Semiconductor Components Industries, L.L.C. v. I2A Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Semiconductor Components Industries, L.L.C.
Defendant: I2A Technologies, Inc. and Victor Batinovich
Case Number: 3:2010cv00603
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 WRIT of Execution (Money Judgment) Issued in the amount of $352,202.35. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re 43 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. If no party requests oral argument by 11/23/10, then the 11/29/10 motion hearing will be vacated and judgment will be entered for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/18/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER extending reply deadline and hearing date on 43 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Reply deadline extended to 11/12/10. Motion hearing continued to 11/29/10 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/08/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF REFERENCE, ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/02/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 46 Motion to file late motion to compel and ORDER referring all discovery to a magistrate judge. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting request for plaintiff's counsel to appear by telephone at the case management conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/26/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending certain deadlines for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/24/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadlines for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/18/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/4/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Semiconductor Components Industries, L.L.C. v. I2A Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Semiconductor Components Industries, L.L.C.
Represented By: Euphemia Nikki Thomopulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I2A Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Batinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?