Operating Engineers' Pension Trust Fund et al v. Fife Rock Production Company et al

Plaintiff: Operating Engineers' Pension Trust Fund, Gil Crosthwaite and Russ Burns
Defendant: Geneva H. Fife Revocable Trust, Geneva H. Fife, Kathryn F. Damon, Fife Equipmetn & Investment Company, Fife Equipment & Investments Company, LLC and Fife Rock Products Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00697
Filed: February 18, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING ARBITRATION AWARD AND CLOSING CASE 49 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
January 24, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAYING CASE PENDING ARBITRATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
August 30, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 11/5/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
June 30, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re 18 . Amended Answer is due 7/16/10. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
May 28, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 9/3/10 @ 2:30 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Operating Engineers' Pension Trust Fund et al v. Fife Rock Production Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geneva H. Fife Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geneva H. Fife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn F. Damon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fife Equipmetn & Investment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fife Equipment & Investments Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fife Rock Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers' Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gil Crosthwaite
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russ Burns
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?