Jue v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Jade Jue
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv00033
Filed: January 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/1/2010.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 29, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR MOTION TO STRIKE re 8 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Summary Judgment, or Motion to Strike; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 11, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL AND REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 25,2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING HEARING REGARDING DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 22, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jue v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jade Jue
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Kenwood Carlyle Youmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?