Mitchell et al v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Law Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The and Herbert Mitchell
Defendant: Marcella A. Bell, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Thomas G. Dunn, Robert L. Keisler, Office of the Independent Administrator and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv05306
Filed: November 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2011 Filing 66 STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler, Law Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Anderson, David) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 65 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/11/2011 01:30 PM. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 64 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING ORDER TO SHOW CASE HEARING. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/4/2011 01:30 PM. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STANDBY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/28/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/11/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 10, 2011 Filing 62 NOTICE by Law Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell OF PENDING SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND ALL REMAINING DEFENDANTS (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 61 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 60 AMENDED COMPLAINT [SECOND] against Marcella A. Bell, Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler, Office of the Independent Administrator. Filed byLaw Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING RESPONSE BY PLAINTIFFS TO AVOID DISMISSAL OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/4/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE: #55 , #46 GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/22/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
November 29, 2010 Filing 57 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 56 Proposed Order and Joint Case Management Statement by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Rosenberg-Wohl, David) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 *** FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD*** ORDER RE" #46 GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/22/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 12/22/2010 (rslc3, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2010 Filing 54 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2010 before Judge Richard Seeborg; Matter Submitted. (Date Filed: 10/21/2010) re #46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Robert L. Keisler, Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/21/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 53 Reply to Opposition re #46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Memo of Points and Authorities filed byThomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler. (Rosenberg-Wohl, David) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 52 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 51 Memorandum in Opposition to #46 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Law Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 9/30/2010) Modified on 10/1/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2010 Filing 50 OBJECTIONS to REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Law Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/1/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 1, 2010 Filing 48 STIPULATION TO MODIFY HEARING DATES AND DEADLINES by Law Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
September 1, 2010 Filing 47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS OIA AND MARCELLA BELL by Law Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg-Wohl, David) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 45 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (CORRECTED) against Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler. Filed byLaw Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler. Filed byLaw Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE: #34 , #23 GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS with leave to amend. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 05/12/2010. #36 , #8 terminated. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings:, Set/Reset Deadlines: Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 6, 2010 Filing 42 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/6/2010 before Judge Seeborg; Matter Submitted. (Date Filed: 5/6/2010) re #34 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., #36 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Marcella A. Bell, Office of the Independent Administrator.(Court Reporter Joan Columbini.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2010)
May 6, 2010 Filing 41 NOTICE by Law Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS OIA AND MARCELLA BELL (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
April 22, 2010 Filing 40 Reply to Opposition to Defendants' #34 Motion To Dismiss filed by Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler. (Rosenberg-Wohl, David) (Filed on 4/22/2010) Modified on 4/23/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2010 Filing 39 Reply to Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byMarcella A. Bell, Office of the Independent Administrator. (Hoard, Eliza) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 15, 2010 Filing 38 Memorandum in Opposition TO ALL DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS [ENTRIES 17, 18, 28, 29, & 30] filed byLaw Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 2, 2010 Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler. (Rosenberg-Wohl, David) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Marcella A. Bell, Office of the Independent Administrator. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Office of the Independent Administrator and Marcella A. Bell's Motion to Dismiss)(Hoard, Eliza) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 35 Renotice motion hearing in Support of Motion To Dismiss filed byThomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg-Wohl, David) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg-Wohl, David) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/18/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Marcella A. Bell, Office of the Independent Administrator. (Catlos, Katherine) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 31 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion To Dismiss filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Rosenberg-Wohl, David) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 30 Memorandum in Opposition TO #23 MOTION TO DISMISS filed byLaw Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 3/5/2010) Modified on 3/8/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2010 Filing 29 OBJECTIONS to #24 DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Law Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 3/5/2010) Modified on 3/8/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2010 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition DECLARATION OF BRUCE E. KRELL IN OPPOSITION TO #23 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed byLaw Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hylandbill)(Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 3/5/2010) Modified on 3/8/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER setting CMC and ADR deadlines re #26 Stipulation filed by Robert L. Keisler, Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/16/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 16, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2010. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/5/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2010 10:00 AM. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 26 STIPULATION to Modification of Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines by Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler. (Dong, Kathy) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 25 Proposed Order re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler. (Dong, Kathy) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 4, 2010 Filing 24 Request for Judicial Notice re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byThomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Palley, Mark) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
