Wood v. The Green Line Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Wood
Defendant: The Green Line Enterprises, Inc. and James w. Holland
Case Number: 3:2010cv00351
Filed: January 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1364 Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 78 Stipulation for Dismissal of Action filed by James w. Holland, The Green Line Enterprises, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/10/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND LIENHOLDER THE FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 3/25/2013 at 8:30 AM in Courtro om F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 3/25/2013-3/29/2013 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 7, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Requesting Permission to Appear at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 5, 2012.Please use the ECF event "Appear by Telephone" for future requests. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 65 Letter requesting telephonic appearance at CMC, filed by James w. Holland, The Green Line Enterprises, Inc. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on October 29, 2012. Please use the ECF event "Appear by Telephone" for future requests. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 58 Letter requesting telephonic appearance filed by Barbara A. Wood. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/12/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER continuing CMC to September 13, 2012 and continuing trial to February 4, 2013.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/3/2012. (Corley, Jacqueline) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 52 Letter requesting to appear by telephone filed by James w. Holland, The Green Line Enterprises, Inc. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make arrangements to appear by telephone. Signed by Magsitrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/26/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Plaintiff's Counsel Requesting Telephonic Appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/23/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PRETRIAL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 12/3/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco bef ore Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 12/3/2012 to 12/7/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/5/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Letter requesting to appear by phone filed by Barbara A. Wood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/3/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jaqueline Scott Corley on 12/15/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 35 Letter filed by Barbara A. Wood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/15/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 25 Stipulation filed by The Green Line Enterprises, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Larson on 5/10/2011. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 23 Stipulation filed by The Green Line Enterprises, Inc. Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge JAMES LARSON on 5/2/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION AND RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Stipulation filed by James w. Holland, The Green Line Enterprises, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/19/20. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Stipulation filed by Barbara A. Wood. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/29/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. The Green Line Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Wood
Represented By: Christopher William Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Green Line Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas S. Brazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James w. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?