Silver Creek Valley - CF et al v. TGI Friday's Inc et al
Plaintiff: Silver Creek Valley - CF and North First Street Properties
Defendant: TGI Friday's Inc and CNL California Restaurants Ltd
Case Number: 3:2009cv05500
Filed: November 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 44 Stipulation Continuing Mediation Completion Deadline. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/6/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER APPROVING 41 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/3/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 39 Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice as to Defendant TIGF Only. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/27/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/6/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/29/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 25 Stipulation to Continue Date Of Case Management. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/24/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 21 Stipulation selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/17/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF REFERENCE re 13 MOTION Right to Attach Order and Issuance of Writ of Attachment filed by Silver Creek Valley - CF, North First Street Properties. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/21/2010. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of Referral. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 11, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silver Creek Valley - CF et al v. TGI Friday's Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Creek Valley - CF
Represented By: William McGrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North First Street Properties
Represented By: William McGrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TGI Friday's Inc
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNL California Restaurants Ltd
Represented By: Glenn Philip Zwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?