 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Power Integrations, Inc. re #582 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations Motion for Permanent Injunction and Supporting Exhibits (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 582 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations Motion for Permanent Injunction and Supporting Exhibits filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael R. Headley Decl in Support of Admin Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Power Integrations Motion for Permanent Injunction, #4 UNREDACTED Power Integrations Motion for Permanent Injunction, #5 UNREDACTED Exhibit C - PX-0206 excerpts, #6 UNREDACTED Exhibit D - DX-2605, #7 UNREDACTED Exhibit E - DX-2749 excerpts, #8 UNREDACTED Exhibit F - DX-2898 excerpts, #9 UNREDACTED Exhibit G - PX-0072 excerpts, #10 UNREDACTED Exhibit H - PX-1532 excerpts, #11 UNREDACTED Exhibit I - PX-1535 excerpts, #12 UNREDACTED Exhibit J - PX-1530 excerpts, #13 UNREDACTED Exhibit K - DX-2540, #14 UNREDACTED Exhibit L - 5-31-13 FCS Suppl Resp to PIs 2nd Set of Rogs - excerpts, #15 UNREDACTED Exhibit M - PX-1529 excerpts, #16 UNREDACTED Exhibit P - PX-0118 excerpts, #17 UNREDACTED Exhibit Q - PX-0184)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 581 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Power Integrations, Inc. re #580 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A and B to the Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of Power Integrations' Renewed JMOL that the SG6841 and FAN6747 Representative Products Literally Infringe the '908 Patent (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 580 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A and B to the Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of Power Integrations' Renewed JMOL that the SG6841 and FAN6747 Representative Products Literally Infringe the '908 Patent filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael Headley Declaration in Support of Admin Mot to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 UNREDACTED EX. A to Headley Declaration in support of PI JMOL re '908 Infringement, #4 UNREDACTED EX. B to Headley Declaration in support of PI JMOL re '908 Infringement)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 579 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #578 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Renewed] That the SG6841 and FAN6747 Representative Products Literally Infringe the '908 Patent filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #578 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 578 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Renewed] That the SG6841 and FAN6747 Representative Products Literally Infringe the '908 Patent filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 6/6/2014. Replies due by 6/20/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 577 MOTION Prejudgment Interest filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 5/23/2014. Replies due by 5/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan D. Putnam, #2 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 576 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fairchild's Motion for a Finding that U.S. Patent No. 6,538,908 is Unenforceable Due to Power Integrations' Inequitable Conduct and Fairchild's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Re Unenforceability of U.S. Patent No. 6,538,908 Due to Power Integrations' Inequitable Conduct filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jeremiah A. Armstrong, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Fairchild's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Regarding Unenforceability of U.S. Patent No. 6,538,908 Due to Power Integrations' Inequitable Conduct, #4 Unredacted Version of Fairchild's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Regarding Unenforceability of U.S. Patent No. 6,538,908 Due to Power Integrations' Inequitable Conduct, #5 Unredacted-Yellow Highlighted Version of Fairchild's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Regarding Unenforceability of U.S. Patent No. 6,538,908 Due to Power Integrations' Inequitable Conduct, #6 Redacted Version of Fairchild's Motion for a Finding that U.S. Patent No. 6,538,908 is Unenforceable Due to Power Integrations' Inequitable Conduct, #7 Unredacted Version of Fairchild's Motion for a Finding that U.S. Patent No. 6,538,908 is Unenforceable Due to Power Integrations' Inequitable Conduct, #8 Unredacted-Yellow Highlighted Version of Fairchild's Motion for a Finding that U.S. Patent No. 6,538,908 is Unenforceable Due to Power Integrations' Inequitable Conduct, #9 Declaration Jeremiah A. Armstrong, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit F, #16 Exhibit G, #17 Exhibit H, #18 Exhibit I, #19 Exhibit J, #20 Exhibit K, #21 Exhibit L, #22 Exhibit M, #23 Exhibit N, #24 Exhibit O, #25 Exhibit P, #26 Exhibit Q, #27 Exhibit R, #28 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit S, #29 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit S, #30 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit T, #31 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit T, #32 Exhibit U, #33 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 575 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law that U.S. Patent No. 6,212,079 is Anticipated, or in the Alternative, For a New Trial filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 5/23/2014. Replies due by 5/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christina Ondrick, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 574 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Re Willfulness filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 5/23/2014. Replies due by 5/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christina Ondrick, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 573 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Re No Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,538,908 Or, In The Alternative, For a New Trial filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 5/23/2014. Replies due by 5/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christina Ondrick, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 Filing 572 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Re Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,212,079 Or, In The Alternative, For a New Trial filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 5/23/2014. Replies due by 5/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 Filing 571 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law that Patent No. 6,538,908 is Invalid Or, In The Alternative, For a New Trial filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 5/23/2014. Replies due by 5/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christina Ondrick, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2014 Filing 570 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Or In The Alternative, New Trial On Damages filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 5/22/2014. Replies due by 5/29/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 8, 2014 Filing 569 MOTION for New Trial on Damages filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 5/22/2014. Replies due by 5/29/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 8, 2014 Filing 568 RENEWED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Infringement of the '977 Patent, or, in the Alternative, For a New Trial filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 5/22/2014. Replies due by 5/29/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Leigh J. Martinson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL PARTIES' RESPECTIVE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 566 : Exhibit A to #565 Trial Brief No 2 Regarding the Outcomes of Prior Litigations (Public Version; originally submitted under seal as D501-5) - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #565-1 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #565 ) (Lamberson, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/7/2014) Modified on 3/10/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2014 Filing 565 TRIAL BRIEF No. 2 Regarding the Outcomes of Prior Litigations (Public Versions; originally submitted under seal as D501-4, 5) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (ERRONEOUS ATTACHMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD Attachments: #1 Exhibit A )(Lamberson, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/7/2014) Modified on 3/10/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2014 Filing 564 Exhibit D to #499 the Declaration of Amy Liang in Support of Power Integrations' Trial Brief No. 1 Regarding Claim Construction of the '908 Patent (Public Version; originally submitted under seal as D497-3) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #499 ) (Liang, Amy) (Filed on 3/7/2014) Modified on 3/10/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2014 Filing 563 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 4, 2014, Volume 16 of Trial Transcript, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 562 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 3, 2014, Volume 15 of Trial Transcript, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 561 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 28, 2014, Volume 14 of Trial Transcript, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 560 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 27, 2014, Volume 13 of Trial Transcript, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 559 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 26, 2014, Volume 12 of Trial Transcript, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 558 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 25, 2014, Volume 11 of Trial Transcript, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 557 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 24, 2014, Volume 10 of Trial Transcript, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 556 Transcript of Proceedings, Volume 9 of Trial Transcript, held on February 21, 2014, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 555 Transcript of Proceedings, Volume 8 of Trial Transcript, held on February 20, 2014, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 554 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 19, 2014, Volume 7 of Trial Transcript, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 553 CLERKS NOTICE: All admitted trial exhibits returned to counsel. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Post-Trial Briefing Schedule: Opening briefs due by 5/9/2014; Responses due by 6/6/2014; Replies due by 6/20/2014. Equitable issue briefing schedule: Opening briefs due by 5/9/2014; Responses due by 6/16/2014. Post-Trial Hearing set for 7/11/2014 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 552 Final Jury Instructions. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 551 JURY VERDICT. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 550 Jury Notes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 549 Minute Entry: Jury Trial completed on 3/4/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 3/4/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 548 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 3/3/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 3/4/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/4/14. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER GRANTING POWER INTEGRATIONS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL ITS TRIAL BRIEF NO. 3 AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT THEREOF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 4, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 545 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/28/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 3/3/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/3/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 544 Reply by Power Integrations, Inc. : Power Integrations' Reply Regarding #543 Objections to Fairchild's Proposed In-Court Demonstration (Public Version; originally submitted under seal as D490-4, 5, 6, 7, 8) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2014) Modified on 3/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2014 Filing 543 OBJECTIONS to Fairchild's Proposed In-Court Demonstration (Public Versions; originally submitted under seal as D467-5, 4) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 542 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/27/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 2/28/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Log) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 541 TRIAL BRIEF Response to Power Integrations' Trial Brief No. 5 re: PI's MIL No. 8 by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 540 TRIAL BRIEF No. 5 regarding Fairchild's Violation of the Court's Ruling on Power Integrations Motion In Limine 8 (corrected copy) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 539 ***FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #540 *** TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Fairchild's Violation of the Court's Ruling on Power Integrations' Motion in Limine No. 8 by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/27/2014) Modified on 2/28/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2014 Filing 538 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/26/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 2/27/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Log) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 537 Exhibit List - Joint List of Admitted Trial Exhibits by Power Integrations, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Joint Exhibit List)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 536 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That Power Integrations Does Not Infringe The '977 Patent filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 3/13/2014. Replies due by 3/20/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liang, Amy) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S FEBRUARY 17, 2014 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL re #497 , #501 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 26, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 534 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Responses due by 3/12/2014. Replies due by 3/19/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chun, A.) (Filed on 2/26/2014) Modified on 2/27/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2014 Filing 533 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/25/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 2/26/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Log) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 532 TRIAL BRIEF No. 3 to Preclude Improper Rebuttal Testimony by Dr. Kelley by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Jacobs Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 531 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(a) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 3/12/2014. Replies due by 3/19/2014. