Washington v. Sandoval et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Washington
Defendant: D. Sundoval, D. Sunguist and K. Townsend
Case Number: 3:2010cv00250
Filed: January 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 237 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 225 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER re ADDITIONAL EQUIPMENT 221 Proposed Order filed by Jesse Washington. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/24/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER EQUIPMENT re 206 Proposed Order filed by Jesse Washington. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/23/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 22, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONFIDENTIAL AND PRIVILEGED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 19, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 DRAFT PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 17, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 157 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Carolyn Redding; Brandon H. Stroy; Christopher Michael Bonny and Matthew E Prosen terminated.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 153 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 9,. 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 142 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, granting 135 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 4/10/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/19/2013 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/5/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting request for telephone conferences. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/1/12. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 97 Stipulation (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 93 Stipulation (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 90 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/30/2012. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER requiring parties to meet and confer re settlement. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/12/2012 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 205, 2nd Floor, Eureka before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 06/06/12. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/11/2012. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Sandoval et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Sundoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Sunguist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?