Castillo-Ramirez v. County of Sonoma
Plaintiff: Naomi Castillo-Ramirez
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Case Number: 3:2009cv05938
Filed: December 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/28/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AMENDED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FIND COUNSEL AND HAVE THAT COUNSEL ENTER AN APPEARANCE BY 1/26/11. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/5/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 75 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Stay. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 61 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 53 54 Ramirez's Ex Parte Application for Appointment of Next Friend or Guardian Ad Litem. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re 44 Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief to Temporarily Stay Action. Show Cause Response due by 6/9/2010. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/26/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 28 Ramirez's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo-Ramirez v. County of Sonoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Castillo-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?