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 530 TRIAL BRIEF No 4 Regarding Willful Infringement by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liang, Amy) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 529 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That The '908 Patent is Not Invalid filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 3/11/2014. Replies due by 3/18/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liang, Amy) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 528 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law that Fairchild Infringes the '908 Patent filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 3/11/2014. Replies due by 3/18/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liang, Amy) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 527 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 3/11/2014. Replies due by 3/18/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lamberson, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 526 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/24/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 2/25/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Log) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 525 TRIAL BRIEF No. 2 Seeking Additional Trial Time by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 524 Response re #519 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations Trial Brief No. 3 and Exhibits C to I to the Declaration of Enrique Duarte In Support byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 523 Exhibit List FAIRCHILD'S SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (DX-5709 to DX-5845) by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc... (Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 522 Proposed Order re #519 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations Trial Brief No. 3 and Exhibits C to I to the Declaration of Enrique Duarte In Support - PROPOSED ORDER TO POWER INTEGRATIONS' TRIAL BRIEF NO. 3 by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 521 Appendix re #519 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations Trial Brief No. 3 and Exhibits C to I to the Declaration of Enrique Duarte In Support - APPENDIX A TO POWER INTEGRATIONS' TRIAL BRIEF NO. 3 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #519 ) (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 520 Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of #519 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations Trial Brief No. 3 and Exhibits C to I to the Declaration of Enrique Duarte In Support filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #519 ) (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 519 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations Trial Brief No. 3 and Exhibits C to I to the Declaration of Enrique Duarte In Support filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte In Support of Admin Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order re Admin Motion to Seal, #3 REDACTED PI Trial Brf No 3, #4 UNREDACTED PI Trial Brf No 3, #5 UNREDACTED Ex C to Duarte Decl ISO PI Trial Brf No 3, #6 UNREDACTED Ex D to Duarte Decl ISO PI Trial Brf No 3, #7 UNREDACTED Ex E to Duarte Decl ISO PI Trial Brf No 3, #8 UNREDACTED Ex F to Duarte Decl ISO PI Trial Brf No 3, #9 UNREDACTED Ex G to Duarte Decl ISO PI Trial Brf No 3, #10 UNREDACTED Ex H to Duarte Decl ISO PI Trial Brf No 3, #11 UNREDACTED Ex I to Duarte Decl ISO PI Trial Brf No 3, #12 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 518 Proposed Form of Verdict by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation . (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 517 OBJECTIONS to re #515 Proposed Jury Instructions Regarding Timely Instructions by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Chun, A.) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 516 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/20/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 2/21/2014). Jury Instruction Conference set for 2/21/2014 01:30 PM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Log) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/21/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 515 Proposed Jury Instructions by Power Integrations, Inc. (Plaintiff's Additional Proposed Jury Instructions). (Lamberson, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S FEBRUARY 7, 2014 AND FEBRUARY 13, 2014 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL, re #467 and #490 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 20, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 513 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/19/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 2/20/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Log) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/20/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 512 Transcript of Proceedings, Volume 6 of Trial Transcript, held on February 18, 2014, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 511 (This transcript excludes the sealed portion that has been filed separately under seal.) Transcript of Proceedings, Volume 5 of Trial Transcript, held on February 13, 2014, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/19/2014) Modified on 3/11/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2014 Filing 510 Transcript of Proceedings, Volume 4 of Trial Transcript, held on February 12, 2014, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 509 Transcript of Proceedings, Volume 3 of Trial Transcript, held on February 11, 2014, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 508 Transcript of Proceedings, Volume 2 of Trial, held on February 10, 2014, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 507 Transcript of Proceedings, Volume 1 of Trial Transcript, held on February 6, 2014, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2014. (Related documents(s) #425 , #411 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 506 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Marisa Chun (Chun, A.) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 505 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/18/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 2/19/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Log) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 504 TRIAL BRIEF Responseto Power Integrations' Claim Construction Trial Brief by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Jacobs Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 17, 2014 Filing 503 Exhibit List FAIRCHILD'S SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (DX-5685 to DX-5707) by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc... (Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 2/17/2014)
February 17, 2014 Filing 502 Proposed Order re #501 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations' Trial Brief No. 2 Regarding the Outcomes of Prior Litigations Trial Brief No. 2 Regarding the Outcomes of Prior Litigations by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Lamberson, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/17/2014)
February 17, 2014 Filing 501 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations' Trial Brief No. 2 Regarding the Outcomes of Prior Litigations filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jonathan Lamberson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Trial Brief No. 2, #4 Unredacted Version of Trial Brief No. 2, #5 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit A, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lamberson, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/17/2014)
February 17, 2014 Filing 500 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Power Integrations, Inc. re #497 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit D to the Declaration of Amy Liang in Support of Power Integrations' Trial Brief No. 1 Regarding Claim Construction of the '908 Patent (Liang, Amy) (Filed on 2/17/2014)
February 17, 2014 Filing 499 Declaration of Amy Liang in Support of #498 Trial Brief No. 1 Regarding Claim Construction of the '908 Patent filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #498 ) (Liang, Amy) (Filed on 2/17/2014)
February 17, 2014 Filing 498 TRIAL BRIEF No. 1 Regarding Claim Construction of the '908 Patent by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liang, Amy) (Filed on 2/17/2014)
February 17, 2014 Filing 497 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit D to the Declaration of Amy Liang in Support of Power Integrations' Trial Brief No. 1 Regarding Claim Construction of the '908 Patent filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Liang, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D to the Declaration of Amy Liang in Support of Power Integrations' Trial Brief No. 1 Regarding Claim Construction of the '908 Patent)(Liang, Amy) (Filed on 2/17/2014)
February 17, 2014 Filing 496 RESPONSE (re #490 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Regarding Objections to Fairchild's Proposed In-Court Demonstration ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration by Blair M. Jacobs, #2 Jacobs Declaration Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/17/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 495 Sealed Excerpt/Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/13/14, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, Telephone number 415-373-2529. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 494 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/13/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 2/14/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Log) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2014)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER GRANTING FAIRCHILD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL FAIRCHILD'S OPPOSITION TO POWER INTEGRATIONS' MOTION TO STRIKE FAIRCHILD'S SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS re #457 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 13, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 492 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/12/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 2/13/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Log) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 491 EXHIBITS re #490 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Regarding Objections to Fairchild's Proposed In-Court Demonstration Exhibits E-G to Reply filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #490 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 490 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Regarding Objections to Fairchild's Proposed In-Court Demonstration filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael Headley, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 489 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 2/11/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 2/12/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Log) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 488 Fairchild's Supplemental Trial Brief No. 1 Regarding the Doctrine of Equivalents by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/12/2014) Modified on 2/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2014 Filing 487 Amended Trial Exhibit List by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc... (Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 2/11/2014) Modified on 2/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2014 Filing 486 TRIAL BRIEF No. 1 Regarding Evidence to Rebut Plaintiff's Doctrine of Equivalents Position by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 485 Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of #457 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #457 ) (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 484 Minute Entry: Jury Trial began on 2/10/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 2/10/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Log) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 483 Minute Entry: Jury Selection held on 2/6/2014 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 2/10/2014). