Golinski v. United States Office of Personnel Management Featured Case
Plaintiff: Karen Golinski
Defendant: United States Office of Personnel Management and John Berry
Case Number: 3:2010cv00257
Filed: January 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER of USCA as to 188 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group, 192 Notice of Appeal, filed by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
July 24, 2012 Fed Ex'd Document Request to US Court of Appeals (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER of United States Supreme Court. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER of USCA as to 188 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group, 192 Notice of Appeal, filed by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER of USCA as to 188 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group, 192 Notice of Appeal, filed by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 195 USCA Case Number 12-15409 USCA for the Ninth Circuit for 192 Notice of Appeal, filed by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 194 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management re 192 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 28, 2012 Filing 192 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike, 186 , Judgment 187 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 2/28/2012) Modified on 3/2/2012 USCA Case Number 12-15409 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2012 Filing 193 USCA Case Number 12-15388 USCA for the Ninth Circuit for 188 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 27, 2012 Filing 191 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group re 188 Notice of Appeal, (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2012: # 1 Docket Sheet) (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2012 Filing 190 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 12/16/2011 before Judge Jeffrey S. White, re 188 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 4/24/2012. (Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 27, 2012 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 24, 2012 Filing 189 Statement re 188 Notice of Appeal, (Representation Statement) by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 Filing 188 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,,,, 186 , Judgment 187 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 2/24/2012) Modified on 2/28/2012 USCA Case Number 12-15388 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2012 Filing 187 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 22, 2012. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 118 OPM Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 119 BLAG Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING 142 GOLINSKI Motion for Summary Judgment; and DENYING 148 BLAG Motion to Strike as Moot. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
January 17, 2012 Filing 185 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 16, 2011, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2012. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
December 20, 2011 Filing 183 NOTICE by Karen Golinski Of Exhibit 1 Lodged At December 16, 2011 Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One)(Lin, Rita) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 16, 2011 Filing 184 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2011 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 12/16/2011). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2011)
December 16, 2011 Filing 182 EXHIBIT 1 filed by Karen Golinski. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 16, 2011 Filing 181 INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED - PLEASE DISREGARD AND SEE DOCUMENT NO. 184</b) Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2011 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 12/16/2011). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2011) Modified on 1/6/2012 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2011 Filing 180 NOTICE by Karen Golinski re 179 Notice (Other) Amended Notice Of Further Authority Pursuant To December 14 Order (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 15, 2011 Filing 179 NOTICE by Karen Golinski Of Further Authority Pursuant to December 14 Order (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 15, 2011 Filing 178 NOTICE by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of Additional Authorities Pursuant to the Court's notice of December 14, 2011 (Bartolomucci, H. Christopher) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 14, 2011 Filing 177 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 14, 2011. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
November 1, 2011 Filing 176 Response re 174 Opposition/Response to Motion Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group's Superseding opposition to Her Motion For Summary Judgment byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Lisa M. Diamond, # 2 Declaration Michael Lamb, # 3 Declaration Letitia Anne Peplau, # 4 Declaration Rita F. Lin, # 5 Exhibit A To Lin Declaration, # 6 Exhibit B To Lin Declaration, # 7 Exhibit C To Lin Declaration, # 8 Exhibit D To Lin Declaration, # 9 Exhibit E To Lin Declaration, # 10 Exhibit F To Lin Declaration, # 11 Exhibit G To Lin Declaration, # 12 Exhibit H To Lin Declaration, # 13 Exhibit I To Lin Declaration, # 14 Exhibit J To Lin Declaration, # 15 Exhibit K To Lin Declaration)(Lin, Rita) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 175 Declaration of Conor B. Dugan in Support of 174 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 174 ) (Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 174 RESPONSE (re 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum Of Points and Authorities ) filed byBipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 12, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 148 MOTION to Strike Extrinsic Materials, 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum Of Points and Authorities, 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Corrected,. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 168 Motion for Leave to File Superceding Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R Hall Notice of Appearance by Tony West (Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 3, 2011 Filing 171 OBJECTIONS to re 170 Reply to Opposition/Response To Intervenor Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group's Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Leave To File Superseding Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment by Karen Golinski. (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 Filing 170 REPLY (re 168 MOTION for Leave to File Superseding Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byBipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 169 RESPONSE (re 168 MOTION for Leave to File Superseding Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L)(Borelli, Tara) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 168 MOTION for Leave to File Superseding Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration in Support)(Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d (2) filed byBipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 22, 2011 Filing 166 Letter dated September 16, 2011 from Raymond H. Hawkins. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 165 Statement re 161 Order to Show Cause Defendants' Statement of Consent to Video Recording of October 21, 2011 Hearing by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 164 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group Re: Video Recording. (Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Borelli, Tara) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 162 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Karen Golinski Statement of Consent to Video Recording. (Borelli, Tara) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Video Recording: Show Cause Response due by 9/9/2011.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/26/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Borelli, Tara) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS: Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 5, 2011 Filing 158 REPLY (re 148 MOTION to Strike Extrinsic Materials ) filed byBipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
