Bookhamer et al v. Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthony Bookhamer, Lena J. Tryon, Charles Thomas Martin, Jr. and Carl DiSilvestro
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv06027
Filed: December 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER (90 day conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 317 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 316 to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Charles Thomas Martin, Jr., Anthony Bookhamer, Carl DiSilvestro, Lena J. Tryon. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/8/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER re 310 Witness List, filed by Charles Thomas Martin, Jr., Anthony Bookhamer, Carl DiSilvestro, Lena J. Tryon. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/29/13. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' DESIGNATION OF PHOTOGRAPHS re 304 Exhibit List filed by Charles Thomas Martin, Jr., Anthony Bookhamer, Carl DiSilvestro, Lena J. Tryon. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/28/13. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 270 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 269 re 241 Opposition/Response to Motion, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Charles Thomas Martin, Jr., Anthony Bookhamer, Carl DiSilvestro, Lena J. Tryon. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/17/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 01/16/2013. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 163 Defendant's Motion to Bifurcate. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 129 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING re 156 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Settlement Conference from December 21, 2012 to January 4, 2013 filed by Sunbeam Products, Inc. Settlement Conference set for 1/4/2013 11:00 AM.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/13/12. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 114 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON 11/30/12 FROM 1:30 P.M. TO 10:00 A.M. re 135 to Advance Time of November 30, 2012 Hearings on Defendant Sunbeam Product Inc.'s Motions for Summary Judgment and Status Conference. Status Report d ue by 11/23/2012. Status Conference set for 11/30/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Re 132 Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/19/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/8/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 91 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 94 Ex Parte Application.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 74 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER -- CORRECTED ORDER Re 94 98 Defendant Sunbeam Products, Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Extraordinary Relief. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/17/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 92 REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE RYU. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re 85 Letter filed by Charles Thomas Martin, Jr., Anthony Bookhamer, Carl DiSilvestro, Lena J. Tryon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/9/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS TO COMPLETE THE DEPOSITION OF RICHARD PRINS AND CONTINUING THE DEADLINE FOR THE REPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT re 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Mary DiSilvestro, Charles Thomas Martin, Jr., Anthony Bookhamer, Carl DiSilvestro, Lena J. Tryon. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on October 5, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 76 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re 74 Joint Discovery Letter Briefregarding Sunbeam's Motion for Further Deposition of Mary DiSilvestro filed by Sunbeam Products, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/27/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re 76 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Sunbeam's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplemental Disclosures; Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Extend Discovery Cut-Off filed by Sunbeam Products, Inc., 73 Letter, fi led by Mary DiSilvestro, Charles Thomas Martin, Jr., Anthony Bookhamer, Carl DiSilvestro, Lena J. Tryon, 74 Joint Discovery Letter Briefregarding Sunbeam's Motion for Further Deposition of Mary DiSilvestro filed by Sunbeam Products, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/14/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re 73 Letter, filed by Mary DiSilvestro, Charles Thomas Martin, Jr., Anthony Bookhamer, Carl DiSilvestro, Lena J. Tryon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/7/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/23/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Discovery Hearing set for 1/19/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/9/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER SETTING CMC re 55 Notice (Other), filed by Mary DiSilvestro, Charles Thomas Martin, Jr., Anthony Bookhamer, Carl DiSilvestro, Lena J. Tryon Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/28/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 50 Letter filed by Mary DiSilvestro, Charles Thomas Martin, Jr., Anthony Bookhamer, Carl DiSilvestro, Lena J. Tryon. Discovery Hearing set for 1/12/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/9/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re 50 Letter filed by Mary DiSilvestro, Charles Thomas Martin, Jr., Anthony Bookhamer, Carl DiSilvestro, Lena J. Tryon, 51 Letter filed by Mary DiSilvestro, Charles Thomas Martin, Jr., Anthony Bookhamer, Carl DiSilvestro, Lena J. Tryon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/06/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Further Case Management Conference continued to 5/2/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/14/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER; Completion of Mediation extended to 2/28/2011; Further Case Management Conference continued to 3/21/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/12/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER allowing plaintiff to file 3rd amended complaint not later than 9/24/2010; Answer to be filed not later than 30 days thereafter; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/8/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss; 2nd amended complaint to be filed within 30 days; Answer to be filed within 30 days thereafter (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER appointing Lena J Tryon as representative of estate of Victoria Disilvestro; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/22/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bookhamer et al v. Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bookhamer
Represented By: Jennifer L. Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena J. Tryon
Represented By: Jennifer L. Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Thomas Martin, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl DiSilvestro
Represented By: Jennifer L. Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?