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (Attachments: #1 Trial Log) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PATRICK STAFFORD PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 481 RESPONSE to /Opposition to #362 Defendants' Administrative Motion No. 2 Seeking Evidentiary Hearing on Damages Prior to Trial (Public Versions; originally submitted under seal as D388-4, 5) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Duarte Declaration in Support)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified on 2/11/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 Filing 480 Power Integrations' Submission of Disputed Designations for February 10, 2014 by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Lamberson, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified on 2/11/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 Filing 479 Amended Trial Exhibit List by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc... (Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2014 Filing 478 Proposed Jury Instructions by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation and Objections to Instructions Proposed by Power Integrations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/9/2014)
February 9, 2014 Filing 477 OBJECTIONS to re #476 Proposed Jury Instructions by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lamberson, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/9/2014)
February 9, 2014 Filing 476 Proposed Jury Instructions by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Power Integrations, Inc., System General Corporation . (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/9/2014)
February 9, 2014 Filing 475 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Stafford ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8362108.) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Stafford, Patrick) (Filed on 2/9/2014)
February 8, 2014 Filing 474 RESPONSE (re #467 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations' Objections to Fairchild's Proposed In-Court Demonstration ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/8/2014)
February 8, 2014 Filing 473 Amended Trial Exhibit List by Power Integrations, Inc... (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/8/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2014 Filing 472 Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of #471 Integrations' Submission Regarding Disputed Designations for February 10, 2014 filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #471 ) (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/8/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2014 Filing 471 Power Integrations' Submission Regarding Disputed Designations for February 10, 2014 by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/8/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 470 DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR AND ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO USE LOADING DOCK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 7, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ARTEM N. SOKOLOV PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 7, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 468 EXHIBITS A to Power Integrations Objections to Fairchild's Proposed In-Court Demonstration (D.I. 467-4) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 467 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations' Objections to Fairchild's Proposed In-Court Demonstration filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Headley, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of Objections to Fairchild's Proposed In-Court Demonstration, #4 Unredacted version of Objections to Fairchild's Proposed In-Court Demonstration, #5 UnRedacted version of Exhibit B to Objections to Fairchild's Proposed In-Court Demonstration, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 466 MOTION to Strike Fairchild's Supplemental Expert Reports (Public Versions; originally submitted as D421-4, 8, 9) filed by Power Integrations, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Caption Page, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/7/2014 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2014 Filing 465 Request for Order Granting Permission to Use Loading Dock by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2014 Filing 464 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Artem N. Sokolov ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8357598.) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Sokolov, Artem) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER RE ENTRY OF ELECTRONIC PHYSICAL ITEMS INTO THE COURT FOR TRIAL PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 58. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 462 [Proposed] Order denying #445 Fairchild's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Power Integrations' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,179,700) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/6/2014) Modified on 2/6/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2014 Filing 461 Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of #460 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Plaintiff Power Integrations' Opposition to Fairchild's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Power Integrations' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,179,700) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #460 ) (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 460 RESPONSE (re #445 MOTION for Reconsideration ) : Plaintiff Power Integrations' Opposition to Fairchild's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Power Integrations' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,179,700 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 459 Proposed Order re Entry Of Electronic Physical Items Into The Court For Trial Pursuant To General Order No. 58 by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 458 JOINT [PROPOSED] PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS; SEPARATE PRELIMINARY INSTRUCTIONS AND OBJECTIONS THERETO by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/5/2014) Modified on 2/6/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing Jury Trial set for 2/11/2014 09:00 AM through 2/28/2014 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 457 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal FAIRCHILDS OPPOSITION TO POWER INTEGRATIONS MOTION TO STRIKE FAIRCHILDS SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declartion of J. Armstrong, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (REDACTED) Opposition To Power Integrations Motion To Strike Fairchilds Supplemental Expert Reports, #4 (SEALED) Opposition To Power Integrations Motion To Strike Fairchilds Supplemental Expert Reports, #5 Declaration of B. Jacobs in Support of Opposition To Power Integrations Motion To Strike Fairchilds Supplemental Expert Reports, #6 (SEALED) Exhibit A, #7 (SEALED) Exhibit B Part 1 of 2, #8 (SEALED) Exhibit B Part 1 of 2)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 2/5/2014) Modified on 2/6/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 Filing 456 NOTICE by Power Integrations, Inc. : Offer of Proof Regarding Prior Litigation Between the Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lamberson, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 455 Proposed Form of Verdict by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation . (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 454 Supplement to Joint Pretrial Statement by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation . (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/4/2014) Modified on 2/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2014 Filing 453 Proposed Order DENYING #418 POWER INTEGRATIONS RENEWED MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. GU-YEON WEI by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/4/2014) Modified on 2/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2014 Filing 452 Joint Submission of Deposition Designations and Objections by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 2/4/2014) Modified on 2/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2014 Filing 451 Potential Witness List by Power Integrations, Inc. . (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/4/2014) Modified on 2/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 450 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ENTRY OF EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURT FOR TRIAL PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 58. The parties are DIRECTED to contact the Deputy Clerk to arrange for access to the courtroom. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF POWER INTEGRATIONS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; DIRECTION TO PLAINTIFF re #421 . (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 448 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Entry of Equipment Into The Court For Trial Pursuant To General Order No. 58 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Power Integrations, Inc., System General Corporation. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF POWER INTEGRATIONS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re #418 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014) Modified on 2/4/2014 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S JANUARY 21, 2014 MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF re #388 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 445 MOTION for Reconsideration OF ORDER REGARDING POWER INTEGRATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,179,700 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blair Jacobs, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Blair Jacobs, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Blair Jacobs)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/4/2014) Modified on 2/4/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2014 Filing 444 Potential Witness List by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation . (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/4/2014) Modified on 2/4/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2014 Filing 443 Statement JOINT PRELIMINARY STATEMENT OF THE CASE by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 442 Proposed Voir Dire by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation . (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 441 Proposed Voir Dire by Power Integrations, Inc. . (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 440 Proposed Form of Verdict by Power Integrations, Inc. . (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 439 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 28, 2014, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2014. (Related document(s) #410 , #424 ) (rhm) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 31, 2014 Filing 438 EXHIBITS re #421 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal : Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Strike Fairchild's Supplemental Expert Reports Served on the Eve of Trial and Certain Exhibits in Support Thereof Declaration Of Jeremiah A. Armstrong In Support Of Power Integrations Administrative Motion To File Under Seal [Dkt. No. 421] filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #421 ) (Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 31, 2014 Filing 437 EXHIBITS re #418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gu-Yeon Wei and Exhibits 22-32 in support thereof Declaration Of Jeremiah A. Armstrong In Support Of Power Integrations Administrative Motion To File Under Seal [Dkt. No. 418] filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #418 ) (Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 436 RESPONSE to /Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 (Public Version; originally submitted as D403-4) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 435 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Preclude Testimony that the Claimed "Multi-Function Circuit" Limitation can be Met by a Circuit Performing Only a Single Function (Public Version; originally submitted as D364-25) filed by Power Integrations, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Caption Page, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/30/2014) Modified on 1/31/2014 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2014 Filing 434 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Dr. Wei's Opinions and Testimony