July 29, 2011 Filing 157 RESPONSE (re 148 MOTION to Strike Extrinsic Materials ) by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 156 Declaration of Karen Golinski in Support of 154 Reply to Opposition/Response, Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group's Opposition To Her Motion For Summary Judgment filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 154 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 155 Declaration of Rita F. Lin in Support of 154 Reply to Opposition/Response, Of Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group's Opposition To Her Motiobn For Summary Judgment filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 154 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 154 REPLY (re 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum Of Points and Authorities ) And Opposition To Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group's Opposition To Her Motion For Summary Judgment filed byKaren Golinski. (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 153 Request for Judicial Notice re 152 Reply to Opposition/Response Of Defendants' Opposition To Her Motion For Summary Judgment filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 152 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 152 REPLY (re 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum Of Points and Authorities ) And Reply To Defendants' Opposition To Her Motion For Summary Judgment filed byKaren Golinski. (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 151 RESPONSE (re 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum Of Points and Authorities ) filed byJohn Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 150 REPLY (re 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ) filed byBipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 149 RESPONSE (re 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum Of Points and Authorities ) filed byBipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of H. Christopher Bartolomucci, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 148 MOTION to Strike Extrinsic Materials filed by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 7/29/2011. Replies due by 8/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 147 REPLY (re 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Corrected, ) filed byJohn Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 1, 2011 Filing 146 Proposed Order re 145 Opposition/Response to Motion, by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 Filing 145 RESPONSE (re 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Corrected, ) filed byJohn Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 Filing 144 Declaration of Rita F. Lin in Support of 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum Of Points and Authorities filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 142 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 Filing 143 Declaration of Karen Golinski in Support of 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum Of Points and Authorities filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 142 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 Filing 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum Of Points and Authorities filed by Karen Golinski. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 7/15/2011. Replies due by 7/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 132 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Corrected, Responses due by 7/15/2011. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 140 REPLY (re 132 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Corrected, Defendants' Administrative MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Corrected, Defendants' Administrative MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Corrected, Defendants' Administrative ) filed byKaren Golinski. (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Corrected,. Responses due by 7/15/2011. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 139 RESPONSE (re 132 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Corrected, Defendants' Administrative MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Corrected, Defendants' Administrative MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Corrected, Defendants' Administrative ) filed byBipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Dugan, Conor) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 138 Declaration of Gary Segura in Support of 133 Opposition/Response to Motion, To Defendants' And Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group's Motions To Dismiss filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 133 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 137 Declaration of Letitia Anne Peplau in Support of 133 Opposition/Response to Motion, To Defendants' And Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group's Motions To Dismiss filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 133 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 136 Declaration of Michael Lamb in Support of 133 Opposition/Response to Motion, To Defendants' And Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group's Motions to Dismiss filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 133 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 135 Declaration of Nancy F. Cott in Support of 133 Opposition/Response to Motion, To Defendants' And Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group's Motions to Dismiss filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 133 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 134 Declaration of George Chauncey in Support of 133 Opposition/Response to Motion, To Defendants' and Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group's Motions To Dismiss filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 133 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 133 RESPONSE (re 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ) Plaintiff's Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defendants' And Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group's Motion To Dismiss filed byKaren Golinski. (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 132 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Corrected, Defendants' Administrative Motion to Enlarge Period to File a Brief in Response to Motions to Dismiss and to Exceed Page Limitations filed by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 129 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Susan L. Sommer (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 130 Proposed Order re 129 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611061114.) by Karen Golinski. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 129 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice -Susan L. Sommer ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611061114.) filed by Karen Golinski. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part 121 Administrative Motion. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 127 RESPONSE (re 121 MOTION Regarding Oppositions To Motions To Dismiss And Anticipated Motion For Summary Judgment ) filed byBipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dugan, Conor) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 126 Statement of Non-Opposition re 121 MOTION Regarding Oppositions To Motions To Dismiss And Anticipated Motion For Summary Judgment Statement of Partial Non-Opposition filed byJohn Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Related document(s) 121 ) (Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 9, 2011 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Clement , Lead Counsel (Clement, Paul) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Christopher Bartolomucci (Bartolomucci, H. Christopher) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Conor Brendan Dugan (Dugan, Conor) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 122 Declaration of Rita F. Lin in Support of 121 MOTION Regarding Oppositions To Motions To Dismiss And Anticipated Motion For Summary Judgment filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 121 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 121 MOTION Regarding Oppositions To Motions To Dismiss And Anticipated Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Karen Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Lin, Rita) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 120 ERRATA re 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 119 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Proposed Order)(Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 118 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Corrected, filed by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 117 ERRONEOUS DOCUMENT. SEE 118 CORRECTED MOTION MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 6/3/2011) Modified on 6/6/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 103 Motion to Intervene. