Kagan et al v. Wachovia Securities, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Frances Levy, Elaine Soffa, BRENT BALKEMA, Theodore Kagan, James Aven, Joseph Soffa and Alberkrack Family Limited Partnership
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network., L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities, L.L.C., Wells Fargo & Company, Wachovia Securities, LLC, Wachovia Securities Financial Network, L.L.C., Wachovia Capital Markets, L.L.C. and Wells Fargo Advisors., L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2009cv05337
Filed: November 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/25/13. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti in case 3:11-cv-00412-SC; denying without prejudice (96) Motion for Settlement in case 3:09-cv-05337-SC.Associated Cases: 3:09-cv-05337-SC, 3:11-cv-00412-SC(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti in case 3:11-cv-00412-SC; denying without prejudice (87) Motion for Settlement in case 3:09-cv-05337-SC.Associated Cases: 3:09-cv-05337-SC, 3:11-cv-00412-SC(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order to Extend Deadline to Submit Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/17/2012. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline to submit settlement agreement for the Court's approval to 1/13/12. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/8/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extend Deadline to Submit Class Action Settlement to 12/6/11. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/14/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kagan et al v. Wachovia Securities, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Levy
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Represented By: Richard L. Kellner
Represented By: Karen Liao
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Soffa
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Represented By: Richard L. Kellner
Represented By: Karen Liao
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENT BALKEMA
Represented By: Thomas K. Caldwell
Represented By: Thomas A. Hargett
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Represented By: Timothy John Kirk
Represented By: Karen Liao
Represented By: Barbara Quinn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Kagan
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Represented By: Michael Vincent Storti
Represented By: Karen Liao
Represented By: Richard L. Kellner
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Aven
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Represented By: Michael Vincent Storti
Represented By: Karen Liao
Represented By: Richard L. Kellner
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Soffa
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Represented By: Richard L. Kellner
Represented By: Karen Liao
Represented By: Michael Vincent Storti
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberkrack Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Represented By: Richard L. Kellner
Represented By: Karen Liao
Represented By: Michael Vincent Storti
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network., L.L.C.
Represented By: Sarah Louise Bishop
Represented By: Michael D. Blanchard
Represented By: Donald S. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, L.L.C.
Represented By: Sarah Louise Bishop
Represented By: Michael D. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Sarah Louise Bishop
Represented By: Michael D. Blanchard
Represented By: Donald S. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Securities, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Louise Bishop
Represented By: Michael D. Blanchard
Represented By: Donald S. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Securities Financial Network, L.L.C.
Represented By: Sarah Louise Bishop
Represented By: Michael D. Blanchard
Represented By: Donald S. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Capital Markets, L.L.C.
Represented By: Sarah Louise Bishop
Represented By: Michael D. Blanchard
Represented By: Donald S. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors., L.L.C.
Represented By: Sarah Louise Bishop
Represented By: Michael D. Blanchard
Represented By: Donald S. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?