Relying on Testing by Fairchild Engineers Eddie Chueh and Wei-Hsuan Huang (Public Version; originally submitted as D364-15) filed by Power Integrations, Inc. (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/30/2014) Modified on 1/31/2014 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF POWER INTEGRATIONS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF re #403 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER GRANTING IN PART FAIRCHILD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL FAIRCHILD'S OPPOSITION TO POWER INTEGRATIONS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS re #400 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) Modified on 1/29/2014 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER GRANTING FAIRCHILD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL FAIRCHILD'S OPPOSITION TO POWER INTEGRATIONS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 re #399 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER GRANTING FAIRCHILD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL FAIRCHILD'S OPPOSITION TO POWER INTEGRATIONS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 re #398 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) Modified on 1/29/2014 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2014 Filing 429 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 1/29/2014), ***Motions terminated: #388 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Power Integrations' Opposition to Defendants' Administrative Motion No. 2 Seeking Evidentiary Hearing on Damages Prior to Trial filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #397 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion In Limine No. 1 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #362 MOTION Seeking Evidentiary Hearing On Applicable Damages Period Prior To The Jury Trial (ADMINISTRATIVE Motion No. 2) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #371 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Preclude Testimony Requiring Proof of Actual Operation of the Apparatus Claim of the '079 Patent to Establish Infringement filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #421 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal : Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Strike Fairchild's Supplemental Expert Reports Served on the Eve of Trial and Certain Exhibits in Support Thereof filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #370 MOTION in Limine No. 5 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY THAT THE "CONTROL CIRCUIT" OF THE '908 PATENT CLAIMS REQUIRES A CURRENT COMPARATOR filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #375 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Doctrine of Equivalents Testimony Barred by Prosecution Estoppel filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #369 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Dr. Wei's Opinions and Testimony Relying on Testing by Fairchild Engineers Eddie Chueh and Wei-Hsuan Huang filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #398 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition To Power Integrations Motion In Limine No. 5 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #403 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #400 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition To Power Integrations Motion In Limine No. 4 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #368 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Preclude any Testimony about Fairchild Products Allegedly Practicing the '977 Patent filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #359 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Preclude Power Integrations From Offering Evidence Related To Irrelevant Product Numbers filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #373 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Preclude Power Integrations' Defenses of Unclean Hands, etc. filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #399 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition To Power Integrations Motion In Limine No. 6 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #360 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Preclude Power Integrations From Questioning Fairchilds Experts Regarding Tests And Analysis Not Disclosed In Their Expert Reports filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #367 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Testimony and Evidence re Apple Inc. filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #366 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Preclude Fairchild from Relying on Advice of Counsel Defense filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #363 MOTION Seeking Evidentiary Hearing On Objective Willfulness Prong To The Court Prior To Jury Trial (ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION No. 1) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #365 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Preclude any Testimony from Lay Witness Jeffrey Hwang Re Alleged Infringement of the '977 Patent filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #361 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Preclude Reference To Prior Litigation Between The Parties filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #372 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Preclude Testimony that the Claimed "Multi-Function Circuit" Limitation can be Met by a Circuit Performing Only a Single Function filed by Power Integrations, Inc... (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER GRANTING FAIRCHILD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL FAIRCHILD'S OPPOSITION TO POWER INTEGRATIONS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 re #397 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) Modified on 1/29/2014 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER GRANTING IN PART FAIRCHILD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; DIRECTION TO DEFENDANTS re #377 , #380 , and #383 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) Modified on 1/29/2014 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF POWER INTEGRATIONS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS MOTION IN LIMINE NOS. 1-2, 4-7, AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF re #364 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) Modified on 1/29/2014 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2014 Filing 425 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 424 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Power Integrations, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 423 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Power Integrations, Inc. re #421 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal : Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Strike Fairchild's Supplemental Expert Reports Served on the Eve of Trial and Certain Exhibits in Support Thereof (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 422 Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Strike Fairchild's Supplemental Expert Reports Served on the Eve of Trial filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 421 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal : Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Strike Fairchild's Supplemental Expert Reports Served on the Eve of Trial and Certain Exhibits in Support Thereof filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Strike Fairchild's Supplemental Expert Reports Served on the Eve of Trial, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Strike Fairchild's Supplemental Expert Reports Served on the Eve of Trial, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex. 1 to Duarte Declaration in Support of Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Strike Fairchild's Supplemental Expert Reports Served on the Eve of Trial, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex. 2 to Duarte Declaration in Support of Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Strike Fairchild's Supplemental Expert Reports Served on the Eve of Trial, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex. 3 to Duarte Declaration in Support of Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Strike Fairchild's Supplemental Expert Reports Served on the Eve of Trial, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex. 4 to Duarte Declaration in Support of Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Strike Fairchild's Supplemental Expert Reports Served on the Eve of Trial, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex. 5 to Duarte Declaration in Support of Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Strike Fairchild's Supplemental Expert Reports Served on the Eve of Trial)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 420 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Power Integrations, Inc. re #418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gu-Yeon Wei and Exhibits 22-32 in support thereof (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 419 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gu-Yeon Wei and Exhibits 22-32 in support thereof Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gu-Yeon Wei filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 21, #6 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #418 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gu-Yeon Wei and Exhibits 22-32 in support thereof filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael R. Headley, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gu-Yeon Wei, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff Power Integrations' Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gu-Yeon Wei, #5 Exhibit 22 (Part 1 of 3), #6 Exhibit 22 (Part 2 of 3), #7 Exhibit 22 (Part 3 of 3), #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 24, #10 Exhibit 25, #11 Exhibit 26, #12 Exhibit 27, #13 Exhibit 28, #14 Exhibit 29, #15 Exhibit 30, #16 Exhibit 31 (Part 1 of 3), #17 Exhibit 31 (Part 2 of 3), #18 Exhibit 31 (Part 3 of 3), #19 Exhibit 32)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 417 Exhibit List Trial Exhibit List by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc... (Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 416 Exhibit List (Trial Exhibit List) by Power Integrations, Inc... (Liang, Amy) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 415 Declaration of Jeremiah A. Armstrong in support of #403 Power Integrations' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/27/2014) Modified on 1/28/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2014 Filing 414 Proposed Form of Verdict by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation . (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 413 Proposed Voir Dire by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation . (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 412 Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of #397 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion In Limine No. 1, #398 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition To Power Integrations Motion In Limine No. 5, #400 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition To Power Integrations Motion In Limine No. 4, #399 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition To Power Integrations Motion In Limine No. 6 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #397 , #398 , #400 , #399 ) (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 411 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 410 ** CORRECTION: COURT REPORTER for 1/28/14 PT BEFORE MMC WILL BE RAYNEE MERCADO.