Federal Trade Commission v. Inc21.com Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Inc21.com Corporation, Jumpage Solutions Incorporated, GST U.S.A., Inc., Roy Yu Lin, John Yu Lin and Sheng Lin
Case Number: 3:2010cv00022
Filed: January 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 234 WRIT OF Continuing GARNISHMENT issued against Kerry Krisher (dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR WRIT re 231 Application for Writ, filed by Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 4, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER DENYING EXEMPTION CLAIMED BY ROY LIN re 210 Notice (Other) filed by Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 25, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER DENYING EXEMPTION CLAIMED BY JOHN YU LIN re 205 Notice (Other) filed by John Yu Lin. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 10, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER RE EXEMPTION CLAIMED BY ROY LIN re 210 Notice (Other) filed by Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 3, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER PARTIALLY RESOLVING CLAIMS OF EXEMPTION re 205 Notice (Other) filed by John Yu Lin, 208 Notice (Other) filed by Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 21, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER REQUESTING FTC RESPONSE TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION re 206 Request filed by John Yu Lin, 205 Notice (Other) filed by John Yu Lin. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 19, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 WRIT of Execution Issued as to John Yu Lin; $35,681,999.33. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER IMPLEMENTING DISTRIBUTION PLAN. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 25, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER RE VIDEO RECORDED DEPOSITIONS OF LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 8, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER TO TRANSFER FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY TO THE FTC IN PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 5, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS REGARDING THE JUDGMENT, PERMANENT INJUNCTION, AND CONSUMER REDRESS PLAN by Judge Alsup denying 164 Motion to Stay; denying 164 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation; granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion for Release of Funds (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY AND STAYING REFUNDS OF ESCROWED FUNDS. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 4, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup granting 123 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 125 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO SEPTEMBER 15. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 27, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER APPROVING ADJUSTED DEPOSIT AMOUNTS INTO THE COURT'S REGISTRY. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 6, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE TRANSFER OF FUNDS INTO THE COURT'S REGISTRY. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 2, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING BANK OF AMERICA'S MOTION FOR RELIEF AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting 126 Motion for Relief from Monthly Disbursements of Funds (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' BANK ACCOUNTS AND ASSETS. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 19, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REGARDING ASSETS FROZEN UNDER THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 10, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY AND AMENDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Alsup denying 82 Motion to Stay; denying 82 Motion to Expedite; denying 82 Motion to Shorten Time (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER VACATING APRIL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 6, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/5/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 19, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING 46 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DECLARATION UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 16, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010) Modified on 2/17/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REGARDING UPCOMING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 8, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED EXTENSION OF DEPOSITIONS BY ONE DAY ONLY. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 21,2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 5 Motion for TRO (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SUMMARIZING RULINGS ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 14, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Inc21.com Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Douglas VanAnda Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc21.com Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jumpage Solutions Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GST U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Yu Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Yu Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheng Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?