Solomon v. Alliant Law Group, P.C.
Plaintiff: Steven Solomon
Defendant: Alliant Law Group, P.C.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AND ALL PARTIES, WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE: JOINT MOTION OF ALL PARTIES RE: EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY CUT-OFF. The discovery cut-off is extended up to January 14, 2011. All other dates in the Pretrial Preparation Order remain as originally set. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 23, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/17/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/1/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. All counsel shall appear at the May 28, 2010 Initial Case Management Conference by telephone. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 24, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. Alliant Law Group, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Solomon
Represented By: Matthew Scott Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliant Law Group, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?