> **TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 1/27/2014) Modified on 1/28/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2014 Filing 409 EXHIBIT D re #400 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition To Power Integrations Motion In Limine No. 4 [REDACTED] Ex D To The Declaration of Blair Jacobs filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Related document(s) #400 ) (Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/24/2014) Modified on 1/27/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2014 Filing 408 DECLARATION of Enrique E. Duarte in Opposition to #359 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Preclude Power Integrations From Offering Evidence Related To Irrelevant Product Numbers filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #359 ) (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 407 DECLARATION of Enrique D. Duarte in Opposition to #360 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Preclude Power Integrations From Questioning Fairchilds Experts Regarding Tests And Analysis Not Disclosed In Their Expert Reports filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #360 ) (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 406 DECLARATION of Enrique D. Duarte in Opposition to #361 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Preclude Reference To Prior Litigation Between The Parties filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #361 ) (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 405 DECLARATION of Enrique D. Duarte in Opposition to #375 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Doctrine of Equivalents Testimony Barred by Prosecution Estoppel filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #375 ) (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 404 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Power Integrations, Inc. re #403 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 403 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of PI Opp to Defs MIL 1, #4 Unredacted Version of PI Opp to Defs MIL 1, #5 Unredacted Version of Ex. F to Duarte Decl. ISO PI Opp to Defs MIL 1, #6 Redacted Version of PI Opp to Defs MIL 2, #7 Unredacted Version of PI Opp to Defs MIL 2, #8 Cover Page for Unredacted Exs. A, C & D to Duarte Decl ISO PI Opp to Defs MIL 2, #9 Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Duarte Decl. ISO PI Opp to Defs MIL 2, #10 Unredacted Version of Ex. C to Duarte Decl. ISO PI Opp to Defs MIL 2, #11 Unredacted Version of Ex. D to Duarte Decl. ISO PI Opp to Defs MIL 2, #12 Redacted Version of PI Opp to Defs MIL 3, #13 Unredacted Version of PI Opp to Defs MIL 3, #14 Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Duarte Decl. ISO PI Opp to Defs MIL 3, #15 Redacted Version of PI Opp to Defs MIL 4, #16 Unredacted Version of PI Opp to Defs MIL 4, #17 Cover page for Unredacted Exs. A, B, D, E & F to Duarte Decl ISO Redacted Version of PI Opp to Defs MIL 4, #18 Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Duarte Decl. ISO PI Opp to Defs MIL 4, #19 Unredacted Version of Ex. B to Duarte Decl. ISO PI Opp to Defs MIL 4, #20 Unredacted Version of Ex. D to Duarte Decl. ISO PI Opp to Defs MIL 4, #21 Unredacted Version of Ex. E to Duarte Decl. ISO PI Opp to Defs MIL 4, #22 Unredacted Version of Ex. F to Duarte Decl. ISO PI Opp to Defs MIL 4, #23 Redacted Version of Ex. D to Duarte Decl. ISO PI Opp to Defs MIL 4)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 402 RESPONSE (re #373 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Preclude Power Integrations' Defenses of Unclean Hands, etc. ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 401 RESPONSE (re #377 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PART 1 ) : Plaintiff Power Integrations' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Portions of Power Integrations' Claim for Reasonable Royalty and Damages filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 400 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition To Power Integrations Motion In Limine No. 4 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 J. Armstrong Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [REDACTED] Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion In Limine No. 4, #4 [SEALED] Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion In Limine No. 4, #5 Declaration of B. Jacobs, #6 [SEALED] Exhibit A to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #7 [REDACTED] Exhibit A to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #8 [SEALED] Exhibit B to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #9 [REDACTED] Exhibit B to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #10 Exhibit C to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #11 [SEALED] Exhibit D to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #12*** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. *** [REDACTED] Exhibit D to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #13 [SEALED] Exhibit E to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #14 [REDACTED] Exhibit E to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #15 Exhibit F to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #16 Exhibit G to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #17 Exhibit H to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #18 Exhibit I to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #19 Exhibit J to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #20 Exhibit K to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #21 Exhibit L to Declaration of B. Jacobs, #22 Exhibit M to Declaration of B. Jacobs)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/22/2014) Modified on 1/23/2014 (fff, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2014 Filing 399 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition To Power Integrations Motion In Limine No. 6 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declartion of J. Armstrong, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [PUBLIC] Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion In Limine No. 6, #4 [SEALED] Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion In Limine No. 6, #5 Declaration of C. Ondrick, #6 [SEALED] Exhibit A to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #7 [REDACTED] Exhibit A to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #8 [SEALED] Exhibit B to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #9 [REDACTED] Exhibit B to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #10 [SEALED] Exhibit C to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #11 [REDACTED] Exhibit C to Declaration of C. Ondrick)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 398 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition To Power Integrations Motion In Limine No. 5 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 J. Armstrong Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [REDACTED] Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion In Limine No. 5, #4 [SEALED] Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion In Limine No. 5, #5 Declaration of C. Ondrick, #6 [SEALED] Exhibit A to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #7 [REDACTED] Exhibit A to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #8 [SEALED] Exhibit B to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #9 [REDACTED] Exhibit B to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #10 [SEALED] Exhibit C to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #11 [REDACTED] Exhibit C to Declaration of C. Ondrick)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 397 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion In Limine No. 1 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 J. Armstrong Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [PUBLIC] Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion In Limine No. 1, #4 [SEALED] Opposition to Power Integrations' Motion In Limine No. 1, #5 Declaration of C. Ondrick, #6 Exhibit A to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #7 [PUBLIC] Exhibit B to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #8 [SEALED] Exhibit B to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #9 [PUBLIC] Exhibit C to Declaration of C. Ondrick, #10 [SEALED] Exhibit C to Declaration of C. Ondrick)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 396 RESPONSE (re #366 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Preclude Fairchild from Relying on Advice of Counsel Defense ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 395 RESPONSE (re #372 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Preclude Testimony that the Claimed "Multi-Function Circuit" Limitation can be Met by a Circuit Performing Only a Single Function ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 394 RESPONSE (re #365 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Preclude any Testimony from Lay Witness Jeffrey Hwang Re Alleged Infringement of the '977 Patent ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 393 RESPONSE (re #368 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Preclude any Testimony about Fairchild Products Allegedly Practicing the '977 Patent ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 392 DECLARATION OF JEREMIAH A. ARMSTRONG IN SUPPORT OF (re #364 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations' Motions in Limine Nos. 1-2, 4-7, and Certain Exhibits in Support Thereof ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/21/2014) Modified on 1/22/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2014 Filing 391 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Power Integrations, Inc. re #388 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Power Integrations' Opposition to Defendants' Administrative Motion No. 2 Seeking Evidentiary Hearing on Damages Prior to Trial (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 390 Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of #389 Opposition/Response to Motion, : Defendants' Administrative Motion No. 2 Seeking Evidentiary Hearing on Damages Prior to Trial filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #389 ) (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 389 RESPONSE (re #362 MOTION Seeking Evidentiary Hearing On Applicable Damages Period Prior To The Jury Trial (ADMINISTRATIVE Motion No. 2) ) (REDACTED PUBLIC) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 388 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Power Integrations' Opposition to Defendants' Administrative Motion No. 2 Seeking Evidentiary Hearing on Damages Prior to Trial filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED PUBLIC version of Opposition to Defs Admin Mot No. 2, #4 UNREDACTED SEALED version of Opposition to Defs Admin Mot No. 2, #5 UNREDACTED SEALED Ex. A to Duarte Decl ISO Opposition to Defs Admin Mot No. 2)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 387 RESPONSE (re #363 MOTION Seeking Evidentiary Hearing On Objective Willfulness Prong To The Court Prior To Jury Trial (ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION No. 1) ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 386 DECLARATION OF ENRIQUE D. DUARTE IN SUPPORT OF (re #377 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PART 1, #383 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Part 3 of 3, #380 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Part 2 of 3 ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/21/2014) Modified on 1/22/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2014 Filing 385 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference (Date Filed: 1/17/2014). Final Pretrial Conference re-set to 1/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Not Reported.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/17/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 384 EXHIBIT G re #369 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Dr. Wei's Opinions and Testimony Relying on Testing by Fairchild Engineers Eddie Chueh and Wei-Hsuan Huang : CORRECTED Exhibit G to the Declaration of Enrique D. Duarte in Support of Plaintiff Power Integrations, Inc.'s Motion in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Dr. Wei's Opinions and Testimony Relying on Testing by Fairchild Engineers Eddie Chueh and Wei-Hsuan Huang filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #369 ) (Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/16/2014) Modified on 1/16/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2014 Filing 383 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Part 3 of 3 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 J. Armstrong Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 UNREDACTED Exhibit 5-B to C. Ondrick Declaration, #4 REDACTED Exhibit 5-B to C. Ondrick Declaration, #5 UNREDACTED Exhibit 5-C to C. Ondrick Declaration, #6 REDACTED Exhibit 5-C to C. Ondrick Declaration)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 382 EXHIBITS re #379 Exhibits, #378 Exhibits, #380 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Part 2 of 3, #376 Declaration in Support, Ex. 7-4 fr Decl. of Christina Ondrick ISO Fairchild's Mots. in Limine Nos.1-6 and Admin Mots 1-2 filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7-5, #2 Exhibit 8-A, #3 Exhibit 8-B)(Related document(s) #379 , #378 , #380 , #376 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 381 EXHIBITS re #379 Exhibits, #378 Exhibits, #376 Declaration in Support, Ex. 7-1 for Decl. of Christina Ondrick ISO Fairchild's Mots in Limine 1-6 and Admin. Motions 1-2 filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7-1 Part 2 of 2, #2 Exhibit 7-3 Part 1 of 3, #3 Exhibit 7-3 Part 2 of 3, #4 Exhibit 7-3 Part 3 of 3)(Related document(s) #379 , #378 , #376 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 380 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Part 2 of 3 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 J. Armstrong Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 UNREDACTED Exhibit 6-1 C. Ondriock Declaration, #4 REDACTED Exhibit 6-1 C. Ondriock Declaration, #5 UNREDACTED Exhibit 8-C C. Ondriock Declaration, #6 REDACTED Exhibit 8-C C. Ondriock Declaration)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 379 EXHIBITS re #377 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PART 1, #378 Exhibits, #376 Declaration in Support, Decl of Christina Ondrick ISO Fairchild's Motions in Limine Nos 1-6 and Admin Mots 1-2, Ex. 7-2 filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Related document(s) #377 , #378 , #376 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 378 EXHIBITS re #376 Declaration in Support, of Fairchild's Motions in Limine Nos.1-6 and Admin Motions Nos. 1-2 filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-2, #2 Exhibit 2-3, #3 Exhibit 2-4, #4 Exhibit 6-2)(Related document(s) #376 ) (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 377 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PART 1 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 J. Armstrong Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 UNREDACTED Motion in Limine 5, #4 REDACTED Motion in Limine 5, #5 Proposed Order, #6 UNREDACTED Exhibit 1-1 to C. Ondrick Declaration, #7 REDACTED Exhibit 1-1 to C. Ondrick Declaration, #8 UNREDACTED Exhibit 2-5 to C. Ondrick Declaration, #9 REDACTED Exhibit 2-5 to C. Ondrick Declaration, #10 UNREDACTED Exhibit 5-A to C. Ondrick Declaration, #11 REDACTED Exhibit 5-A to C. Ondrick Declaration)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 376 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick ISO Fairchild's #358 , #360 , #361 , #362 , #363 , #373 , #375 Motions In Limine Nos.1-6 and Admin Mots #1-2 filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 1-3, #3 Exhibit 1-4)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/16/2014) Modified on 1/16/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2014 Filing 375 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Doctrine of Equivalents Testimony Barred by Prosecution Estoppel filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 1/22/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 374 [Proposed] Order re #373 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Preclude PI Defenses filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 1/22/2014. