Jones v. Law Offices of Brachfeld & Associates, PC
Plaintiff: Floyd Jones
Defendant: Law Offices of Brachfeld & Associates, PC
Case Number: 3:2009cv05514
Filed: November 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/27/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010) Modified on 4/27/2010 (cl, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE NOTICES OF SETTLEMENT [re 21 Notice (Other) filed by Floyd Jones]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/15/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 19 Notice (Other) filed by Law Offices of Brachfeld & Associates, PC]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/1/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE [re 16 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Floyd Jones]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/2/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Law Offices of Brachfeld & Associates, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Jones
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Brachfeld & Associates, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?