Lippold v. Godiva Chocolatiers Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel Lippold
Defendant: Godiva Chocolatiers Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00421
Filed: January 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JUDGMENT (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2010 09:00 AM. re 42 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER EXCLUDING TIME to August 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 2, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting leave to file 1st amended complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Remand (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lippold v. Godiva Chocolatiers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lippold
Represented By: Alexander Russell Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godiva Chocolatiers Inc.
Represented By: Steven Mark Zadravecz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?