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 114 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 114 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 113 REPLY (re 103 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byBipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 112 RESPONSE (re 103 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byJohn Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 111 REPLY (re 103 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byBipartisan Legal Advisory Group. (Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER RE REPLY BRIEF ON BLAG'S MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/23/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING 104 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. Whtie on 5/10/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 9, 2011 Filing 108 Statement of Non-Opposition re 103 MOTION to Intervene filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 103 ) (McGuire, James) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 9, 2011 Filing 107 Declaration of James R. McGuire in Support of 105 Opposition/Response to Motion To Enlarge Time To Respond To Plaintiff''s Second Amended Complaint filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 105 ) (McGuire, James) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 9, 2011 Filing 106 Declaration of Rita F. Lin in Support of 105 Opposition/Response to Motion To Enlarge Time to Respond To Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 105 ) (McGuire, James) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 9, 2011 Filing 105 RESPONSE (re 104 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 102 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 102 Amended Complaint, ) filed byKaren Golinski. (McGuire, James) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 104 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 102 Amended Complaint, filed by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Attachment A, # 2 Affidavit Attachment B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 103 MOTION to Intervene filed by Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kircher, Kerry) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 14, 2011 Filing 102 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. Filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(McGuire, James) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 101 NOTICE by Karen Golinski Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Pizer, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Warren Davidson (Davidson, Jon) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Lynn Borelli (Borelli, Tara) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 49 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend and DENYING 69 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 97 Response re 96 Response to Order to Show Cause To February 23, 2011 Order byKaren Golinski. (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 28, 2011 Filing 96 RESPONSE TO 94 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 93 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 23, 2011. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority Pursuant to Local Rule 7-3(D) filed by Karen Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Dresser, Gregory) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 92 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by Karen Golinski per Order 91 (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 90 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to File Notice Of Supplemental Authority Pursuant To Local Rule 7-3(d) filed by Karen Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lin, Rita) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
December 30, 2010 Filing 89 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/17/2010, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2011. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 17, 2010 ***CMC Deadlines terminated 87 Motion Hearing held. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 88 NOTICE by Karen Golinski re 86 Order Of Further Authority Pursuant To December 16 Order (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 87 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2010 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 12/17/2010). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2010)
December 16, 2010 Filing 86 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 16, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 85 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Karen Golinski. (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
November 29, 2010 Filing 84 Brief re 81 Brief Reply In Support Of Supplemental Brief Pursuant To The October 15 Order filed byKaren Golinski. (Related document(s) 81 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 19, 2010 Filing 83 Brief re 76 Order Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Response to Court's Order of October 15, 2010 filed byJohn Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Related document(s) 76 ) (Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 82 Request for Judicial Notice re 81 Brief In Support Of Plaintiff Karen Golinski's Supplemental Brief Pursuant To October 15 Order filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 81 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 81 Brief re 76 Order Supplemental Brief Pursuant To October 15 Order filed byKaren Golinski. (Related document(s) 76 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR ALTERATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT TO FOLLOWING HEARING : Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/22/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 79 Statement re 78 Proposed Order, 77 Notice (Other) Statement of Nonopposition to Plaintiff's Request for Alteration of Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 78 Proposed Order re 77 Notice (Other) For Alteration Of Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date by Karen Golinski. (McGuire, James) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 77 NOTICE by Karen Golinski Request For Alteration Of Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date (McGuire, James) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Requiring Further Briefing and Continuing Hearing on Pending Motions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 15, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Set/Reset Hearing as to 49 MOTION to Dismiss, 69 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2010 10:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 6, 2010 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion 49 to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed byJohn Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 10/6/2010) Modified on 10/7/2010 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2010.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/4/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re 70 Notice of Matter Under Submission, Setting Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Pending Motions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 29, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 Set Hearing as to 49 MOTION to Dismiss and 69 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2010 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/28/10. