February 12, 2016 |
Filing
296
ORDER. Upon the parties' joint stipulation, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 12, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
|
October 30, 2015 |
Filing
294
ORDER STRIKING REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. As plaintiff is represented by counsel, he may not file documents pro se. Accordingly, the "Request for Judicial Notice in Support of the ("SAC")" is stricken. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
|
September 3, 2015 |
Filing
291
ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION. The correctional institution that has custody of Plaintiff shall arrange a telephone call between Plaintiff and his attorney, to occur no later than September 8, 2015. The correctional institution shall also arrange for Plaintiff to be available by telephone for the mediation session on September 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 3, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
|
June 25, 2015 |
Filing
284
ORDER Re Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 6/25/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
|
June 12, 2015 |
Filing
283
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE The Court, having reviewed the papers filed in support of the motion and having fully considered the matter, denies the motion, for the reason that CDCR has failed to show the subject order is clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 12, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
|
May 21, 2015 |
Filing
278
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE CDCR's motion is denied, without prejudice to CDCR's submitting to Magistrate Judge Laporte a motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration, or any other appropriate filing seeking reconsideration of the subject order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 21, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
|
May 6, 2015 |
Filing
276
ORDER Following In Camera Review by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
|
March 30, 2015 |
Filing
272
ORDER directing the parties to file a joint letter regarding the remaining disputes identified in paragraph 3 of the March 27, 2015 stipulation 271 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The joint letter shall be no longer than eight pages and shall be filed no later than April 8, 2015.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
|
March 18, 2015 |
Filing
270
STIPULATION AND ORDER Enlarging Time to File Stipulation/Proposed Order Resolving Plaintiff's Pending Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena to California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 269 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
|
January 15, 2015 |
Filing
258
ORDER granting 253 Plaintiff's motion for court order allowing Plaintiff to participate in deposition by phone signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Kern Valley State Prison shall allow Plaintiff to attend the deposition of Rafael Anderson via telephone on 1/21/15, beginning at 10:00 am Pacific Time. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
|
December 15, 2014 |
Filing
249
ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT R. LIPPS Peter J. Hirsig is substituted for Michael Quinn as counsel for R. Lipps in this action. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 15, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
|
November 18, 2014 |
Filing
246
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT J. RODRIGUEZ Peter J. Hirsig is substituted as counsel in place of Michael Quinn for defendant J. Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
|
November 14, 2014 |
Filing
241
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS W. RASLEY, D. BITTNER, J. CELAYA, A. BUTT, M. KIRCHER, J. SENSEL, M. ATCHLEY, J. MORA, O. PONCE, AND J. DELANEY Defendants J. Rodriguez and R. Lipps have not signe d the Request for Approval. Peter J. Hirsig will serve as counsel of record for defendants W. Rasley, D. Bittner, J. Celaya, A. Butt, M. Kircher, J. Sensel, M. Atchley, J. Mora, O. Ponce and J. Delaney. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 14, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
|
October 30, 2014 |
Filing
233
ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY Susan E. Coleman is substituted for Michael James Quinn as counsel for defendant J.J. Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
|
October 28, 2014 |
Filing
231
ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY The substitution of Susan E. Coleman for Michael James Quinn is approved. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 28, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
|
October 7, 2014 |
Filing
223
ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCTOBER 17, 2014, DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES The settlement conference currently set for October 17, 2014 is continued, and the parties are directed to contact Judge Vadas to request a specific date for the further settlement conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
|
September 17, 2014 |
Filing
219
ORDER MODIFYING STAY The stay is modified to allow plaintiff to file a Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 17, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
|
August 7, 2014 |
Filing
217
NOTICE OF STIPULATION AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
|
March 21, 2014 |
Filing
212
Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case did not settle. Telephonic status conference is set for July 22, 2014 at 1:00 pm to schedule a further settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/21/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
|
November 13, 2013 |
Filing
206
Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Further Settlement Conference set for January 24, 2014 at 1:00 pm. Appearance instructions included in Report. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/13/13. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
|
September 5, 2013 |
Filing
203
ORDER resetting Settlement Conference for 11/8/2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 14, 18th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 09/05/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
|
September 4, 2013 |
Filing
202
ORDER re Settlement Conference. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
|
July 25, 2013 |
Filing
198
ORDER Vacating Writ. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
|
July 24, 2013 |
Filing
196
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS. The date by which settlement proceedings shall take place is extended to October 31, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 24, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
|
July 8, 2013 |
Filing
192
WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/8/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
|
February 5, 2013 |
Filing
180
ORDER GRANTING 178 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR SUBPOENA; REQUESTING CSP LITIGATION COORDINATOR ALLOW PLAINTIFF REASONABLE ACCESS TO LEGAL MATERIALS; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 5, 2013. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
|
January 7, 2013 |
Filing
174
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTION; PROVIDING RAND/WOODS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 7, 2013. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
|
August 24, 2012 |
Filing
158
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAPORTES AUGUST 3, 2012 ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
|
December 12, 2011 |
Filing
101
ORDER DENYING 100 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; REQUESTING PRISON OFFICIALS ALLOW REASONABLE ACCESS TO LEGAL MATERIALS; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 12, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
|
November 9, 2011 |
Filing
95
ORDER OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT M. EVANS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 9, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
|
May 16, 2011 |
Filing
59
ORDER DENYING 53 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; DENYING 56 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; GRANTING 50 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY; GRANTING 28 DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 16, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
|
January 27, 2011 |
Filing
20
ORDER OF SERVICE; DENYING 18 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 27, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
|