Rockey v. Sallie Mae Inc.
Plaintiff: Adam Rockey
Defendant: Sallie Mae Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv05282
Filed: November 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejduice upon settlement. Within 90 days from the date hereof, that settlement has not in fact occurred, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011) Modified on 2/9/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER extending time to conduct settlement conference deadline (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER extending deadlines (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER continuing cmc to 7/23/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting extension of mediation (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 5/6/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting request to appear by phone (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockey v. Sallie Mae Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Rockey
Represented By: Nicole Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie Mae Inc.
Represented By: Miriam Hiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?