Arden v. Kastell et al
Plaintiff: Gary Arden
Defendant: Frank Kastell, Linard Davis, Airport Travel Angency, Inc., Alla Serdyuchenko, Ron Brigham and Smarte Carte, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00436
Filed: January 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION AS A MATTER OF LAW. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/31/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 JURY INSTRUCTION SUPPLEMENT 1. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/21/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 TRIAL STIPULATIONS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/20/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 PROPOSED VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 10/19/2014. (nclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2014)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/10/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER TO REMEDY DEFICIENCY. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/9/2014(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER TO FURNISH DAILY MORNING REFRESHMENTS FOR MEMBERS OF THE JURY. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/3/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER ON PRETRIAL STIPULATIONS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/2/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 10/1/2014. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER TO REMEDY DEFICIENCY AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/23/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST to Allow Telephonic Appearance 101 . Counsel must call the Courtroom Deputy at 415.522.2039 to provide a direct dial number for this appearance. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/14/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PRELIMINARY ORDER GRANTING 70 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on December 8, 2011. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING Request to file Sur-Reply 78 , 79 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on November 22, 2011. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re 75 Notice of Untimely Filing. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on November 2, 2011. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re 56 Stipulation filed by Gary Arden Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge JAMES LARSON on 5/4/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DEADLINES AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 52 Stipulation, filed by Gary Arden. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Larson on 4/4/2011. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REMOVING ATTORNEYS CONSTANCE E. NORTON AND DALENE R. BRAMER FROM THE SERVICE LIST re 42 Notice (Other) filed by Smarte Carte, Inc., Ron Brigham, Alla Serdyuchenko. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/14/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISMISSING SMARTE CARTE., ALLA SERDYUCHENKO AND RONALD BRIGHAM re 37 Stipulation, filed by Smarte Carte, Inc., Ron Brigham, Alla Serdyuchenko. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/29/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 35 Proposed Order filed by Smarte Carte, Inc., Ron Brigham, Alla Serdyuchenko. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/15/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/3/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 6 Proposed Order filed by Gary Arden. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/20/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arden v. Kastell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Arden
Represented By: Charles Carreon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Kastell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linard Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airport Travel Angency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alla Serdyuchenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Brigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smarte Carte, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?