Cason v. Federated Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cheryl Cason
Defendant: Federated Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00792
Filed: February 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 121 Stipulation filed by Federated Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/5/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER re 112 Stipulation filed by Federated Life Insurance Company VACATING 8/9/2011 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/05/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Re OSC Hearing Re Civil Contempt 50 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/20/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES re 92 Stipulation filed by Federated Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/13/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING OSC/CIVIL CONTEMPT HEARING setting re 86 Stipulation filed by Optimum Health Institute. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/27/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Re 50 Optimum Health Institute Subpoena. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Re 74 Joint Letter of April 27, 2011. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/11/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 50 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Federated Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/14/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE-REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/20/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND STATUS CONFERENCE re 27 Stipulation filed by Cheryl Cason. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/20/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Cheryl Cason. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/9/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE-REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/21/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING SETTTLEMENT CONFERENCE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/14/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/28/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cason v. Federated Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Cason
Represented By: Samuel Gilmore Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Paul Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?