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/16/2014) Modified on 1/16/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2014 Filing 373 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Preclude Power Integrations' Defenses of Unclean Hands, etc. filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 1/22/2014. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 372 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Preclude Testimony that the Claimed "Multi-Function Circuit" Limitation can be Met by a Circuit Performing Only a Single Function filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Responses due by 1/30/2014. Replies due by 2/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Enrique D. Duarte, #2 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 371 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Preclude Testimony Requiring Proof of Actual Operation of the Apparatus Claim of the '079 Patent to Establish Infringement filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Responses due by 1/30/2014. Replies due by 2/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Enrique D. Duarte, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 370 MOTION in Limine No. 5 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY THAT THE "CONTROL CIRCUIT" OF THE '908 PATENT CLAIMS REQUIRES A CURRENT COMPARATOR filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Replies due by 2/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Enrique D. Duarte, #2 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 369 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Dr. Wei's Opinions and Testimony Relying on Testing by Fairchild Engineers Eddie Chueh and Wei-Hsuan Huang filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Replies due by 2/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Enrique D. Duarte, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G (Incorrect Cover Sheet as Exhibit F), #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/16/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2014 Filing 368 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Preclude any Testimony about Fairchild Products Allegedly Practicing the '977 Patent filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Replies due by 2/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Enrique D. Duarte, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 367 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Testimony and Evidence re Apple Inc. filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Replies due by 2/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Enrique D. Duarte, #2 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 366 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Preclude Fairchild from Relying on Advice of Counsel Defense filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Replies due by 2/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 365 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Preclude any Testimony from Lay Witness Jeffrey Hwang Re Alleged Infringement of the '977 Patent filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Replies due by 2/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Enrique D. Duarte, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 364 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations' Motions in Limine Nos. 1-2, 4-7, and Certain Exhibits in Support Thereof filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Enrique D. Duarte, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED PI CONFIDENTIAL MIL 1 - Apple, #4 UNREDACTED PI CONFIDENTIAL MIL 1 - Apple, #5 UNREDACTED Ex A to PI MIL 1 - Apple, #6 UNREDACTED Ex B to PI MIL 1 - Apple, #7 UNREDACTED Ex C to PI MIL 1 - Apple, #8 REDACTED PI CONFIDENTIAL MIL 2 re no 977 embodying products, #9 UNREDACTED PI CONFIDENTIAL MIL 2 re no 977 embodying products, #10 UNREDACTED Ex A to PI MIL 2-No 977 Embodying Prods, #11 UNREDACTED Ex E to PI MIL 2-No 977 Embodying Prods, #12 UNREDACTED Ex F to PI MIL 2-No 977 Embodying Prods, #13 UNREDACTED Ex G to PI MIL 2-No 977 Embodying Prods, #14 REDACTED PI MIL 4 - Wei testing by Huang Chueh, #15 UNREDACTED PI MIL 4 - Wei testing by Huang Chueh, #16 REDACTED PI MIL 5 -Wei 908 Control Circuit, #17 UNREDACTED PI MIL 5 -Wei 908 Control Circuit, #18 UNREDACTED Ex A to PI MIL 5-Wei 908 Control Circuit, #19 UNREDACTED Ex B to PI MIL 5-Wei 908 Control Circuit, #20 REDACTED PI MIL 6 -Wei 079 apparatus claim, #21 UNREDACTED PI MIL 6 -Wei 079 apparatus claim, #22 UNREDACTED Ex A to MIL 6-Wei 079 Apparatus Claim, #23 UNREDACTED Ex C to MIL 6-Wei 079 Apparatus Claim, #24 REDACTED PI MIL 7 -Wei 908 Multi-Function Circuit, #25 UNREDACTED PI MIL 7 -Wei 908 Multi-Function Circuit, #26 UNREDACTED Ex A to MIL 7-Wei 908 Multifunction Circuit, #27 UNREDACTED Ex B to MIL 7-Wei 908 Multifunction Circuit, #28 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Duarte, Enrique) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 363 MOTION Seeking Evidentiary Hearing On Objective Willfulness Prong To The Court Prior To Jury Trial (ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION No. 1) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Replies due by 2/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 362 MOTION Seeking Evidentiary Hearing On Applicable Damages Period Prior To The Jury Trial (ADMINISTRATIVE Motion No. 2) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Replies due by 2/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 361 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Preclude Reference To Prior Litigation Between The Parties filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Replies due by 2/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 360 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Preclude Power Integrations From Questioning Fairchilds Experts Regarding Tests And Analysis Not Disclosed In Their Expert Reports filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Replies due by 2/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 359 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Preclude Power Integrations From Offering Evidence Related To Irrelevant Product Numbers filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Replies due by 2/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 358 Pretrial Conference Statement by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Power Integrations, Inc., System General Corporation Joint Pretrial Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 357 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 13, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 356 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.. (Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 355 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference -held (Date Filed: 1/8/2014). Telephone Conference set for 1/15/2014 01:30 PM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (Not Reported.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ROSE S. WHELAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 2, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 23, 2013 Filing 353 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Responses due by 1/6/2014. Replies due by 1/13/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Whelan, Rose) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 1, 2013 Filing 352 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-21-2013, before Judge Maxine M. Chesey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2014. (Related documents(s) #344 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/1/2013)
November 26, 2013 Filing 351 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Power Integrations, Inc. for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART FAIRCHILD'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART POWER INTEGRATIONS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER DENYING FAIRCHILD'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF JONATHAN D. PUTNAM; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART POWER INTEGRATIONS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF JAMES MALACKOWSKI. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER DENYING POWER INTEGRATIONS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. GU-YEON WEI AND DR. JONATHAN WOOD. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER GRANTING FAIRCHILD'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. KELLEY'S INFRINGEMENT REPORT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER DENYING FAIRCHILD'S MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 Filing 344 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (McMahon, Terrence) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 21, 2013 Filing 343 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/21/2013 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 11/21/2013) re #255 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. WEI AND DR. WOOD (PUBLIC VERS.) filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #248 MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Kelley's Infringement Report Containing New Infringement Positions filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #254 MOTION to Strike Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #249 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, #252 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #246 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of James Malackowski filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #303 MOTION for De Novo Review of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Fairchild's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions and for De Novo Review of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Fairchild's Motion for Reconsideration re #269 filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/21/2013)
November 21, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #303 MOTION for De Novo Review of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Fairchild's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions and for De Novo Review of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Fairchild's Motion for Reconsideration re #269 . Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 342 AMENDED Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 11/06/2013. Motion Hearing is continued to 11/21/2013 at 9:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 11/12/2013). (Not Reported) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/12/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 341 EXHIBITS re #256 Declaration in Support,, of PI's Mtn to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Wei & Dr. Wood (public versions, filed in response to #313 Order Granting in Part, Denying in Part Mtn to Seal) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Redacted Vers.), #3 Exhibit 3-1 (Redacted Vers.), #4 Errata 3-2 (Redacted Vers.), #5 Exhibit 3-3 (Redacted Vers.), #6 Exhibit 8-1 (Redacted Vers.), #7 Exhibit 8-2 (Redacted Vers.), #8 Exhibit 8-3 (Redacted Vers.), #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) #256 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 340 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #313 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Mtn to Exclude Testimony Dr. Wei & Dr. Wood and Exhs. 2-3, 7-8, and 12-14 to the Headley Dec ISO Same by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to the Headley Dec, #2 Exhibit 3-1 to the Headley Dec, #3 Exhibit 3-2 to the Headley Dec, #4 Exhibit 3-3 to the Headley Dec, #5 Exhibit 7 to the Headley Dec, #6 Exhibit 8-1 to the Headley Dec, #7 Exhibit 8-2 to the Headley Dec, #8 Exhibit 8-3 to the Headley Dec, #9 Exhibit 8-4 to the Headley Dec, #10 Exhibit 8-5 to the Headley Dec, #11 Exhibit 12 to the Headley Dec, #12 Exhibit 13 to the Headley Dec, #13 Exhibit 14 to the Headley Dec)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 339 EXHIBITS No. 5 to the Dec of Howard Pollack ISO #252 PI's Mtn for Summary Judgment (filed in response to #313 Order Granting in Part, Denying in Part 9/27/13 Mtn to Seal) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 338 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #313 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, PI's Mtn for Summary Judgment Re USP Nos. 5,747,977 & 8,179,700 & Exhs. 9-11 to the Pollack Dec ISO Same by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9 to the Pollack Dec, #2 Exhibit 10 to the Pollack Dec., #3 Exhibit 11 to the Pollack Dec.)