Boddie et al v. Axiant, LLC
Plaintiff: Kenya Boddie and Ramonda Carlos
Defendant: Axiant, LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv05553
Filed: November 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/22/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER extending time to answer to second amended complaint re 53 Stipulation filed by Accretive, LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/21/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re modification of CMC and ADR Process re 46 Stipulation filed by Accretive, LLC Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/6/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER to participate in ICMC by telephone re 30 Notice (Other) filed by Accretive, LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/26/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 28 Stipulation filed by Accretive, LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/25/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER extending time to respond to complaint re 17 Stipulation filed by Accretive, LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/22/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to extend time to file a responsive pleading re 9 Stipulation filed by Mann Bracken, LLP. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/5/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boddie et al v. Axiant, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Boddie
Represented By: Laura Herron Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramonda Carlos
Represented By: Laura Herron Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axiant, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?