Alzheimer's Institute of America v. Elan Corporation PLC et al
Plaintiff: Alzheimer's Institute of America
Defendant: Elan Corporation PLC, Eli Lilly & Company, AnaSpec Incorporated, Immuno-Biological Laboratories, Inc., Life Technologies Corporation, The Jackson Laboratory and Phoenix Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00482
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER Re Defendant Eli Lilly's Motion to Seal 385 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER regarding special master report by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER REGARDING TAXATION OF COSTS re 345 Order on Motion for Taxation of Costs. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 2/20/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 317 STIPULATED REQUEST AND ORDER Changing Time for Filing of Motions for Attorneys' Fees re 316 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/13/2012. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER REQUIRING UPDATE: Status Report due by 5/7/2012. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/24/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 302 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 3/19/12. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 262 Motion to Stay and denying 283 Motion to Withdraw. 293 Motion to Appear by Telephone terminated. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Opening Briefing due by 11/14/2011. Responses due by 11/22/2011. Replies due by 12/2/2011. Motion to Withdraw, Hearing set for 12/14/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/7/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 271 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW ELAN'S JULY 19, 2011 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION (200) TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 10/21/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER Granting re 260 Parties' Stipulated Request: AIA shall file its Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly & Company's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement no later than 11/14/2011. Lilly shall file a Reply in Support of its Motion by 11/21/2011 & the Hearing on Lilly's Motion shall be held on 12/6/2011 at 2:00 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/14/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying re 205 Motion to Compel Following In Camera Review. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER VACATING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION TUTORIAL AND HEARING DATES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 09/09/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER VACATING HEARING, REQUIRING DOCUMENTS BE LODGED IN CAMERA, REQUIRING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/1/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 224 STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELAN MOTION TO COMPEL NON-PRIVILEGED AND NON-IMMUNE DOCUMENTS FROM AIA re 223 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 08/12/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting re 219 Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 08/11/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER REGARDING JULY 29, 2011 LETTER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 08/04/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 182 JOINT STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Service of AIA's Disclosures, Discovery Responses, Expert Reports, Confidential Filings, and Deposition Transcripts in Pending Actions. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 05/31/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING REPLACING THE INTERIM MODEL PROTECTION ORDER, re doc 174 Stipulation filed by Eli Lilly & Company. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/13/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 STIPULATION AND ORDER. AIA shall file its Opposition to motion to compel simultaneous production (D.N. 164) by noon PDT on Friday, 5/13/2011. Defendants shall file a reply in support of their motion, if any, by Wednesday, 5/18/2011, re doc 173 filed by Alzheimer's Institute of America, Alzheimer's Institute of America, Inc. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/12/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge Laporte denying 151 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Regarding Substitution of Counsel (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 11/3/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER re 92 Stipulation, filed by Alzheimer's Institute of America, Alzheimer's Institute of America, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 46 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/13/2010. Replies due by 8/20/2010.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/9/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER for extension of CMC and time for answer re 83 Stipulation, filed by Alzheimer's Institute of America, Alzheimer's Institute of America, Inc., Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/29/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/16/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alzheimer's Institute of America v. Elan Corporation PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alzheimer's Institute of America
Represented By: Robert Alan Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elan Corporation PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AnaSpec Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immuno-Biological Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jackson Laboratory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?