Salmon et al v. Folger
Plaintiff: Coho Salmon, Northern California River Watch and Coast Action Group
Defendant: Clinton Folger
Case Number: 3:2010cv00741
Filed: February 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 58 Stipulation filed by Northern California River Watch. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/6/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Dispositive motions hearing date 3/31/12; final pretrial confernce 7/30/12; 5-7 day trial 8/20/12. Signed by Acting Chief U.S. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 06/13/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: FILING THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT re 47 Stipulation filed by Northern California River Watch. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/1/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR MEDIATION Re 38 Stipulation filed by Dorothy R. Rice, California State Water Resources Control Board. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/3/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REGARDING TIME TO ANSWER SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 35 Stipulation filed by Dorothy R. Rice, Clinton Folger, California State Water Resources Control Board. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/10/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT re 28 Stipulation filed by Northern California River Watch. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/30/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANANGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 8/25/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/2/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salmon et al v. Folger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coho Salmon
Represented By: Jack Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California River Watch
Represented By: Jack Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coast Action Group
Represented By: Jack Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Folger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?