Flowbee International, Inc. et al v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Flowbee International, Inc. and Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00668
Filed: February 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2010 Filing 66 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Google, Inc.. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
June 29, 2010 ADR Remark: Further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 8/19/2010 at 10:00 a.m. is off calendar. Please update your calendar accordingly. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 29, 2010 Filing 65 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Henry Su as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to ADR Unit for Mediation. Discovery due by 3/31/2011. Jury Trial set for 6/13/2011 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 4/28/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/16/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 17, 2010 Filing 62 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM byFlowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, Flowbee International, Inc.. (Bright, David) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 16, 2010 Filing 64 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/16/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 6/16/2010), Case referred to mediation. Jury Trial set for 6/13/2011 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2011 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/16/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 61 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc.. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 2, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by DB on 6/1/10. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 8/19/10 at 10:00 a.m. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF BRIGHT by Judge Alsup granting 59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 26, 2010 Filing 59 AMENDED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - David T. Bright ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005136.) filed by Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, Flowbee International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 21, 2010 Filing 58 Certificate of Interested Entities by Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, Flowbee International, Inc. (Lillis, Damien) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 57 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 56 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 6/1/10 at 10:00 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 55 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 54 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 53 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lillis, Damien) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google, Inc. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 51 NOTICE by Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, Flowbee International, Inc. Notice of Appearance of Local Counsel (Lillis, Damien) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - David T. Bright ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005136.) filed by Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, Flowbee International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 48 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 48 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling ICMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2010 11:00 AM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated.*** (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on March 4,2010. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 3, 2010 Filing 46 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 45 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google, Inc. AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION FORM. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/23/2010. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 43 ERRATA re 42 Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim, by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Galvin, Cheryl) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2010 Filing 42 Google Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses (with Jury Demand), and First COUNTERCLAIM against Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, Flowbee International, Inc. by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Galvin, Cheryl) (Filed on 2/18/2010) Modified on 2/19/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2010 Filing 39 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 2:09-cv-00199. Case File Electronically Transfered; transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 2/18/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 41 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2010 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 40 CLERKS NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer from the Southern Distict of Texas; Case Number 2:09-cv-001199. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 8, 2010 Interdistrict electronic transfer to Northern District of California, San Jose Division, filed. (srussell, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Dismiss this case for improper venue; Granting alternative motion to transfer case to Northern District of California, San Jose Division.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(srussell, )
January 11, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janis Graham Jack. MOTION HEARING held on 1/11/2010 ; Motion-related deadline set re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,, 29 Unopposed MOTION for Oral Argument Relating to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing re: 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Its Pending Motion to DismissUnopposed MOTION for Oral Argument Relating to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing re: 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss. Appearances: Christopher V Goodpastor, David Tarrant Bright, Margaret Caruso, Carl C Butzer.(Digital # 10:05-11:04)(ERO:v gao), filed.(sscotch, )
December 17, 2009 Filing 37 NOTICE of Setting as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,, 29 Unopposed MOTION for Oral Argument Relating to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing re: 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Its Pending Motion to DismissUnopposed MOTION for Oral Argument Relating to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing re: 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Janis Graham Jack, filed. (sscotch, )
November 5, 2009 Filing 36 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Margaret Caruso re: 32 Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed. (Bar website reflects the same address) (dperez, )
October 22, 2009 Filing 35 Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, by Google, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Caruso Declaration, # 2 Hagan Declaration)(srussell, )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Defendant Google Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(srussell, )
October 19, 2009 Filing 33 PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY in Support of 24 Response to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(3), filed by Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership. (srussell, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply in Support of Response to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(3).(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(srussell, )
October 19, 2009 Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER re: 30 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss, filed.(Bright, David)
October 16, 2009 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss by Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/5/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bright, David)
October 8, 2009 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Oral Argument Relating to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing re: 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss by Google, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/28/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margaret)
October 8, 2009 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss by Google, Inc., filed.(Caruso, Margaret)
October 8, 2009 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Bright, Watts Guerra Craft, LLP, counsel for Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, filed. (Bright, David)
October 6, 2009 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss by Google, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/26/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reply Memorandum of Law, # 2 Caruso Declaration, # 3 Hagan Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margaret)
October 6, 2009 Filing 25 Amended INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Google, Inc., filed.(Caruso, Margaret)
October 2, 2009 Filing 24 RESPONSE to 11 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,, filed by Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Proposed Order)(Bright, David)
September 25, 2009 Filing 23 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 21 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (vgano, )
September 25, 2009 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT re: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 09/23/09 before Judge Janis Graham Jack. Court Reporter/Transcriber Molly Carter. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2009., filed. (mocarter)
September 24, 2009 Filing 22 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Carl Butzer. This is to order a transcript of held on 09/23/09 before Judge Janis Graham Jack Court Reporter/Transcriber: Molly Carter, filed. (lcayce, )
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2009 Joinder of Parties due by 12/15/2009 Discovery due by 6/30/2010 Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/15/2010 Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/20/2010 Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge Janis Graham Jack Jury Selection set for 9/2/2010 at 08:00AM before Judge Janis Graham Jack Jury Trial set for 9/2/2010 at 08:00 AM before Judge Janis Graham Jack.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(lrivera, )
September 23, 2009 Filing 19 Order for Referral to Mediation..(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(lrivera, )
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 GENERAL ORDER.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(lrivera, )
September 23, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janis Graham Jack. Initial PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/23/2009. Discussion regarding issues of the case. Court signs scheduling order and general order. Court refers parties to mediation. Appearances:Carl Butzer, David Tarrant Bright, Margaret Caruso.(Digital # 1:08-1:44)(ERO:v gano), filed.(sscotch, )
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(lcayce, )
September 23, 2009 Filing 16 TRIAL BRIEF Plfs Initial Brief of Law by Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, filed.(Bright, David)
September 22, 2009 Filing 15 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Google, Inc., filed.(Babcock, Charles)
September 22, 2009 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Margret M. Caruso to Appear as Attorney-In-Charge by Google, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
September 17, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Goodpastor on behalf of Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, filed. (Bright, David)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(lrivera, )
September 14, 2009 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, by Google, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Part 2), # 4 Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
September 11, 2009 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, filed.(Bright, David)
September 10, 2009 Filing 9 MOTION for Margaret M. Caruso to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Google, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2009. (mserpa, )
September 10, 2009 Filing 8 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, filed.(Bright, David)
September 10, 2009 Filing 7 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, filed.(Bright, David)
September 9, 2009 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Google, Inc., filed.(Babcock, Charles)
September 9, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. "Chip" Babcock on behalf of Google, Inc., filed. (Babcock, Charles)
September 2, 2009 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Google, Inc. served on 8/25/2009, answer due 9/14/2009, filed.(Bright, David)
August 28, 2009 Filing 3 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, filed.(Bright, David)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/23/2009 at 01:15 PM before Judge Janis Graham Jack. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) Parties notified.(dterrell, )
August 13, 2009 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc., filed.(dterrell, )
August 13, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05410000000005368054) filed by Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Part 2 of 2, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Bright, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowbee International, Inc. et al v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flowbee International, Inc.
Represented By: David Tarrant Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership
Represented By: David Tarrant Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Charles L Babcock, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?