July 24, 2013 |
Filing
220
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 219 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Charles Grimmett, Sal Lucido, Rick Delagarza, Brian Cashwell, April Moore, Paul Gutierrez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/24/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
|
April 30, 2013 |
Filing
218
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 217 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Charles Grimmett, Sal Lucido, Rick Delagarza, Brian Cashwell, April Moore, Paul Gutierrez Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
|
March 22, 2013 |
Filing
216
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 214 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANTONIO GARCIA WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
|
March 6, 2013 |
Filing
212
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 211 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Charles Grimmett, Sal Lucido, Rick Delagarza, Brian Cashwell, April Moore, Paul Gutierrez, Antonio Garcia Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/6/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
|
February 4, 2013 |
Filing
209
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 208 to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Charles Grimmett, Sal Lucido, Rick Delagarza, Brian Cashwell, April Moore, Paul Gutierrez, Antonio Garcia Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/4/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
|
August 16, 2012 |
Filing
205
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 204 to Continue Case Management Conference; Notice of Settlement filed by Charles Grimmett, Sal Lucido, Rick Delagarza, Brian Cashwell, April Moore, Paul Gutierrez, Antonio Garcia Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/16/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
|
July 9, 2012 |
Filing
203
STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2012. Further Case Management Conference reset for 8/21/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/9/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
|
May 30, 2012 |
Filing
200
STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 199 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/30/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
|
January 11, 2012 |
Filing
190
STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 189 Stipulation, filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/11/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
|
September 8, 2011 |
Filing
186
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 109 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
|
May 12, 2011 |
Filing
131
ORDER RE DEPOSITIONS on 127 MOTION to Take Deposition (s) Exceeding FRCP 30(a)(2)(A)(i)'s Limit filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/11/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
|
April 28, 2011 |
Filing
128
ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS re 126 Notice filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/28/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
|
April 20, 2011 |
Filing
125
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 89 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File 4th Amended Complaint (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
|
March 28, 2011 |
Filing
103
STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying class certification motion briefing schedules; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/28/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
|
January 27, 2011 |
Filing
88
STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC AND AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULES: Further Case Management Conference CONTINUED TO 2/28/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/27/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
|
October 28, 2010 |
Filing
78
STIPULATION AND ORDER granting leave to file amended complaint and resetting briefing re class certification; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/26/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
|
September 3, 2010 |
Filing
76
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 09/03/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing
71
ORDER FINDING that C 09-5876 CW is NOT RELATED to this action re 66 Order; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/2/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing
66
SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge ClaudiaWilken on 7/27/2010. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing
58
STIPULATION AND ORDER: Hearing re 43 MOTION to Transfer Case continued to 8/2/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Case Management Conference reset for 8/2/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/21/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
|
May 5, 2010 |
Filing
40
STIPULATION AND ORDER for filing of second amended complaint and withdrawing of motion(s) to dismiss; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/4/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
|