(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 337 REPLY (re #255 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. WEI AND DR. WOOD (PUBLIC VERS.) ) (Related Document #317 ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #336 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 336 REPLY (re #255 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. WEI AND DR. WOOD (PUBLIC VERS.) ) (Related Document #317 ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 335 EXHIBITS re #317 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, #300 Declaration in Support, Exhibit 14 to Pollack Declaration in Support of Power Integrations' Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,747,977 and 8,179,700 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #317 , #300 ) (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 334 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #317 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, SEALED Power Integrations' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re Non-Infringment of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,747,977 and 8,179,700 by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 333 EXHIBITS re [Dkt 277] Ex 4 to Declaration of Michael R. Headley ISO Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Kelley's Infringement Report [Dkt 314] filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 332 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #314 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Kelley's Infringement Report by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to MTS Kelley.pdf, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to MTS Kelley, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to MTS Kelley, #4 Exhibit Ex 5 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to MTS Kelley, #5 Exhibit Ex 6 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to MTS Kelley, #6 Exhibit Ex 11 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to MTS Kelley, #7 Exhibit Ex 14 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to MTS Kelley)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 331 EXHIBITS re [Dkt 279] Declaration of Michael R. Headley ISO Power Integrations' Opp to Defs' Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt 314] filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 4 to Headley Decl ISO Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Ex 9 to Headley Decl ISO Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit Ex 15 to Headley Decl ISO Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit Ex 17 to Headley Decl ISO Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 330 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #314 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed\SEALED Ex 1 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to MSJ, #2 Exhibit Sealed\SEALED Ex 5 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to MSJ, #3 Exhibit Sealed\SEALED Ex 6 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to MSJ, #4 Exhibit Sealed\SEALED Ex 7 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to MSJ, #5 Exhibit Sealed\SEALED Ex 8 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to MSJ, #6 Exhibit Sealed\SEALED Ex 10 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to MSJ)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 329 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #314 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Opposition to Motion to Exclude Opinion and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SEALED Ex 1 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to Mot to Exclude Putnam, #2 Exhibit SEALED Ex 5 to Headley Decl ISO Opp to Mot to Exclude Putnam)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 328 REPLY IN SUPPORT FOR (re #290 MOTION De Novo Review of Order Denying Fairchild's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions and De Novo Review fo Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration re #269 Discovery Order, Terminate Motions,, #231 Discovery Order ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 11/8/2013) Modified on 11/12/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2013 Filing 327 EXHIBITS 1-4, 15-16, 26, 30, and 33 to re #285 Declaration of Christina Ondrick, #315 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Ondrick Exhibit 2, #2 Ondrick Exhibit 3, #3 Ondrick Exhibit 4, #4 Ondrick Exhibit 15, #5 Ondrick Exhibit 16, #6 Ondrick Exhibit 26, #7 Ondrick Exhibit 30, #8 Ondrick Exhibit 33)(Related document(s) #285 , #315 ) (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 11/7/2013) Modified on 11/8/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2013 Filing 326 Declaration of Jonathan R. Wood in Support of #284 Fairchild's Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gu-Yeon Wei and Dr. Jonathan Wood, #315 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Related document(s) #284 , #315 ) (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 11/7/2013) Modified on 11/8/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2013 Filing 325 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #312 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement and related papers by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Kelley's Infringement Report, #2 Ondrick Exhibit 4, #3 Ondrick Exhibit 5, #4 Ondrick Exhibit 6, #5 Ondrick Exhibit 7, #6 Ondrick Exhibit 8, #7 Ondrick Exhibit 18, #8 Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan Putnam, #9 Armstrong Exhibit A, #10 Armstrong Exhibit B, #11 Armstrong Exhibit C, #12 Armstrong Exhibit D, #13 Armstrong Exhibit E)(Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER GRANTING POWER INTEGRATIONS' MOTION TO CHANGE TIME FOR HEARING ON DISPOSITIVE AND DAUBERT MOTIONS AND FAIRCHILD'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 6, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Docket text modified on 11/8/2013 to correct title (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #303 MOTION for De Novo Review of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Fairchild's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions and for De Novo Review of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Fairchild's Motion for Reconsideration re #269 , #248 MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Kelley's Infringement Report Containing New Infringement Positions, #252 MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED VERS.), #254 MOTION to Strike Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam, #246 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of James Malackowski (REDACTED VERS.) , #249 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #255 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. WEI AND DR. WOOD (PUBLIC VERS.). Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 Filing 323 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held. Motion Hearing is continued to 11/21/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (Not Reported) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Telephone Conference set for 11/6/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 5, 2013 Filing 322 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #321 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of James Malackowski and Exhibit 7 to supporting Declaration of Michael R. Headley by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 7 to Headley Decl ISO PI Reply ISO Mot to Excl Malackowski)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER Granting POWER INTEGRATIONS' Motion to File Under Seal re #293 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/29/13. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013) Please use this order to file document under seal.
November 5, 2013 Filing 320 MOTION to Continue Power Integrations' Motion to Change Time for Hearing on Dispositive and Daubert Motions and Fairchild's Motion for Reconsideration filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Michael R. Headley)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 4, 2013 Motions terminated: #247 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Filing 319 RESPONSE (re #303 MOTION for De Novo Review of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Fairchild's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions and for De Novo Review of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Fairchild's Motion for Reconsideration re #269 ) in Opposition filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Filing 318 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #310 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Power Integrations' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Malackowski and Exhibits 1, 4 & 6 to supporting Declaration of Michael R. Headley by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Ex 1 to Headley Decl ISO PI Mtn to Exclude re Malackowski, #2 SEALED Ex 4 to Headley Decl ISO Mtn to Exclude re Malackowski, #3 SEALED Ex 6 to Headley Decl ISO Mtn to Exclude re Malackowski)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S OCTOBER 18, 2013 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. 297, 299); DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER GRANTING FAIRCHILD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. 291). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' OCTOBER 11, 2013 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. 281); DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER GRANTING IN PART POWER INTERGRATIONS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. 275, 276, 278); DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S SEPTEMBER 27, 2013 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS (DKT. 250, 253) TO FILE UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. 247); DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #303 MOTION for De Novo Review of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Fairchild's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions and for De Novo Review of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Fairchild's Motion for Reconsideration re #269 , #248 MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Kelley's Infringement Report Containing New Infringement Positions, #252 MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED VERS.), #254 MOTION to Strike Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam, #246 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of James Malackowski (REDACTED VERS.) , #249 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #255 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. WEI AND DR. WOOD (PUBLIC VERS.), #311 Order, Terminate Motions,,., ***Deadlines terminated. #311 Order, Terminate Motions,,. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW; SETTING NOVEMBER 15, 2013 HEARING ON MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW; CONTINUING TO NOVEMBER 15, 2013 HEARING ON PARTIES' PENDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 1, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER GRANTING POWER INTEGRATIONS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DCKT. 245). Plaintiff is directed to file the referenced documents under seal. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney October 31, 2013. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER GRANTING FAIRCHILD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL FAIRCHILD'S REPLY TO POWER INTEGRATIONS' OPPOSITION TO FAIRCHILD'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF JONATHAN D. PUTNAM. