Richtek Technology Corporation et al v. uPI Semiconductor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Richtek Technology Corporation and Richtek USA, Inc.
Defendant: uPI Semiconductor Corporation, Advanced Micro Devices Inc., Sapphire Technology Limited, Diamond Multimedia inc. and XFX Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv05659
Filed: December 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 584 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 583 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 12/19/2016 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 12/19/2016 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 538 Discovery Order. The court previously devised a process for the use of third parties' CBI produced in the ITC case and set deadlines to file any objections to the parties' review of it as part of their trial preparation. That process req uired notice to the third parties and the ITC and an opportunity to object by October 11 at 3 p.m. No one objected. The court thus vacates the October 13 hearing and orders the following process. For any producing party that has not consented in writ ing to the use of its CBI, the parties may review the CBI as part of their trial preparation. If the parties want to use the CBI at trial, they must notify the producing party, which may raise any objections with the parties and then with the court. The attached order provides more detail. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER RE STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE by Hon. William Alsup granting 532 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 522 CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/15/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 511 .(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 519 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER RE STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT POWERCHIP TECHNOLOGY CORP. WITH PREJUDICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 506 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 487 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 499 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/25/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF RICHTEK TECHNOLOGY CORP.S AND NON-PARTIES ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.S AND BEST DATA PRODUCTS D/B/A DIAMOND MULTIMEDIA, INC.S STIPULATED REQUEST TO ALLOW USE OF ITC DISCOVERY by Hon. William Alsup granting 495 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 464 Motion to amend.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 485 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/22/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) granting Defendants Maxchip's and SXC's request to appear by telephone at the Settlement Conference re 477 and 478 Letters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/14/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE -- COUNT SEVEN OF THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, Motions terminated: 469 , 456 .. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/31/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, Motions terminated: 465 Responses due by 3/30/2016. Replies due by 4/6/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/23/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY AARON S. OAKLEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 455 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY AARON STAFFORD OAKLEY by Hon. William Alsup denying 452 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Discovery due by 2/18/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/22/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
October 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/25/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2015)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW by Hon. William Alsup granting 434 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney..(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO LIFT STAY by Hon. William Alsup denying 413 Motion to Lift Stay.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND REPLY DEADLINE by Hon. William Alsup granting 423 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND HEARING DATE re 413 MOTION to Lift Stay. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/12/2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE Motions due by 4/28/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 21, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 399 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Responses due by 3/18/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 5, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 9, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 393 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Response due February 9 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 4, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 9, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 3, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 9, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 31, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 2, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 22, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting 349 Motion to Stay; denying 355 Motion for Discovery (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 367 Motion for Protective Order.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER granting requests to appear telephonically by Defendants Powerchip and Maxchip. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/07/13.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/1/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER POSTPONING HEARING ON MOTION TO STAY re 349 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1659; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by uPI Semiconductor Corporation, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 349 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1659; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 13, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup [granting 346 Stipulation].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 340 Proposed Order filed by Silicon Xtal, uPI Semiconductor Corporation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 342 Status Report filed by uPI Semiconductor Corporation]. Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/8/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR STAY WITHOUT PREJUDICE, Order by Hon. William Alsup denying 327 Motion to Stay.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER REGARDING JOINT STATEMENT ON PERSONAL JURISDICTION TRIAL re 324 Statement, filed by Powerchip Technology Corporation, Richtek Technology Corporation, Richtek USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 6, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER REGARDING APRIL 8, 2011 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER 290 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 4/28/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER REGARDING RICHTEK'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 293 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal // Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for a Sealing Order Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5 filed by Richtek Technology Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 25, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 274 NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/7/11. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING MOTION FOR STAY, DENYING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND VACATING HEARINGS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 219 Motion to Stay (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 230 Order, Order to Show Cause, Set Deadlines/Hearings]. Meet and confer from 9:30 and ending 1:30 p.m. in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 2/15/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/24/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER RE PERMISSION TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 242 Letter filed by Richtek Technology Corporation, Richtek USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 21, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MING CHEN'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 196 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MAXCHIP'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 158 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER ALLOWING JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND SUSPENDING ALL MOTION PRACTICE re 135 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) filed by Powerchip Technology Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SETTING HEARING ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 229 Letter filed by Richtek Technology Corporation, Richtek USA, Inc., ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 1/19/2011.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 12, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE REGARDING RESPONSES TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER re 215 Letter filed by Ming Chen, 211 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 7, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND DENYING AS MOOT MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE AND LACK OF STANDING by Judge Alsup granting 121 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jur isdiction; granting 122 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot 126 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 127 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 160 Motion for Joinder; finding as moot 161 Motion for Joinder; granting 162 Motion for Joinder (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER RE SCHEDULING OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Parties shall report requested information to Judge Ryu's Courtroom Deputy, Ivy Garcia, by no later than 1/12/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/21/2010. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 17, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 16, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER re 172 Letter filed by George Chou, Wade Chen, Eric Huang, Ivy Yang, Sapphire Technology Limited, Ken Wang, Stone Hong, YP Huang, Silicon Xtal, Mars Lin, JC Chen, uPI Semiconductor Corporation, Vincent Wen, James Chang, Owen Hsu, Jay Tu, Doreen Liu, 173 Letter filed by Richtek USA, Inc., Richtek Technology Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 15, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE OPPOSITION UNDER SEAL re 168 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Certain Taiwanese Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Richtek Technology Corporation, Richtek USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 13, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 2, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ALLOWING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR UPI SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 14, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND TRANSFER ITC RECORD by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Lift Stay and Transfer ITC Record (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO LIFT STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 27, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO AMD, DIAMOND, AND XFX. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 5, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 2, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 20, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING OUTCOME OF ITC INVESTIGATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 19, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPOINTING INTERNATIONAL PROCESS SERVER. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 18, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/17/09. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/11/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richtek Technology Corporation et al v. uPI Semiconductor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richtek Technology Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Charles Trock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richtek USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Charles Trock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: uPI Semiconductor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Micro Devices Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sapphire Technology Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Multimedia inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XFX Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?