Zynga Game Network, Inc. v. Does 1-5 Featured Case
Plaintiff: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Case Number: 3:2009cv05298
Filed: November 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2010 Filing 28 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re 27 Consent Judgment entered In favor of Zynga Game Network, Inc. Against Gregory Szimonisz, In favor of Zynga Game Network, Inc. Against Jaret Szimonisz Notice of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Varas, Christopher) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
July 20, 2010 Filing 27 STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/20/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 19, 2010 Filing 26 STIPULATION REGARDING ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT UPON CONSENT by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Final Judgment Upon Consent-Stipulation-EXHIBIT 1)(Varas, Christopher) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Case Management Conference continued to 8/2/2010 04:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/24/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
November 6, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /no process against John Does 1-5 ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611006291.). Filed byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zynga Game Network, Inc. v. Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis LeRoy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?