Modavox, Inc. v. Yahoo! Inc.
Plaintiff: Modavox, Inc.
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv05386
Filed: November 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER GRANTING re 384 Stipulation to Stay Taxable Costs Pending Final Determination on Appeal filed by Augme Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/1/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 378 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING YAHOO!'S SECOND BILL OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/2/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER GRANTING re 367 Stipulation Regarding Yahoo! Inc's Bill of Costs filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/19/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 340 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER SEALING PORTIONS OF THE COURT'S AUGUST 8, 2012 SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/21/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL COURTS AUGUST 8, 2012 ORDER GRANTING YAHOO!S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT; DENYING AUGMES MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/8/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER Permitting Withdrawal of Counsel. Attorney Rebecca L Unruh terminated. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 07/03/2012. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 287 STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/6/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 285 STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR FACT DISCOVERY RE: PRIOR ART ADDED IN YAHOO!'S SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST AMENDED INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/29/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/10/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 267 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING YAHOO! FINANCIAL PRODUCTION. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/24/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 240 Motion to Amend/Correct; Augme is required to E-FILE the amended document; granting 245 Motion to Amend/Correct; Yahoo! is required to E-FILE the amended document (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 257 STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR FACT DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/3/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 243 STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR FACT DISCOVERY File Dispositive Motions by 6/8/2012. Replies due by 6/29/2012. Opposition due by 6/22/2012. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/14/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER DENYING re 231 Letter (REDACTED), filed by Augme Technologies, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/1/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 3, 2012. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 210 DISCOVERY ORDER re 205 Joint Letter Over Production of Yahoo! Source Code for the Accused Products, filed by Augme Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/16/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Final Claim Construction Order. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on September 13, 2011. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER To File Under Seal Court's September 13, 2011 Order. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on September 13, 2011. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING AND DISCOVERY DATES RE: YAHOO! PATENTS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/29/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE DATE FOR FILING THE JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION PREHEARING STATEMENT RE: YAHOO! PATENTS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/30/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE DATE FOR PATENT L.R. 4-2 EXCHANGE OF PRELIMINARY CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONS AND EVIDENCE RE: YAHOO! PATENTS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/26/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING 148 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Augme Technologies, Inc. RE: Withdrawal of Ayhan E. Mertogul as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff Augme. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/28/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re 141 . Augme Technologies, Inc., Attorney Robert Craig Matz no longer counsel of record for Plaintiff Augme Techologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/22/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER DENYING 138 Letter re: anticipated motion practice filed by Yahoo! Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/20/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER TO SERVE Augme Technologies, Inc,'s Amended Infringement Contentions and to Serve Yahoo!'s Amended Invalidity Contentions re 129 . Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/13/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR THE PARTIES' JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION, PRE-HEARING STATEMENT, AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DISCOVERY. Claim construction discovery to be completed by 3/28/11. File joint claim construction statement by 3/18/11. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 02/28/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COUNTERCLAIM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/28/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR OPPOSITION AND REPLY re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Yahoo! Inc. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment.Opposition due by 12/1/2010. Replies due by 12/10/2010. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/30/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR EXCHANGING PRELIMINARY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE AND FILING JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PRE-HEARING STATEMENT.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/26/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR THE PARTIES' EXCHANGE OF PRELIM. CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/18/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco, before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Updated case management conference statement due by 4/30/10. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 04/22/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER to have Case Caption Changed re 37 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Modavox, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/29/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the motion hearing to 4/16/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 03/19/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER extending time to respond to first amended complaint re 27 Stipulation filed by Yahoo! Inc., Modavox, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/19/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER continuing CMC re 25 Stipulation filed by Yahoo! Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2010 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/16/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modavox, Inc. v. Yahoo! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modavox, Inc.
Represented By: David Ripley Shaub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?