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/28/2010. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 70 NOTICE by Karen Golinski That Matter Remains Under Submission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lin, Rita) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 69 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Notice of Motion filed by Karen Golinski. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (McGuire, James) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 68 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: COUNSEL TO E-FILE ATTACHMENT AS A MOTION NOTICE by Karen Golinski Amended Notice Of Motion For Preliminary Injunction (McGuire, James) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/22/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER OF RECUSAL (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 65 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED NOTICE by Karen Golinski Of Motion For Preliminary Injunction (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/20/10. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 9/20/10 that due to the unavailability of Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, the Executive Committee directs the clerk to re-assign this action. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 62 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing to 10/26/2010 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 49 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Karen Golinski. (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d In Support Of 8 Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by Karen Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 8/16/2010) Modified on 8/17/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d In Support Of Her Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed byKaren Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 58 Statement of Recent Decision re 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Karen Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/26/2010) Modified on 7/27/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2010 Filing 57 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 56 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration Of Plaintiff Karen Golinski In Support Of Motion For Preliminary Injunction by Karen Golinski. (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 52 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 07/22/10 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010) Modified on 7/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2010 Filing 55 NOTICE by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management re 53 Declaration in Support Defendants' Certification of Position under Paragraph 5 of the Standing Order of This Court in Response to Declaration of Rita F. Lin (Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 Filing 54 EXHIBITS re 52 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration In Support Of Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed byKaren Golinski. (Related document(s) 52 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 53 Declaration of Rita F. Lin in Support of 52 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration In Support Of Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed byKaren Golinski. (Related document(s) 52 ) (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 52 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration In Support Of Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by Karen Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lin, Rita) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 51 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Grace Y. Park as Counsel, filed by Karen Golinski (Park, Grace) (Filed on 7/6/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re Motion Hearing & Case Management Conference as to 34 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 47 Clerks Notice. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 50 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Karen Golinski, John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 6/4/2010) Modified on 6/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 4/26/10. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 10, 2010 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss with Memorandum in Support, filed by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 5/10/2010) Modified on 5/11/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2010 Filing 48 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel and Appearance for Christopher R Hall, filed by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management (Hall, Christopher) (Filed on 5/5/2010) Modified on 5/6/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2010 Filing 47 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 13, 2010 Filing 46 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 4/26/10 at 2:30 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 45 Certificate of Interested Entities by Karen Golinski identifying Other Affiliate Amy Cunninghis for Karen Golinski. (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 44 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 45 *** Certificate of Interested Entities by Karen Golinski (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 4/9/2010) Modified on 4/13/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2010 Filing 43 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d), filed by Karen Golinski (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 4/7/2010) Modified on 4/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2010 Filing 42 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Karen Golinski (Lin, Rita) (Filed on 4/7/2010) Modified on 4/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2010 Filing 41 Declaration of James R. McGuire in Support of 39 Reply Memorandum filed by Karen Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 39 ) (McGuire, James) (Filed on 3/19/2010) Modified on 3/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2010 Filing 40 Request for Judicial Notice re 39 Reply Memorandum filed by Karen Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 39 ) (McGuire, James) (Filed on 3/19/2010) Modified on 3/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2010 Filing 39 Reply Memorandum re 34 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Karen Golinski. (McGuire, James) (Filed on 3/19/2010) Modified on 3/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2010 Filing 38 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant OPM to Respond to 30 Amended Complaint filed by John Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 3/18/2010) Modified on 3/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2010 Filing 37 Memorandum in Opposition re 34 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJohn Berry, United States Office of Personnel Management. (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karen Golinski re 34 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction (McGuire, James) (Filed on 3/10/2010) Modified on 3/11/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2010 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karen Golinski re 30 Amended Complaint, (McGuire, James) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 34 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Karen Golinski. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McGuire, James) (Filed on 3/10/2010) Modified on 3/11/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2010 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to John Berry. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 9, 2010 Filing 32 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 35 *** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karen Golinski re 30 Amended Complaint (McGuire, James) (Filed on 3/9/2010) Modified on 3/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages to Opposition Brief. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 03/12/10. Plaintiff may file reply by 03/19/10. Defendant's 25 Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction is STRICKEN from the record. