Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California et al v. McFarlane & Sons, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, -, Holiday Savings Plan and Bruce Word
Defendant: McFarlane & Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv06021
Filed: December 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER OF EXAMINATION: Re 88 Proposed Order, filed by Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan, Bruce Word Judgment Debtor Exam set for 6/24/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/3/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER OF EXAMINATION: Re 84 Proposed Order, filed by Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan, Bruce Word. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 5/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/16/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER OF EXAMINATION. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 5/9/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/28/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER OF EXAMINATION: Judgment Debtor Exam set for 4/25/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/26/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 WRIT of Execution issued as to McFarlane & Sons, Inc. in the amount of $26,156.00 (mclS, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER OF EXAMINATION: Re 72 Proposed Order, filed by Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan, Bruce Word Judgment Debtor Exam set for 3/21/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/21/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER OF EXAMINATION: Re 69 Proposed Order, filed by Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan, Bruce Word. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 2/21/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/11/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER OF EXAMINATION: Re 65 Proposed Order, filed by Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan, Bruce Word. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 2/11/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/22/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER OF EXAMINATION: Re 63 Proposed Order, filed by Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan, Bruce Word. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 10/17/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/21/2013. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF EXAMINATION: Judgment Debtor Exam set for 2/27/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/18/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER OF EXAMINATION: Judgment Debtor Exam set for 12/19/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/5/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 WRIT of of Execution issued against McFarlane & Sons, Inc. in the amount of $67,756.13 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER OF EXAMINATION: Judgment Debtor Exam reset to 11/30/2011 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/29/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF EXAMINATION re 38 Proposed Order, filed by Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan, Bruce Word. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Larson on 4/6/2011. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER OF EXAMINATION re 36 Proposed Order, filed by Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan, Bruce Word. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/18/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California et al v. McFarlane & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, -
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holiday Savings Plan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Word
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McFarlane & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?