E-Pass Technologies, Inc. v. Moses & Singer, LLP et al
Plaintiff: E-Pass Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Moses & Singer, LLP and Stephen N. Weiss
Case Number: 3:2009cv05967
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 233 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 232 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS MOSES & SINGER, LLP AND STEPHEN N. WEISS, ESQ. filed by E-Pass Technologies, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/19/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 220 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 214 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Expert Discovery Cut-Off and Defendants' Option to Supplement Their Reply filed by E-Pass Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 5, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 191 AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A JOINT CMC STATEMENT AND PARTIES UPDATED OFFERS OF PROOF filed by E-Pass Technologies, Inc. Status Report due by 9/25/2012.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER RE: JOINT SCHEDULING LETTER (Dkt. No. 188). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/12/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER (Dkt. Nos. 184, 186). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/5/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER (Dkt. No. 184). Signed by Magsitrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/29/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER (Dkt. No. 182). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/28/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Expert Reports and Discovery. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 08/24/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Re Parties' Second Offers of Proof as to Phase One of Trial. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER RE: SUBPOENA DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Dkt. No. 177). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/30/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL (Dkt. No. 167) signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Re Parties' Offers of Proof. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/18/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD. Modified on 6/11/2012 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 142 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (JOINT - for Further Extending Time to File Amended Complaint and Briefing Schedule on Motions) filed by Moses & Singer, LLP Motions due by 2/28/2012. Status Report due by 3/30/2012. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Status Conference reset for 4/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/16/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR VISA re 135 Proposed Order filed by VISA U.S.A. Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/29/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL re 133 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Stephen N. Weiss, Moses & Singer, LLP. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/5/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 116 Defendants' Motion to Strike and Denying 117 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL 88 AND JULY 8, 2011 LETTER BRIEF by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 3/30/11 TO 6/22/11 AT 1:30 P.M. re 86 Joint Case Management Statement filed by E-Pass Technologies, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ADOPTING TERMS OF PROTECTIVE ORDERS re 61 Stipulation and Order, 69 Order,. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/15/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re Order to Show Cause Hearing. The Court shall not require the responding defendants to appear at the hearing on December 22, 2010, but the hearing shall still proceed on December 22 in order to give Microsoft Corporation one final opportunity to show cause. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/8/2010. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 60 Stipulation, filed by Stephen N. Weiss, Moses & Singer, LLP. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/18/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 19 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E-Pass Technologies, Inc. v. Moses & Singer, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E-Pass Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses & Singer, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen N. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?