February 4, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Palley, Mark) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
February 2, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Elizabeth Williams, Esq Defendants Office of the Independent Administrator and Marcella A. Bell's (Williams, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 1, 2010 Filing 21 ASSOCIATION of Counsel and CHANGE IN COUNSEL by Law Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing reset for 2/19/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 22, 2010 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support of #8 Motion to Dismiss filed byMarcella A. Bell, Office of the Independent Administrator. (Hoard, Eliza) (Filed on 1/22/2010) Modified on 1/25/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2010 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Russell A. Robinson in Opposition to #8 Motion to Dismiss. DECLARATION RE: FILING OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS filed byLaw Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-Mail Just After Midnight (01/15/2010) to Opposing Counsel re: Court's power outage)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 1/19/2010) Modified on 1/20/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2010 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition to #8 Motion to Dismiss by the OIA and Marcella Bell filed byLaw Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 1/18/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2010 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. re #15 Stipulation (Palley, Mark) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 13, 2010 Filing 15 STIPULATION extending time for responsive pleading by defendants Gibson & Sharps, Dunn and Keisler by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Palley, Mark) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 8, 2010 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT re #12 Notice of Appearance (Certificate of Service) by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Palley, Mark) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for extension of time to respond to complaint by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #6 Ex Parte Application (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Aaron Palley as additional counsel for defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Palley, Mark) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 4, 2010 Filing 11 Proposed Order re #6 Ex Parte Application by Law Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 1/4/2010) Modified on 1/5/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2010 Filing 10 Memorandum in Opposition to #6 Kaiser's Ex Parte Application filed by Law Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Robinson, Russell) (Filed on 1/4/2010) Modified on 1/5/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2009 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marcella A. Bell, Office of the Independent Administrator (Hoard, Eliza) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 28, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Marcella A. Bell, Office of the Independent Administrator. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Office of the Independent Administrator and Marcella A. Bell's Motion to Dismiss)(Hoard, Eliza) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. re #5 Declaration in Support, #4 Ex Parte Application For Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint, #6 Ex Parte Application For Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint (Proposed Order. (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 12/28/2009) Modified on 12/29/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2009 Filing 6 Ex Parte Application For Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint (Proposed Order) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Ex Parte Application)(Lee, Brian) (Filed on 12/28/2009) Modified on 12/29/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2009 Filing 5 Declaration of Kennedy P. Richardson in Support of #4 Ex Parte Application For Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 Filing 4 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #6 *** Ex Parte Application For Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 12/28/2009) Modified on 12/29/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marcella A. Bell, Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler, Office of the Independent Administrator. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
November 9, 2009 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2010. Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2010 08:30 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 9, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marcella A. Bell, Thomas G. Dunn, Gibson & Sharps, PSC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Robert L. Keisler, Office of the Independent Administrator ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611038759.) SUMMONS ISSUED. Filed byLaw Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The, Herbert Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 9, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mcl, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell et al v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcella A. Bell
Represented By: Linda Louise Daube,
Represented By: Eliza Hoard
Represented By: Katherine S. Catlos
Represented By: Elizabeth Williams, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson & Sharps, PSC
Represented By: David Bruce Anderson
Represented By: David Michael Rosenberg-Wohl
Represented By: Kennedy Park Richardson
Represented By: Kathy H Dong
Represented By: Mark Aaron Palley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas G. Dunn
Represented By: David Bruce Anderson
Represented By: David Michael Rosenberg-Wohl
Represented By: Kennedy Park Richardson
Represented By: Kathy H Dong
Represented By: Mark Aaron Palley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Keisler
Represented By: David Bruce Anderson
Represented By: David Michael Rosenberg-Wohl
Represented By: Kennedy Park Richardson
Represented By: Kathy H Dong
Represented By: Mark Aaron Palley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Independent Administrator
Represented By: Linda Louise Daube,
Represented By: Eliza Hoard
Represented By: Katherine S. Catlos
Represented By: Elizabeth Williams, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: David Bruce Anderson
Represented By: David Michael Rosenberg-Wohl
Represented By: Kennedy Park Richardson
Represented By: Kathy H Dong
Represented By: Mark Aaron Palley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Offices of Bruce E. Krell, Inc., The
Represented By: Russell Alan Robinson
Represented By: Loan Tran Shillinger
Represented By: Steven Francis Gruel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Mitchell
Represented By: Russell Alan Robinson
Represented By: Loan Tran Shillinger
Represented By: Steven Francis Gruel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?