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010) Modified on 3/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2010 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States Office of Personnel Management, John Berry. Filed by Karen Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(McGuire, James) (Filed on 3/8/2010) Modified on 3/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2010 Filing 29 Reply Brief in support of 23 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition Brief of 36 Pages filed byUnited States Office of Personnel Management. (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 3/3/2010) Modified on 3/4/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2010 Filing 28 Proposed Order re 23 Motion for Leave to File Opposition Brief of 36 Pages by Karen Golinski. (McGuire, James) (Filed on 3/2/2010) Modified on 3/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2010 Filing 27 Declaration of James R. McGuire in Support of 26 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Administrative Motion for Leave to File an Opposition Brief of 36 Pages filed by Karen Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 26 ) (McGuire, James) (Filed on 3/2/2010) Modified on 3/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2010 Filing 26 Memorandum in Opposition re 23 Motion for Leave to File Opposition Brief of 36 Pages filed by Karen Golinski. (McGuire, James) (Filed on 3/2/2010) Modified on 3/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2010 Filing 25 Memorandum in Opposition re 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States Office of Personnel Management. (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 3/2/2010) Modified on 3/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2010 Filing 24 Declaration of Steven Y. Bressler in Support of 23 Motion for Leave to File Opposition Brief of 36 Pages filed by United States Office of Personnel Management. (Related document(s) 23 ) (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 3/1/2010) Modified on 3/2/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition Brief of 36 Pages, filed by United States Office of Personnel Management. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 3/1/2010) Modified on 3/2/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 13 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Notice and Hearing for Preliminary Injunction. Defendant is to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injuncition on or before 03/09/10; Plaintiff may file reply by 03/09/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2010 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karen Golinski re 20 Reply to Opposition, (McGuire, James) (Filed on 2/3/2010) Modified on 2/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2010 Filing 20 Reply to Opposition re 13 Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time for Notice and Hearing as to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Karen Golinski. (McGuire, James) (Filed on 2/3/2010) Modified on 2/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2010 Filing 19 Proposed Order re 13 Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time re Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed, by United States Office of Personnel Management. (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 2/2/2010) Modified on 2/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2010 Filing 18 Declaration of Steven Y. Bressler in Support of 17 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by United States Office of Personnel Management. (Related document(s) 17 ) (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 2/2/2010) Modified on 2/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2010 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition re 13 Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States Office of Personnel Management. (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 2/2/2010) Modified on 2/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2010 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2010 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 27, 2010 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karen Golinski re 14 Declaration James R. McGuire in Support, 13 Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time on Hearing re Motion for Preliminary Injunction (McGuire, James) (Filed on 1/27/2010) Modified on 1/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2010 Filing 14 Declaration of James R. McGuire in Support of 13 Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time re Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Karen Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 13 ) (McGuire, James) (Filed on 1/27/2010) Modified on 1/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2010 Filing 13 Ex Parte MOTION for Order Shortening Time re 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Karen Golinski. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McGuire, James) (Filed on 1/27/2010) Modified on 1/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2010 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karen Golinski re 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction 9 Declaration of Karen Golinski in Support 10 Declaration of James R. McGuire in Support 11 Request for Judicial Notice (Related document(s) 8 , 9 , 10 , 11 ) (McGuire, James) (Filed on 1/26/2010) Modified on 1/27/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (McGuire, James) (Filed on 1/26/2010) Modified on 1/27/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2010 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice re 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Karen Golinski. (Related document(s) 8 ) (McGuire, James) (Filed on 1/26/2010) Modified on 1/27/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2010 Filing 10 Declaration of James R. McGuire in Support of 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Karen Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) 8 ) (McGuire, James) (Filed on 1/26/2010) Modified on 1/27/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2010 Filing 9 Declaration of Karen Golinski in Support of 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Karen Golinski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 8 ) (McGuire, James) (Filed on 1/26/2010) Modified on 1/27/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Karen Golinski. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McGuire, James) (Filed on 1/26/2010) Modified on 1/27/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Steven Yale Bressler, filed by United States Office of Personnel Managment (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 1/22/2010) Modified on 1/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 6 REASSIGNMENT ORDER. Case Reassigned to the Honorable Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to a United States District Court Judge. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 4 Declination to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge & Request for Reassignment to a United States District Court Judge Filed by Plaintiff Karen Golinski. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 4/27/2010 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2010 at 10:00 AM. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010) Modified on 1/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2010 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant United States Office of Personnel Management.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - [Summons Issued] against United States Office of Personnel Management, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611041322]. Filed by Plaintiff Karen Golinski. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golinski v. United States Office of Personnel Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Golinski
Represented By: Gregory P. Dresser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Office of Personnel Management
Represented By: Christopher R Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Berry
Represented By: Christopher R Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?