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2013. (DKT. 301)(mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013) Modified on 11/1/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER GRANTING FAIRCHILD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2013. (DKT. 395)(mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013) Modified on 11/1/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER GRANTING POWER INTEGRATIONS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2013. (DKT. 293)(mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013) Modified on 11/1/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2013 Filing 306 RESPONSE (re #305 MOTION to Shorten Time AND HEARING DATE FOR FAIRCHILDS CORRECTED RENEWED MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW (DKT. 303) ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 22, 2013 Filing 305 MOTION to Shorten Time AND HEARING DATE FOR FAIRCHILDS CORRECTED RENEWED MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW (DKT. 303) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina Ondrick, #2 Proposed Order)(Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 22, 2013 Filing 304 Declaration of Jeremiah A. Armstrong in Support of #299 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations' Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment re Non-infringement, and Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Howard G. Pollack in Support of the Reply Brief, #293 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PI's Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Testimony of James Malackowski [D246], #297 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PI's Reply ISO #255 Mtn to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Wei and Dr. Wood filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #299 , #293 , #297 ) (Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 21, 2013 Filing 303 MOTION for De Novo Review of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Fairchild's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions and for De Novo Review of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Fairchild's Motion for Reconsideration re #269 Discovery Order, Terminate Motions,, #231 Discovery Order filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/4/2013. Replies due by 11/12/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 302 REPLY to Opposition to (re #254 MOTION to Strike Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam ) filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/18/2013) Modified on 10/21/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2013 Filing 301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Jonathan D. Putnam filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeremiah Armstrong, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply Brief, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply Brief)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 300 Declaration of Howard G. Pollack in Support of Power Integrations' Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment re Non-infringement filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14)(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 299 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations' Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment re Non-infringement, and Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Howard G. Pollack in Support of the Reply Brief filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Power Integrations' Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment re Non-infringement, #4 Unredacted Version of Power Integrations' Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment re Non-infringement, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Howard G. Pollack in Support of Power Integrations Reply Brief, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 298 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of PI's Reply in Support of #255 Mtn to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Wei & Dr. Wood filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 297 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PI's Reply ISO #255 Mtn to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Wei and Dr. Wood filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of PI's Reply ISO Mtn to Exclude Wei & Wood Testimony, #4 Unredacted Version of PI's Reply ISO Mtn to Exclude Wei & Wood Testimony, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service of Unredacted Version)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 296 REPLY (re #248 MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Kelley's Infringement Report Containing New Infringement Positions ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina Ondrick, #2 Exhibit 1)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 295 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Motion to Strike Kelley Infringement Report filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration by Christina Ondrick, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply Brief re Kelley, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply Brief re Kelley)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 294 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in support of PI's Reply re Mot to Exclude Testimony of James Malackowski [D249] filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 (Submitted under seal))(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 293 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PI's Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Testimony of James Malackowski [D246] filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of PI's Reply ISO Mot to Exclude Testimony of James Malackowski, #4 Unredacted version of PI's Reply ISO Mot to Exclude Testimony of James Malackowski, #5 Redacted version of Exhibit 7, #6 Unredacted version of Exhibt 7, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/18/2013) Modified on 11/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2013 Filing 292 REPLY (re #249 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Summary Judgment filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina Ondrick, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Summary Judgment)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 17, 2013 Filing 290 MOTION De Novo Review of Order Denying Fairchild's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions and De Novo Review fo Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration re #269 Discovery Order, Terminate Motions,, #231 Discovery Order filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. Responses due by 10/31/2013. Replies due by 11/7/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 289 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick in Support of #276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #275 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PI's Opp to #249 Fairchild's Mtn for Summary Judgment filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #276 , #275 , #278 ) (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 288 Supplemental Declaration of Jeremiah A. Armstrong in Support of #273 Order, the Parties' Administrative Motions to File Under Seal filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Related document(s) #273 ) (Armstrong, Jeremiah) (Filed on 10/15/2013) Modified on 10/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2013 Filing 287 Supplemental Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #273 Order, the Parties' Sept 27, 2013 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #273 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2013) Modified on 10/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2013 Filing 286 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #281 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 12, 2013 Filing 285 Declaration of Christina A. Ondrick in Support of #284 Opposition/Response to Motion, #283 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23 Part 1, #24 Exhibit 23 Part 2, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41 Part 1, #43 Exhibit 41 Part 2, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44 Part 1, #47 Exhibit 44 Part 2, #48 Exhibit 45, #49 Exhibit 46, #50 Exhibit 47, #51 Exhibit 48, #52 Exhibit 49, #53 Exhibit 50, #54 Exhibit 51, #55 Exhibit 52, #56 Exhibit 53, #57 Exhibit 54, #58 Exhibit 55, #59 Exhibit 56, #60 Exhibit 57, #61 Exhibit 58)(Related document(s) #284 , #283 ) (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 10/12/2013)
October 12, 2013 Filing 284 RESPONSE (re #255 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. WEI AND DR. WOOD (PUBLIC VERS.) ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gu-Yeon Wei, #2 Declaration of Jonathan Wood, #3 Declaration of Eddie Chueh, #4 Declaration of Wei Hsuan Huang, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/12/2013)
October 12, 2013 Filing 283 RESPONSE (re #252 MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED VERS.) ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Wood, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/12/2013)
October 12, 2013 Filing 282 RESPONSE (re #246 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of James Malackowski (REDACTED VERS.) ) filed byFairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jeremiah Armstrong, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/12/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., System General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 17, #14 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 18, #15 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 19, #16 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 21, #17 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 22, #18 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 26, #19 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 27, #20 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 30, #21 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 31, #22 Exhibit Unredacted Ondrick Exhibit 35, #23 Unredacted Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #24 Redacted Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit A to Opposition to Exclude Malackowski, #26 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit B to Opposition to Exclude Malackowski, #27 Declaration Unredacted Wood Declaration in Opposition to SJ, #28 Declaration Redacted Wood Declaration in Opposition to SJ, #29 Declaration Unredacted Wood Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #30 Declaration Redacted Wood Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #31 Declaration Unredacted Chueh Declaration, #32 Declaration Redacted Chueh Declaration, #33 Unredacted Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #34 Redacted Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #35 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit C to Opposition to Motion to Exclude Malackowski, #36 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit D to Opposition to Motion to Exclude Malackowski, #37 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit E to Motion to Exclude Malackowscki, #38 Unredacted Opposition to Motion to Exclude Malackowski, #39 Redacted Opposition to Motion to Exclude Malakowski)(Jacobs, Blair) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 280 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Power Integrations, Inc. of PI's Confidential Opp to #249 Fairchild's Mtn for Summary Judgment and Exhs. 1-2, 4-10, 15, & 17 to the Headley Decl ISO Same (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 279 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of PI's Opp to #249 Fairchild's MSJ and Proposed Order Denying #249 Fairchild's MSJ filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4-10 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 15 (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit 17 (Filed Under Seal), #11 Proposed Order Denying Fairchild's MSJ)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PI's Opp to #249 Fairchild's Mtn for Summary Judgment filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of PI's Opp to Fairchild's Mtn for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of PI's Opp to Fairchild's Mtn for Summary Judgment, #5 Unredacted Versions of Exs. 1-2 & 4-6 to the Headley Decl ISO PI's Opp, #6 Unredacted Versions of Exs. 7-10, 15, & 17 to the Headley Decl ISO PI's Opp)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 277 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations Opposition to Motion to Strike filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6 Filed Under Seal (Dkt 276), #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11 Filed Under Seal (Dkt 276), #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14 Filed Under Seal (Dkt 276), #10 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #276 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted Opposition to Motion to Strike, #4 Exhibit B - Sealed Opposition to Motion to Strike, #5 Exhibit C, Part 1 - Sealed Exs 1-6, #6 Exhibit C, Part 2 - Sealed Exs 11 & 14, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 275 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order to Administrative Motion to Seal, #3 Unredacted Version of Confidential PI Opp to FCS Mot to Exclude Putnam, #4 Redacted Version of PI Opp to FCS Mot to Exclude Putnam, #5 Declaration of Michael R. Headley ISO Opp to Mot to Exclude Putnam, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #12 Redacted Version of Exhibit 5, #13 Prop Order to PI Opp to Mot to Exclude Putnam, #14 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 274 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Bifurcate the Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(B) (Ondrick, Christina) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 8, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #252 MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED VERS.), #246 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of James Malackowski (REDACTED VERS.) , #255 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. WEI AND DR. WOOD (PUBLIC VERS.). Motion(s) Hearing re-set to 11/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER RE: PARTIES' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. The parties are directed to file supplemental declarations no later than October 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 8, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)